Monica Zuniga v. Waymo, LLC et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 18CV328773

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 18, 2021 at 12:16 AM DT (3.7 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Zuniga, Monica, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cummings, Robert G.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cummings, Robert G. +1 650 868 8528
v.
No Logo Google Auto, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Torrecampo, Jared, Defendant
Waymo LLC Waymo LLC, Defendant
Case Type Auto Unlimited (22)
Case Status Active
Case Location Civil
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: None Request Dismissal
entire with prejudice by atty Cummings
    Legal Document 14 Filed: 3/29/2019, Entered: None Notice-Settlement
    Notice: Settlement
      Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
      Granting Stip & Order extending time for Def Waymo LLC and Jared Torrecampo to file a responsive to the complaint; Defs shall have to and include April1, 2019 by Judge Kirwan
        Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: None First Paper Filed - Fee
        Taken on stip on order 3/14/19
          Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
          *PENDING* Stipulation and proposed order extending time to file responsive pleadings and cross-complaint
            Legal Document 10 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
            #2569006, First appearance fee due for each defendant before the Stip and Order can be filed.
              Legal Document 9 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None Minute Order
                Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                Proof of Service
                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                  Proof of Service
                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
                    Your request for dismissal is being rejected because: Item 1(b) is incomplete. Please indicate if it's all causes of action.
                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Minute Order
                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Minute Order
                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 15 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?