Garliss, et al v. Baxter Healthcare, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:98-cv-03717-BEL

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ethel Sue Garliss, Plaintiff
No Logo Joseph A. Garliss, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brower Piven, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles J. Piven +1 410 332 0030 +1 410 685 1300 piven@browerpiven.com
v.
No Logo Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Lilore Huesman

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodell, DeVries, Leech & Dann, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bonnie J Beavan +1 410 783 4000 +1 410 783 4040 bjb@gdldlaw.com
No Logo Baxter International, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Baxter Healthcare, SA
Unknown Role, Baxalta Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Lilore Huesman

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodell, DeVries, Leech & Dann, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bonnie J Beavan +1 410 783 4000 +1 410 783 4040 bjb@gdldlaw.com
Office Baltimore
Filed 11/4/1998
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 365 - Personal Injury: Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Transfer/Remand - MDL Transfer
County Worcester
Terminated 12/30/1998
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 926, CLOSED, XMDL
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 12/30/1998, Entered: 12/31/1998 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER "DIRECTING" this case be administratively closed subject to being reopened in the event that any party files an objection with the MDL Panel. ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 12/30/98 ) (c/m 12/30/98-bw) (MICROFILMED 12/31/98) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 12/30/1998, Entered: 12/31/1998 Terminated Case
    Case closed (cag, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 8 Filed: 12/4/1998, Entered: 12/9/1998 Local Rule
      Local Rule 103.3 Certification by Baxter International. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 7 Filed: 12/4/1998, Entered: 12/9/1998 Answer
        ANSWER to Complaint by Baxter International (Attorney Bonnie J. Beavan, Jennifer Lilore Huesman) and Adoption by Reference. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 6 Filed: 12/4/1998, Entered: 12/9/1998 Local Rule
          Local Rule 103.3 Certification by Baxter Healthcare. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 5 Filed: 12/4/1998, Entered: 12/9/1998 Answer
            ANSWER to Complaint by Baxter Healthcare (Attorney Bonnie J. Beavan, Jennifer Lilore Huesman) and Adoption by Reference. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 4 Filed: 11/30/1998, Entered: 12/2/1998 Summons Returned Executed
              RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Baxter International 11/16/98 Answer due on 12/6/98 for Baxter International (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 3 Filed: 11/30/1998, Entered: 12/2/1998 Summons Returned Executed
                RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Baxter Healthcare 11/16/98 Answer due on 12/6/98 for Baxter Healthcare (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 2 Filed: 11/4/1998, Entered: 11/6/1998 Summons Issued
                  SUMMONS(ES) (20 days) issued for Baxter Healthcare, Baxter International. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 11/4/1998, Entered: 11/6/1998 Jury Demand
                    DEMAND for jury trial by Ethel Sue Garliss, Joseph A. Garliss (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 1 Filed: 11/4/1998, Entered: 11/6/1998 Complaint
                      COMPLAINT AND ADOPTION BY REFERENCE (Silicone Gel Breast Implant Product Liability Litigation) filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # B153564 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 68 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?