JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. v. A. Askari
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 2012-1-CV-222612

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 18, 2018 at 6:03 AM EST (3.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Meadows, David W.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Geronimo Perez +1 310 943 4755 gperez@dfis-law.com
v.
No Logo Askari, Adam, Defendant
Case Type Other Collections Unlimited (09)
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None Notice-Settlement
(Geronimo Perez); Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Settlement; Decision = M; Closed = 10/16/2012
    Blank 7 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None Request Dismissal
    (Atty. Geronimo Perez); Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/Prej; Decision = M; Closed = 10/11/2012
      Blank 6 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None Notice
      appearance and request for service of papers. atty Geronimo Perez. phn: 310-867-2716; Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 09/14/2012
        Blank 5 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
        re Pf/service of complt including pg. 2 of complt (Atty K. Ducote); Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc/Regular Mail; Decision = M; Closed = 08/21/2012
          Blank 4 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
          CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 06/13/2012
            Blank 3 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
            CV Summons Filed; Decision = M; Closed = 04/16/2012
              Blank 2 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
              CV Case Cover Sheet; Decision = M; Closed = 04/16/2012
                Blank 1 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 04/16/2012

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 0 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?