United Services Automobile Association v. Mediterraneo Design Center, Inc, et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 2005-1-CV-046679

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 17, 2018 at 10:34 PM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

United Services Automobile Association United Services Automobile Association, Plaintiff
Officer/Director, Ishares Trust
Officer/Director, Zag.com, Inc.
Officer/Director, Schwab Strategic Trust
Officer/Director, USAA Casualty Insurance Co

Toggle Switch Represented by The Cole Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Nelson Cole +1 916 376 0486 +1 916 376 0478 scole@colenetlaw.com
v.
No Logo Energy House, Inc, Defendant
No Logo American Business Management, Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Snyder, Martin T. +1 925 691 0400
No Logo Lennox Health Products Inc., Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Selman Breitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Edmond Stephan +1 415 979 0400 +1 415 979 2099 pstephan@selmanbreitman.com
No Logo Lennox Hearth Services, Inc, Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Selman Breitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Edmond Stephan +1 415 979 0400 +1 415 979 2099 pstephan@selmanbreitman.com
No Logo Mediterraneo Design Center, Inc, Cross Complainant
Case Type Other PI/PD/WD Unlimited (23)
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 29 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS
CV Ntc:Entry of Dismissal w/POS; Decision = M; Closed = 02/21/2007
    Blank 28 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None Request Dismissal
    with prej xcomplt filed by Mediterraneo Design Ctr vs Lennox Hearth Products by ATty. Roberson; Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial; Decision = M; Closed = 02/05/2007
      Blank 27 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None Dismissal
      xcomplt filed by Mediterraneo Design Ctr Inc agst American Business Mgmt by Atty. Roberson; Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial W/O Prej; Decision = M; Closed = 02/05/2007
        Blank 26 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: None Request Dismissal
        w/prejudice to complaint ONLY. (Stephen N. Cole); Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial; Decision = M; Closed = 11/02/2006
          Blank 25 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: None Notice-Settlement
          by Atty. Cole; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Settlement; Decision = M; Closed = 10/31/2006
            Blank 24 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
            Atty Martin T. Snyder; Legacy Name = CV Answer, Unltd, w/fees; Decision = M; Closed = 05/09/2006
              Blank 23 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: None Dismissal
              filed by Atty Stephen N. Cole; Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial W/O Prej; Decision = M; Closed = 12/02/2005
                Blank 22 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                atty stephan; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 11/28/2005
                  Blank 21 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                  paid on case management statement; atty stephan; Legacy Name = CV First Paper Def - Unltd; Decision = M; Closed = 11/28/2005
                    Blank 20 Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: None Answer/Response (No Fee)
                    atty Stephan; Legacy Name = CV Answer - NO FEES DUE!; Decision = M; Closed = 11/17/2005
                      Blank 19 Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                      atty Stephan; Legacy Name = CV Answer, Unltd, w/fees; Decision = M; Closed = 11/17/2005
                        Blank 18 Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                        atty Roberson; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 11/17/2005
                          Blank 17 Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                          (Cole); Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 11/17/2005
                            Blank 16 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: None Cross-Complaint (Amended) (No Fee)
                            CV 1st Amended Cross Complaint; Decision = M; Closed = 10/17/2005
                              Blank 15 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                              on amended cross complaint; ; Legacy Name = CV Summons Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 10/17/2005
                                Blank 14 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                of David S Roberson in support of appl to file amendment to cross complaint; ; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 10/17/2005
                                  Blank 13 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: None Cross-Complaint (Amended) (No Fee)
                                  atty David Roberson; ; Legacy Name = CV Amendment to X-complaint; Decision = M; Closed = 10/17/2005
                                    Blank 12 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                    ordered that Mediterraneo Design Center, Inc be allowed to file attached amendment to cross complaint. Granted by Judge Jacob-Mays.; ; Legacy Name = CV Order; Decision = G; Closed = 10/17/2005
                                      Blank 11 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: None Application and Order: Ex Parte
                                      allowing amendment to xcmplt, david s. roberson; Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Appl & Order; Decision = M; Closed = 10/17/2005
                                        Blank 10 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                        x-complaint; Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 10/13/2005
                                          Blank 9 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                          x-complaint; Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 10/13/2005
                                            Blank 8 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                            CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 09/30/2005
                                              Blank 7 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                              on cross complaint; Legacy Name = CV Summons Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 09/28/2005
                                                Blank 6 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                atty roberson; Legacy Name = CV Answer, Unltd, w/fees; Decision = M; Closed = 09/28/2005
                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: None Cross Complaint
                                                  CV Cross-Complaint; Decision = M; Closed = 09/28/2005
                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                    CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 09/20/2005
                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                      CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 09/01/2005
                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 8/9/2005, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                        CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 08/09/2005
                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 8/9/2005, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                                          CV Case Cover Sheet; Decision = M; Closed = 08/09/2005

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?