West Licensing Corp, et al v. Keylaw.com, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:00-cv-00761-DWF-RLE

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo West Licensing Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lockridge Grindal Nauen, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia A Bloodgood +1 612 339 6900 +1 612 339 0981 pabloodgood@locklaw.com
Space Eric C Tostrud +1 612 339 6900 +1 612 339 0981 ectostrud@locklaw.com
No Logo West Publishing Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lockridge Grindal Nauen, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia A Bloodgood +1 612 339 6900 +1 612 339 0981 pabloodgood@locklaw.com
Space Eric C Tostrud +1 612 339 6900 +1 612 339 0981 ectostrud@locklaw.com
v.
No Logo Keylaw.com, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeanette M Bazis +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 jbazis@greeneespel.com
Space Larry D Espel +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 lespel@greeneespel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shernoff Bidart Escheverria LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy P Dillon +1 909 621 4935
No Logo Spy Express, Inc., Defendant
Office DMN
Filed 3/27/2000
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 840 - Property Rights: Trademark
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Dakota
Terminated 6/19/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ATYADM, CLOSED, FRC, TRANSF, TRDMRK
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 19 Filed: 6/19/2000, Entered: 6/22/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL (Judge Donovan W. Frank / 6/19/00) this action is hereby dismissed, with prejudice, the Court reserving jurisdiction for 45 days to permit any party to move to reopen the action for good cause shown or to submit and file a stipulated form of final judgment or to seek enforcement of the settlement terms 1pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (
    LREF
    Legal Document 18 Filed: 5/24/2000, Entered: 5/24/2000 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER (Magistrate Judge Raymond L. Erickson / 5/24/00) ; pretrial status conference set for 1:30 6/27/00 in Duluth 11pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (
      LREF
      Blank 17 Filed: 5/8/2000, Entered: 5/10/2000 Affidavit
      AFFIDAVIT of Jeanette M. Bazis regarding deft Keylaw's motion to withdraw attorneys Larry Dale Espel & Jeanette M Bazis [15-1]. (3pg(s) (DDB)
        LREF
        Blank 16 Filed: 5/8/2000, Entered: 5/10/2000 Memorandum in Support of Motion
        MEMORANDUM by deft Keylaw.com in support of its motion to withdraw attorneys Larry Dale Espel & Jeanette M Bazis [15-1]. (2pg(s) (DDB)
          LREF
          Blank 15 Filed: 5/8/2000, Entered: 5/10/2000 Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
          MOTION by deft Keylaw.com to withdraw attorneys ( to Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan ) Larry Dale Espel & Jeanette M Bazis ret. on 5/31/00 at 3:00 p.m. (3pg(s) (DDB)
            LREF
            Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/19/2000, Entered: 4/20/2000 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER of Recusal (Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan) Case referred to Magistrate Judge Raymond L. Erickson (4-00 AD 11) 1pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (JMR)
              LREF
              Blank 13 Filed: 4/19/2000, Entered: 4/20/2000 Bond
              BOND in amount of $ 100,000.00 Safeco Insurance Company Of America Bond No. 6050263 filed by plaintiffs 4pg(s) (JMR)
                LREF
                Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/11/2000, Entered: 4/11/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                MEMORANDUM, OPINION, AND ORDER: ( Judge Donovan W. Frank ) Pltf's motion for temporary restraining order is granted. [2-1] Deft is hereby enjoined from using domain nume"Keylaw.com" after 6 months from the date of this Order. Deft must immediately post a disclaimer on its website to the effect that the website is in no way affiliated with West, Westlaw, KeyCite or any other West trademark or entity. Within 30 days from the date of this Order, website "Keylaw.com" must consist only of the above described disclaimer and a hyperlink to Deft's new website. End of 6 months from the date of this order, DEft shall transfer domain name "Keylaw.com" to West. Pltfs shall post a bond $100,000.00 to secure this restraining order. In lieu of bond, pltfs may post cash with Clerk of Court. This order shall remain in effect until the Court rules on Pltf's motion for a Preliminary Injunction. 7 pg(s) (cc: all counsel & Financial) (VEM)
                  LREF
                  Blank 12 Filed: 4/10/2000, Entered: 4/13/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                  Summons RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendants on 4/3/00 3pg(s) (JMR)
                    LREF
                    Blank 11 Filed: 4/10/2000, Entered: 4/11/2000 Affidavit
                    AFFIDAVIT of Kristina L. Eisenacher regarding defts' memorandum in oppsoition to pltfs' motion for temporary restraining order [2-1]. (10pg(s) +EXHIBITS (SEPARATE) (DDB)
                      LREF
                      Blank 10 Filed: 4/10/2000, Entered: 4/11/2000 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                      MEMORANDUM by defts in opposition to pltfs' motion for temporary restraining order [2-1]. (22pg(s) (DDB)
                        LREF
                        Blank 9 Filed: 4/10/2000, Entered: 4/11/2000 Order
                        PETITION AND ORDER for admission pro hac vice ( Clerk Francis E. Dosal ) on behalf of deft Keylaw.com by Timothy P Dillon. (1pg(s) (DDB)
                          LREF
                          Blank 8 Filed: 4/10/2000, Entered: 4/11/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                          MINUTES:( Judge Donovan W. Frank / Bruce Tiffany) taking under advisement Pltf's motion for temporary restraining order.[2-1] 1 pg (VEM)
                            LREF
                            Blank 6 Filed: 4/6/2000, Entered: 4/10/2000 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                            NOTICE by pltfs of hearing setting hearing for motion for temporary restraining order [2-1] & motion for preliminary injunction ( to Judge James M. Rosenbaum ) [2-2]. ret. at 1:00 p.m. on 4/10/00 (2pg(s) (DDB)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/4/2000, Entered: 4/7/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER of Disqualification ( Judge James M. Rosenbaum / 4/3/00) Case reassigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank on Patent List , and case referred to Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan ; new case number 00-761 DWF/AJB 1pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (SJH)
                                LREF
                                Blank 4 Filed: 3/30/2000, Entered: 4/4/2000 Affidavit
                                AFFIDAVIT of Forrest Rhoads regarding pltf's motion for temporary restraining order [2-1] & their motion for preliminary injunction [2-2]. (9pg(s) +EXHIBITS (DDB)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 3 Filed: 3/30/2000, Entered: 4/4/2000 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                  MEMORANDUM by pltf in support of their motion for temporary restraining order [2-1] & their motion for preliminary injunction [2-2]. (21pg(s) (DDB)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 2 Filed: 3/30/2000, Entered: 4/4/2000 Motion for TROCourt Filing
                                    MOTION by pltf for temporary restraining order( to Judge James M. Rosenbaum ) and for preliminary injunction( to Judge James M. Rosenbaum ) ret. at 4/12/00 at 9:00 a.m. (2pg(s) (DDB)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 1 Filed: 3/27/2000, Entered: 3/28/2000 ComplaintCourt Filing
                                      COMPLAINT - Summons issued. Assigned to Judge James M. Rosenbaum per Patent List and referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel 43pg(s) (Receipt 233973) (copy of complaint and docket report mailed to Trademark Office) (SJH)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/27/2000, Entered: 3/28/2000 Notice - Miscellaneous
                                        NOTICE SENT to out of state attorney: James F. Rittinger and Mark Lerner (SJH)
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 122 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?