Aimex Assurance Co v. B. Burlack, et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 2005-1-CV-033535

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 17, 2018 at 6:58 PM ST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Amex Assurance Co, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Cole Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Nelson Cole +1 916 376 0486 +1 916 376 0478 scole@colenetlaw.com
v.
No Logo Burlack, Brook F, Defendant
No Logo Chan, Iris, Defendant
Case Type Auto Unlimited (22)
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 18 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: None Order
order on stipulation signed by judge kleinberg; Legacy Name = CV Order; Decision = M; Closed = 08/06/2007
    Blank 17 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: None stipulation
    CV Stipulation; Decision = M; Closed = 08/06/2007
      Blank 16 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: None Judgment Default
      By Court, $45,716.51 For Amex Assurance Co agst Brook F Burlack, Iris Chan; Legacy Name = CV Judgment After Default; Decision = M; Closed = 06/27/2005
        Blank 15 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: None Declaration
        of Howard Goldsmith Re: Damages; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 06/24/2005
          Blank 14 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: None Declaration
          of Stephen N Cole In Support thereof; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 06/24/2005
            Blank 13 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: None Declaration
            Request for Default Judgment; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 06/24/2005
              Blank 12 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: None Request-Enter Default
              Entered; Legacy Name = CV Req:Entry of Default; Decision = M; Closed = 06/24/2005
                Blank 11 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: None Request-Enter Default
                Entered agst Brook F. Burlack, Iris Chan; Legacy Name = CV Req:Entry of Default; Decision = M; Closed = 05/06/2005
                  Blank 10 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                  by plt. atty Stephen Cole; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 04/26/2005
                    Blank 9 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: None Request-Enter Default
                    **NOT ENTERED** Outdated form (need 2/18/05 982...) Question #1 not answered; Legacy Name = CV Req:Entry of Default; Decision = M; Closed = 04/26/2005
                      Blank 8 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: None Statement of Damages
                      CV Statement of Damages; Decision = M; Closed = 04/26/2005
                        Blank 7 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: None Statement of Damages
                        CV Statement of Damages; Decision = M; Closed = 04/26/2005
                          Blank 6 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                          CV Original Summons on Complaint; Decision = M; Closed = 06/27/2005
                            Blank 5 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                            CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 04/05/2005
                              Blank 4 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
                              summons/comp; Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc/Regular Mail; Decision = M; Closed = 04/05/2005
                                Blank 3 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 03/08/2005
                                  Blank 2 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                  Complaint Filed; Summons Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 01/10/2005
                                    Blank 1 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                    Case Cover Sheet; Decision = M; Closed = 01/10/2005

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?