(PS) Bessonov v. Wachovia Mortgage
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:10-cv-01885-JAM-EFB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 18, 2018 at 4:59 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1692
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (2) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/15/2010. Court orders Hearings on defendants' 5 7 Motions to Dismiss and to Strike, and Status Conference to be VACATED; and RECOMMENDS that action be dismissed pursuant to FRCP 41(b), Wachovia' 5 7 Motions to Dismiss be denied as moot, and Clerk be directed to close case. Within 14 days after being served with these F/R's, any party may file written Objections with Court and serve a copy on all parties. (Marciel, M)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER and ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/18/10: HEARING as to 7 MOTION to STRIKE and 5 MOTION to DISMISS continued to 11/24/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. Plaintiffs shall show cause, in writing, no later than November 10, 2010, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to timely file an opposition or a statement of nonopposition to the pending motions. The status (pretrial scheduling) conference continued to 12/22/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Kaminski, H)
      Request RequestSpace LREF

      Statistics

      This case has been viewed 0 times.

      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
      Space
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
       
      PlainSite
      Sign Up
      Need Password Help?