UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION v. CITY OF PALO ALTO
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 2005-1-CV-044677

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 17, 2018 at 10:01 PM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

United Services Automobile Association United Services Automobile Association, Plaintiff
Officer/Director, Ishares Trust
Officer/Director, Zag.com, Inc.
Officer/Director, Schwab Strategic Trust
Officer/Director, USAA Casualty Insurance Co

Toggle Switch Represented by The Cole Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Nelson Cole +1 916 376 0486 +1 916 376 0478 scole@colenetlaw.com
v.
City of Palo Alto City of Palo Alto, Defendant
Case Type Eminent Domain/Inv Cond Limited (14) - 10,000 - 25,000
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: None Request Dismissal
by Atty Cole; Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/Prej; Decision = M; Closed = 12/22/2005
    Blank 7 Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: None Notice-Settlement
    by Atty Cole; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Settlement; Decision = M; Closed = 11/22/2005
      Blank 6 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
      atty mayfield; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 10/25/2005
        Blank 5 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
        Stephen N Cole; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 10/24/2005
          Blank 4 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: None Answer (Limited): >$10K and <$25K
          Atty: Baum; Legacy Name = CV Answer, Ltd >$10K; Decision = M; Closed = 08/05/2005
            Blank 3 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
            CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 08/04/2005
              Blank 2 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: None Complaint (Limited): >$10K and <$25K
              CV Complaint Filed/Summs Iss >$10k; Decision = M; Closed = 07/08/2005
                Blank 1 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                CV Case Cover Sheet; Decision = M; Closed = 07/08/2005

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 0 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?