USA v. Martin
Criminal Case Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:00-cr-00183-PAM-ESS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan Nolting Burke

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office DMN
Filed 6/20/2000
County Rice
Terminated 3/13/2002
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1-2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 871.F
Offense Level 4
18871 MAKING A THREAT AGAINST THE PRESIDENT
Def Custody Status Released
Flags 3DIV, CLOSED, FRC
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 31 Filed: 3/13/2002, Entered: 3/13/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER FOR DISMISAL (Judge Richard H. Kyle / date signed 3/13/02) of indictment against deft Michael Bruce Martin. (cc: all counsel, PT, USM) 1 page (PJS)
    LREF
    Blank 30 Filed: 10/4/2000, Entered: 10/5/2000 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER (Chief Judge Paul A. Magnuson / date signed 10/4/00) granting govt's motion for continuance of trial date [28-1] The trial in this matter is hereby continued through and including 3/21/02 for Michael Bruce Martin (cc: all counsel). 1pg (LEG)
      LREF
      Blank 29 Filed: 10/2/2000, Entered: 10/3/2000 Miscellaneous Document
      AGREEMENT FOR PRETRIAL DIVERSION as to defendant Michael Bruce Martin. 6 (pgs) (
        LREF
        Blank 28 Filed: 10/2/2000, Entered: 10/3/2000, Terminated: 10/4/2000 Motion to Continue
        MOTION for continuance of trial date by USA as to Michael Bruce Martin. 1 pg(s) (
          LREF
          Blank 27 Filed: 9/15/2000, Entered: 9/18/2000 CJA 20 Appointment
          CJA Form 20 Copy 4 (Appointment of Counsel) appointing attorney Robert Richman, as to defendant Michael Bruce Martin. 1 pg (
            LREF
            Blank 26 Filed: 9/13/2000, Entered: 9/13/2000 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT FROM FPD STATUS TO CJA STATUS (Chief Judge Paul A. Magnuson / date signed 9/12/00) that Robert Richman be appointed to represent the deft through the CJA Conflict Panel and that a CJA 20 voucher be issued effective 9/9/00 [23-1] as to Michael Bruce Martin. (cc: all counsel & Lisa Testor) 1 page (PJS)
              LREF
              Blank 25 Filed: 9/6/2000, Entered: 9/6/2000 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER (Chief Judge Paul A. Magnuson / date signed 9/5/00) motion for continuance of trial date by thirty days [24-1] is granted as to Michael Bruce Martin. (cc: all counsel) 1 pg (
                LREF
                Blank 24 Filed: 8/25/2000, Entered: 8/28/2000, Terminated: 9/6/2000 Motion to Continue
                MOTION for continuance of trial date by thirty days and to exclude the resulting delay from the speedy trial limits by Michael Bruce Martin. 1pg(s) (LEG)
                  LREF
                  Blank 23 Filed: 8/22/2000, Entered: 8/23/2000 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                  MOTION to reassign from FPD status to CJA status by Michael Bruce Martin. (1 page) (PJS)
                    LREF
                    Blank 22 Filed: 8/7/2000, Entered: 8/8/2000 Utility - Miscellaneous
                    LETTER to ESS from USA dated 8/7/00 re deft Michael Martin that parties have agreed to pretrial diversion, pretrial motions are withdrawn without prejudice, govt withdraws motion for a determination of competency, and deft waives speedy trial rights. (1 page) (PJS)
                      LREF
                      Blank 21 Filed: 7/26/2000, Entered: 7/28/2000 Motion for Medical Exam
                      MOTION for determine the competency of deft by USA as to Michael Bruce Martin. 2 pgs (
                        LREF
                        Blank 20 Filed: 7/19/2000, Entered: 7/20/2000 Motion to Dismiss
                        MOTION/MEMORANDUM to dismiss indictment by Michael Bruce Martin. 4 pg(s) (
                          LREF
                          Blank 19 Filed: 7/19/2000, Entered: 7/20/2000 Motion to Suppress
                          MOTION to suppress eyewitness identification by Michael Bruce Martin. 2 pg(s) (
                            LREF
                            Blank 18 Filed: 7/19/2000, Entered: 7/20/2000 Motion for Disclosure
                            MOTION to disclose & make informant available for interview by Michael Bruce Martin. 1 pg(s) (
                              LREF
                              Blank 17 Filed: 7/19/2000, Entered: 7/20/2000 Motion to Suppress
                              MOTION to suppress statements, admissions & answers by Michael Bruce Martin. 2 pg(s) (
                                LREF
                                Blank 16 Filed: 7/19/2000, Entered: 7/20/2000 Motion to Suppress
                                MOTION to suppress evidence obtained as a result of search & seizure by Michael Bruce Martin. 2 pg(s) (
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 15 Filed: 7/19/2000, Entered: 7/20/2000 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                  MOTION for gov't agents to rtn rough notes by Michael Bruce Martin. 2 pg(s) (
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 14 Filed: 7/19/2000, Entered: 7/20/2000 Motion for Disclosure
                                    MOTION for disclosure of Jencks Act material by Michael Bruce Martin. 2 pg(s) (
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 13 Filed: 7/19/2000, Entered: 7/20/2000 Motion for Discovery
                                      MOTION for discovery by Michael Bruce Martin. 2 pg(s) (
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 12 Filed: 7/19/2000, Entered: 7/20/2000 Motion to Compel
                                        MOTION to compel atty for the govt to disclose evidence favorable to deft by Michael Bruce Martin. 4 pg(s) (
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 11 Filed: 7/19/2000, Entered: 7/20/2000 Motion for Disclosure
                                          MOTION for disclosure of 404 evidence by Michael Bruce Martin. 1 pg(s) (
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 10 Filed: 7/18/2000, Entered: 7/18/2000 Warrant Returned Executed
                                            BENCH Warrant returned executed as to Michael Bruce Martin on 6/28/00. 2pgs (LEG) Modified on 07/18/2000
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 9 Filed: 7/10/2000, Entered: 7/11/2000 Motion for Discovery
                                              MOTION for discovery FRCP 16(b), 12.1 and 26.2 by USA as to Michael Bruce Martin. 2 pgs (
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 8 Filed: 7/7/2000, Entered: 7/10/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER (Magistrate Judge E. S. Swearingen / date signed 7/7/00) granting motion for continuance of motion filing deadline [7-1]; pretrial motions due 7/19/00; motion hearing set for 10:30 on 7/31/00 before ESS; Voir Dire / Jury Instructions due 8/29/00; jury trial set for 9:00 on 9/5/00 before PAM for Michael Bruce Martin. (cc: all counsel) 1 pg (
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 7/5/2000, Entered: 7/6/2000, Terminated: 7/7/2000 Motion to Continue
                                                  MOTION for continuance of motion filing deadline to 7/21/00 and motion hrg date to 7/27/00 by Michael Bruce Martin. 2 pg(s) (
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 6/30/2000, Entered: 7/3/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ARRAIGNMENT ORDER by Magistrate Judge E. S. Swearingen (Date Signed: 6/30/00) as to Michael Bruce Martin Same as minutes, Doc. 5. 2 pgs (
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 6/28/2000, Entered: 7/3/2000 ArraignmentCourt Filing
                                                      MINUTES: before Magistrate Judge E. S. Swearingen dft Michael Bruce Martin arraigned; NOT GUILTY plea entered; Attorney present; disclosures due 7/5/00; pretrial motions due 7/12/00; motion hearing set for 9:00 on 7/19/00 before ESS; tape: 00-36-1916-2100 & 2367-2416. 1 pg (
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 6/28/2000, Entered: 6/29/2000 Utility - Miscellaneous
                                                        APPEARANCE BOND ($25,000 RPR executed on 6/28/00) by Michael Bruce Martin. 1pg (
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 6/28/2000, Entered: 6/29/2000 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS OF RELEASE by Magistrate Judge E. S. Swearingen for Michael Bruce Martin in the amount of $25,000 RPR. 4 pg(s) (
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 6/28/2000, Entered: 6/29/2000 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                            MINUTES: before Magistrate Judge E. S. Swearingen first appearance of Michael Bruce Martin ; $25,000 RPR bond set; Atty Robert Richman appt'd. Deft also arraigned, see separate minutes. Tape: 00 36 1916-2100/2367-2416. 1 pg (
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 6/20/2000, Entered: 6/21/2000 IndictmentCourt Filing
                                                              INDICTMENT assigned to Chief Judge Paul A. Magnuson, referred to Magistrate Judge E. S. Swearingen by USA Susan J Nolting. Counts filed against Michael Bruce Martin (1) counts 1-2. Warrant issued for Michael Bruce Martin. 1 pg (
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/20/2000, Entered: 6/21/2000 Warrant Issued
                                                                BENCH WARRANT issued for Michael Bruce Martin by Judge Michael J. Davis (
                                                                  LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 34 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?