(PS) Harrell v. Buttram
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:14-cv-00582-KJM-AC

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 18, 2018 at 5:28 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/23/2014 DISCHARGING 14 Order to Show Cause. Within 14 days from date of service defendants Marci Buttram, John Crossland, and Clyde Billot shall EACH pay the sum of $293.72 for United States Marshal for effecting personal service on the same. Clerk shall serve all defendants at last known address and United States Marshal a copy of this Order. [cc: U.S. Marshal Services] (Marciel, M)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/7/14 ORDERING that Plaintiff's MOTION to DISMISS this action, 13 , is GRANTED; The Status Conference currently scheduled for 10/22/14 is VACATED; The Clerk is directed to close this action. CASE CLOSED.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/30/14: The Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to serve the court's September 15, 2014, order to show cause upon defendants Marci Buttram, John Crossland, and Clyde Billot using the last known address. (Kaminski, H)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/12/2014. Within 30 days of date of service of Order, defendant shall either (a) SHOW GOOD CAUSE why they failed to waive service, or (b) pay U.S. Marshal costs of personal service reflecton on USM-285 form. Clerk to serve a copy of Order on U.S. Marshal. [cc: U.S. Marshal Services] (Marciel, M)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/15/14: The Clerk of the Court shall send plaintiff one USM-285 form for each defendant, one summons, a copy of the complaint, an appropriate form for consent to trial by a magistrate judge, and this court's status order. (Kaminski, H)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 0 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?