United Services Automobile Association v. Culligan International Company
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 2003-1-CV-005906

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 19, 2018 at 9:06 PM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

United Services Automobile Association United Services Automobile Association, Plaintiff
Officer/Director, Ishares Trust
Officer/Director, Zag.com, Inc.
Officer/Director, Schwab Strategic Trust
Officer/Director, USAA Casualty Insurance Co

Toggle Switch Represented by The Cole Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Nelson Cole +1 916 376 0486 +1 916 376 0478 scole@colenetlaw.com
v.
No Logo Culligan International Company, Defendant
Case Type Product Liability Unlimited (24)
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: None Request: Dismissal, Entire Action Without Prejudice
BY PLT. ATTY STEPHEN COLE; Legacy Name = Request for Dismissal/Entire/WO Prej
    Blank 6 Filed: 12/9/2003, Entered: None Request-Enter Default
    default is **etered** agst culligan international company; Legacy Name = Request for Entry of Default; Decision = M; Closed = 12/09/2003
      Blank 5 Filed: 12/9/2003, Entered: None Statement of Damages
      Statement of Damages; Decision = M; Closed = 12/09/2003
        Blank 4 Filed: 12/9/2003, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
        Summons Returned No POS; Decision = M; Closed = 12/09/2003
          Blank 3 Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
          Proof of Service/Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 12/02/2003
            Blank 2 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
            Complaint Filed; Summons Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 09/26/2003
              Blank 1 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
              Case Cover Sheet; Decision = M; Closed = 09/26/2003

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 2 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?