Jose Zuniga Villa v. Atherton Landscaping, Inc. et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 18CV327735

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 19, 2018 at 6:01 PM ST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Villa, Jose Zuniga, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Gaxiola Ramirez +1 408 947 7244 +1 408 918 3061 azlawcat@hotmail.com
v.
No Logo Atherton Landscaping, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ronald A Peters

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald A Peters +1 415 973 3182
No Logo Atherton, Robin, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ronald A Peters

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald A Peters +1 415 973 3182
No Logo Atherton, Stephen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ronald A Peters

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald A Peters +1 415 973 3182
Case Type Wrongful Termination Unlimited (36)
Case Status Active
Case Location Civil
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Minute Order
    Blank 10 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Minute Order
      Blank 9 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)
      $150 jury fee for Plaintiff Villa paid for by Atty Ramirez
        Blank 8 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
        8/21/18 3:45pm D6
          Blank 7 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
            Blank 6 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Answer-Amended Complaint
            to First Amended Complaint; Atty Peters
              Blank 5 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
              First Amended Complaint
                Blank 4 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Substitution-Attorney
                Old- Pro per // New- Ramirez
                  Blank 3 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                    Blank 2 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                      Blank 1 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet

                        Space Space

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 0 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?