General Electric Capital Corporation v. A. Rodriguez
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 2011-1-CV-214274

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 18, 2018 at 2:12 AM EST (3.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo General Electric Capital Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Meadows, David W.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Geronimo Perez +1 310 943 4755 gperez@dfis-law.com
v.
No Logo Rodriguez, Arthur, Defendant
Case Type Other Collections Unlimited (09)
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 18 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Miscellaneous: Converted Document
General Electric Capital Corporation Vs A. Rodrigu
    Blank 17 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None judgmentCourt Filing
    for plt against def Arthur Rodriguez Jr dba Superior Paving ; Systems for the total sum of $42,806.06 signed by Judge Bondonno; Legacy Name = CV Judgment; Decision = M; Closed = 02/25/2013
      Blank 16 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Declaration
      of Tamitha Chase in supp; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 02/21/2013
        Blank 15 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Default Entered
        court; Legacy Name = CV Default Entered; Decision = M; Closed = 02/21/2013
          Blank 14 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
          Interest calculations in declaration is not clearly set forth. Calculations must indicate principal amount, interest rate and the start & end date.; Legacy Name = CV Clerk Rejection Ltr; Decision = M; Closed = 01/25/2013
            Blank 13 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None Order: Default Judgment not enteredCourt Filing
            How do you calculate the percentage? -- signed by Judge Franklin Bondonno; Legacy Name = CV Ord:Rejection Letter; Decision = M; Closed = 01/03/2013
              Blank 12 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None Declaration
              Decl of Tabitha Chase in supp; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 12/04/2012
                Blank 11 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None Default Entered
                court; Legacy Name = CV Default Entered; Decision = M; Closed = 12/04/2012
                  Blank 10 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None Default Entered
                  Basic; Legacy Name = CV Default Entered; Decision = M; Closed = 10/02/2012
                    Blank 9 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                    CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 09/24/2012
                      Blank 8 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None Notice
                      appearance and request for service of papers. atty Geronimo Perez. phn: 310-867-2716; Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 09/14/2012
                        Blank 7 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None Default Not Entered
                        Item 6b(1) is incomplete, DBA missing in item 6b(2).; Legacy Name = CV Default Not Entered; Decision = M; Closed = 08/17/2012
                          Blank 6 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                          CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 05/24/2012
                            Blank 5 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                            CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 02/09/2012
                              Blank 4 Filed: 1/25/2012, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
                              POS-Summons not on POS-010 form.; Legacy Name = CV Clerk Rejection Ltr; Decision = M; Closed = 01/25/2012
                                Blank 3 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                CV Summons Filed; Decision = M; Closed = 12/05/2011
                                  Blank 2 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                  CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 12/05/2011
                                    Blank 1 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                    CV Case Cover Sheet; Decision = M; Closed = 12/05/2011

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?