Smith-Siegel v. Commissioner of Social Security
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-00613-JGK

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 18, 2018 at 6:41 AM ST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 405
Nature of Suit Social Security: Black Lung
  Entries (2) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: The Court has received the Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Katz dated June 23, 2010. No objections have been filed and the time for filing such objections has passed. The Court adopts the thorough and well-reasoned Report and Rec ommendation. Therefore, the defendant's motion for judgment on the pleadings is granted. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment affirming the determination of the Commissioner of Social Security and dismissing the complaint with prejudice. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/19/2010) (jfe)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS this Court recommends that Defendant's motion for judgment on the pleadings by granted and this case be dismissed with prejudice re: 9 MOTION affirming the Commissioner's decision MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Commissioner of Social Security. Objections to R&R due by 7/12/2010 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz on 6/23/10) (cd)
      Request RequestSpace LREF

      Statistics

      This case has been viewed 1 time.

      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
      Space
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
       
      PlainSite
      Sign Up
      Need Password Help?