Escobar v. Lavarias

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 1987-2-SC-021148
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 18, 2018 at 1:02 PM EST (6.4 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Attorney at Law, Plaintiff
No Logo Escobar Zelia M, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Lavarias Rodrigo, Defendant
Attributes
Case Type Small Claims $0 - $1500
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
Timeline
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 3 Filed: 6/1/1987, Entered: None Document: Other
Hearing Motion: H998 -- Attorneys Fees Oct1985; Heard By: Commissioner G. Saldivar Department 33; ; Decision = M; Closed = 06/01/1987
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 2 Filed: 6/1/1987, Entered: None Not Active
Hearing Result Posting -- Date: , Time: 01:00, Dept: 33, Operator: No ID; Bail Amount: $0.00, Bail Status Code/Name: None/No Status Provided; ; Legacy Name = conversion - other; Decision = M; Closed = 06/01/1987
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 1 Filed: 4/29/1987, Entered: None Not Active
Complaint -- SCMN Money-Converted Legacy Document 1A. Dept: Not Specified, Operator: ; Fee Amount: $0.00, Complaint Amount: $0.00; Party Military Status Not Specified; Complaint Summons Not Issued; Number of Additional Unidentified Persons Potentially Affected by Judgment: 01; ; Legacy Name = conversion - other; Decision = M; Closed = 04/29/1987
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space

Statistics

This case has been viewed 0 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?