Pioneer Financial v. Pretscher
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 2005-1-CV-042950

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 17, 2018 at 9:34 PM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pioneer Financial LLC, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Pretscher, Peter, Defendant
Case Type Other Collections Limited (09) - under 10,000
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 35 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Writ: Execution (Filed)
6/21/13 Los Angeles Credit:$2,308.82 Balance: $25,435.54; Legacy Name = CV Writ of Exec Retn/Partial Satis; Decision = M; Closed = 01/08/2015
    Blank 34 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
    Acknowledgment of satisfaction of jgmt is missing an original signature on the acknowledgment. Also, 191 N. First Street is not the recorder's office. You will need to mail a separate acknowledgment to each of the recorder's offices where the judgment was recorded.; Legacy Name = CV Clerk Rejection Ltr; Decision = M; Closed = 12/23/2013
      Blank 33 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
      re: ack of satisfaction: Please submit the original, not a copy. Also, 191 N 1st is not the recorders office. If you want it recorded, please look up the appropriate venue's address and submit there.; Legacy Name = CV Clerk Rejection Ltr; Decision = M; Closed = 12/20/2013
        Blank 32 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None Judgment Satisfaction
        CV Acknow/Satisf of Jgmt Full; Decision = M; Closed = 12/11/2013
          Blank 31 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None Writ: Execution (Filed)
          LA / $23353.98; Legacy Name = CV Writ of Execution Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 06/21/2013
            Blank 30 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None Memorandum Of Costs
            interest $9652.94; Legacy Name = CV Memo of Costs/After Jgmt; Decision = M; Closed = 06/21/2013
              Blank 29 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
              sent to wrong courthouse; Legacy Name = CV Clerk Rejection Ltr; Decision = M; Closed = 05/28/2013
                Blank 28 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: None Writ: Execution (Filed)
                CV Writ of Exec Retn/Unsatis; Decision = M; Closed = 06/30/2008
                  Blank 27 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None Abstract of Judgment issued
                  CV Abstract of Judgment Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 02/21/2007
                    Blank 26 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None Notice: Change Address/Firm Name
                    for Nelson & Kennard; Legacy Name = CV Change of Atty address/Firm; Decision = M; Closed = 02/21/2007
                      Blank 25 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: None Writ: Execution (Filed)
                      issued to Santa Clara County $14,010.19; Legacy Name = CV Writ of Execution Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 08/28/2006
                        Blank 24 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: None Memorandum Of Costs
                        accrued interest $319.15; Legacy Name = CV Memo of Costs/After Jgmt; Decision = M; Closed = 08/28/2006
                          Blank 23 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: None Abstract of Judgment issued
                          CV Abstract of Judgment Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 06/01/2006
                            Blank 22 Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: None Notice: Change Address/Firm Name
                            physical address only not mailing; Legacy Name = CV Change of Atty address/Firm; Decision = M; Closed = 05/23/2006
                              Blank 21 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: None judgmentCourt Filing
                              After Trial By Court for total am't of $13,676.04; Hon Judge Nichols; Legacy Name = CV Judgment; Decision = M; Closed = 05/12/2006
                                Blank 20 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                                CV Ntc:Entry of Order; Decision = M; Closed = 05/08/2006
                                  Blank 19 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: None Order After Hearing - POSCourt Filing
                                  re: Ordered that each of the requested Admissions propounded by plt to def are deemed admitted;; def shall provide duly verified responses to plt 1st set of interrogatories within 30 days of ntc of entry of this order;; def shall further provide to plt a verified response to plts request for prod of docs and produce those docs requested within 30 days of ntc of entry of this order;; def shall pay plt sanctions in the sum of $160.00; ordered by the Hon Judge McKenney; Legacy Name = CV Ord After Hearing; Decision = G; Closed = 04/28/2006
                                    Blank 18 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                    to ntc of mtn to compel resp to plts request for production of doc and first set fof interrogatories; Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 04/27/2006
                                      Blank 17 Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: None Notice
                                      Notice in Lieu of Subpoena to Compel Attendance Before the court and to produce books, documents or other things; Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 04/06/2006
                                        Blank 16 Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: None Declaration
                                        In Lieu of Testimony; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 04/06/2006
                                          Blank 15 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                          CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 03/10/2006
                                            Blank 14 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                            CV Memo:Ps & As/Suppt of Mtn; Decision = M; Closed = 03/10/2006
                                              Blank 13 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: None Motion Order
                                              compelling response to plt's req for production of documents and 1st set of interrogatories 4/11/06 9:00 am dept 16 atty gloria zarco; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Mtn for Order; Decision = M; Closed = 03/10/2006
                                                Blank 12 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: None Notice
                                                date, time and place of court trial; Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 02/24/2006
                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: None Notice
                                                  date time and place of trial setting conf; Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2006
                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: None Document: Other
                                                    RECEIVED copy of ltr to Mr. Pretscher; Legacy Name = CV Other
                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                      (Kennard); Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 12/28/2005
                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                        CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 10/25/2005
                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: None Certificate of Mailing
                                                          CV Cert/mail:Ord/Appl Fee Waiver; Decision = M; Closed = 10/24/2005
                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: None Fee Waiver Order-Grant
                                                            granted in whole; Legacy Name = CV Ord:Waiver of Costs/Fees; Decision = G; Closed = 10/24/2005
                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: None Answer (Limited): Up to $10K
                                                              pro per; Legacy Name = CV Answer, Ltd
                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: None Fee Waiver Application
                                                                CV Appl:Waiver Court Fees/Costs
                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: None Declaration: Non-Service
                                                                  CV Decl:Non-Service; Decision = M; Closed = 06/30/2005
                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 6/10/2005, Entered: None Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K
                                                                    CV Complaint Filed/Summs Iss
                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 6/10/2005, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                                                      CV Case Cover Sheet; Decision = M; Closed = 06/10/2005

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?