Gross, et al v. Lurie, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:00-cv-02182-DWF-AJB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Elizabeth Gross, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Larry D Espel +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 lespel@greeneespel.com
Space Andrew M Luger +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 aluger@gr-espel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy E Brasel +1 612 664 5690 nancy.brasel@usdoj.gov
No Logo William Gross, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Larry D Espel +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 lespel@greeneespel.com
Space Andrew M Luger +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 aluger@gr-espel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy E Brasel +1 612 664 5690 nancy.brasel@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Adam Lurie, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lapp Libra Thomson Stoebner & Pusch, Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A Harbeck +1 612 338 5815 +1 612 338 6651 dharbeck@lapplibra.com
Space John R Stoebner +1 612 338 5815 +1 612 338 6651 jstoebner@lapplibra.com
No Logo Francelyne Lurie, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lapp Libra Thomson Stoebner & Pusch, Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A Harbeck +1 612 338 5815 +1 612 338 6651 dharbeck@lapplibra.com
Space John R Stoebner +1 612 338 5815 +1 612 338 6651 jstoebner@lapplibra.com
No Logo Option Resources, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lapp Libra Thomson Stoebner & Pusch, Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A Harbeck +1 612 338 5815 +1 612 338 6651 dharbeck@lapplibra.com
Space John R Stoebner +1 612 338 5815 +1 612 338 6651 jstoebner@lapplibra.com
No Logo Richard Lurie, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lapp Libra Thomson Stoebner & Pusch, Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A Harbeck +1 612 338 5815 +1 612 338 6651 dharbeck@lapplibra.com
Space John R Stoebner +1 612 338 5815 +1 612 338 6651 jstoebner@lapplibra.com
Office DMN
Filed 9/21/2000
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 370 - Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Hennepin
Terminated 3/30/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 00-4015MNMI[]
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, FRC
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 36 Filed: 4/3/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE & WITHOUT COSTS ( Judge Donovan W. Frank ) that this matter is dismissed & that all attachments, injunctions or other restrictions entered in this matter are hereby deemed dismissed, satisfied, released & discharged & shall have no further force or effect, in accordance with the stipulation of the parties. (4pg(s)(cc: all counsel) (DDB)
    LREF
    Blank 35 Filed: 4/2/2001, Entered: 4/2/2001, Terminated: 4/2/2001 Appeal - Miscellaneous
    CERTIFIED COPY of judgment from USCA that the joint motion for dismissal of this appeal is granted in accordance with the stipulation. The appeal is hereby dismissed. MANDATE ISSUED 3/19/01 (Notice to Counsel) (1pg) (BLW
      LREF
      Legal Document 34 Filed: 3/30/2001, Entered: 3/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER OF DISMISSAL ( Judge Donovan W. Frank / 3/30/1) that this action is hereby dismissed, with prejudice, the court reserving jurisdiction for (90) days to permit any party to move to reopen the action, for good cause shown, or to submit & file a stipulated form of final judgment, or to seek enforcement of the settlement terms. (1pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DDB)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 12/21/2000, Entered: 12/26/2000 USCA Case Number
        NOTIFICATION BY CIRCUIT COURT of Appellate Docket Number 00-4015MNMI (doc #33-1) (BLW
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 12/19/2000, Entered: 12/19/2000, Terminated: 4/2/2001 Appeal - Miscellaneous
          DELIVERED/MAILED TWO CERTIFIED and one uncertified copy of each of the following to the Court of Appeals, St. Paul Office: Notice of Appeal, Order, Judgment and District Court Clerk's Docket Entries. Copy of Notice of Appeal mailed to counsel (BLW
            LREF
            Blank 33 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/19/2000 Notice of Appeal to 8th CircuitCourt Filing
            NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals by defts' Richard Lurie, Francelyne Lurie, Adam Lurie and Option Resources from Judge Donovan W. Frank's entered on 11/16/00 [29-1][28-1] (1pg) (Receipt #136802) (BLW
              LREF
              Legal Document 32 Filed: 12/8/2000, Entered: 12/12/2000 OrderCourt Filing
              STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Judge Donovan W. Frank ) regarding an agreement as to the procedure by which Richard Lurie may make the aforementioned payments on a monthly basis on behalf of Option Resources. The previous order of this Court dated 11/16/00, insofar as it attaches Francelyne Lurie's U.S. Bank account (#1-047-7127-5799) shall be & hereby is stayed until 12/31/00. (6pg(s)(cc: all counsel) (DDB)
                LREF
                Legal Document 30 Filed: 12/1/2000, Entered: 12/1/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER ( Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan / 12/1/00); discovery set for 4/1/01; amend pleadings and adding parties set for 1/15/01; non-dispositive motions set for 4/15/01; dispositive motions set for 6/1/01; ready for trial set 8/1/01. (2pg(s) (cc: counsel) (DDB)
                  LREF
                  Blank 31 Filed: 11/28/2000, Entered: 12/5/2000 Letter
                  LETTER to court from counsel for plaintiffs dated 11/27/00 with attached original acknowledgment under Minn. Statutes 549.211,subd.2. which was omitted from pltf's application for order in aid of execution of levy filed 11/21/00 2pg(s) (JMR)
                    LREF
                    Blank 27 Filed: 11/22/2000, Entered: 11/24/2000 Report of Rule 26.f Planning Meeting
                    REPORT OF RULE 26(f) MEETING by pltfs & defts. (5pg(s) (DDB)
                      LREF
                      Blank 29 Filed: 11/16/2000, Entered: 11/24/2000 Order
                      JUDGMENT is entered. (10pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DDB) Modified on 11/27/2000
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 28 Filed: 11/16/2000, Entered: 11/24/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                        FINDING OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, ORDER FOR JUDGMENT, & MEMORANDUM ( Judge Donovan W. Frank / 11/16/00) that 1.Pltfs be permitted to contact the purported partners of Option Resources in order to ascertain the extent of Mr. Lurie's interests in the assests of Option Resources. 2. With respect to the Piper Jaffray acct #100-561852-120 & Century Bank acct #14108266 the orders of 9/29/00 & 10/19/00 shall remain in effect until counsel for Pltfs have been able to further discovery pursuant to part (1) of this Order. 3. The safe deposit box, the fee of which was paid from U.S. Bank acct #1-047-7127-5799 shall not opened until counsel for Pltfs is/are present. An inventory of all contents shall be taken at that time & shared with counsel for Pltfs. 4.With respect to the Piper Jaffray acct #100-465624 -120 held by Francelyne Lurie, funds held therein up to the amount of $111,099.73 shall be attached pursuant to Minn. Stat. Ch. 570. Pltfs shall draft all necessary documents to effectuate the Court's order. 5. With respect to the US Bank acct #1-047-7127-5799 held by Francelyne Lurie, funds held therein up to the amount of $60,000 shall be attached pursuant to Minn.Stat.Ch. 570. Pltfs shall draft all necessary documents to effectuate the Court's order.6. With respect to all accounts held by ECI, & E&R Partners,& Lurie & Associates, all funds held therein shall be attached pursuant to Minn.Stat.Ch. 570. Pltfs shall draft all necessary documents to effectuate the Court's order.7. Defts shall not open any new accounts nor close any existing accounts absent stipulation of the parties or further order of this Court. 8. With respect to the taxidermic specimens Pltfs allege to have been fraudulently transferred by Mr. Lurie to his son, Adam Lurie, the Court orders that no further transfers shall occur. 9. The Court reserves the right to rule on the appropriateness of attachment as requested by the Pltfs with respect to accounts held in the name of Option Resources. LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY (9pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DDB) Modified on 11/27/2000
                          LREF
                          Blank 26 Filed: 11/13/2000, Entered: 11/13/2000 Witness List
                          WITNESS LIST submitted by defendant preliminary injunction. 3 pg(s) (VEM)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 25 Filed: 11/6/2000, Entered: 11/8/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER ( Judge Donovan W. Frank / 11/3/00) 1. Defts' motion & request to not disclose the names of partners of Option Resources, L.P., other than those previously disclosed to Pltfs, namely Deft Francelyne Lurie & Steven Mars is DENIED. 2. Defts' motion & request to not disclose all documents relating to check #4313, dated 4/16/96, is GRANTED. 3. That except to the extent that check #4240, dated 12/27/95, & paid in 5/96; check #4344, dated 5/14/96; check #4386, dated 8/5/96; & check #4603, dated 7/22/97, identifies the same entity noted in check #4313, the motion of Defts to not provide or otherwise disclose these transactions is DENIED. 4.That except to the extent that the deposits of 1/2/96, 4/15/96 & 8/6/96, relate to the entity identified in check #4313, dated 4/16/96, the motion of the Defts to not disclose all documents relating to these deposits is DENIED. 5. That in all other respects the prior orders of this Court, including the Orders of 9/29/00 & 10/18/00, shall remain in full force & effect. (3pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DDB)
                              LREF
                              Blank 24 Filed: 11/6/2000, Entered: 11/8/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                              MINUTES:( Judge Donovan W. Frank / Bruce Tiffany)Continued Pltf's motion for preliminary injunction. Continued testimony of Richard Lurie. Taken under advisement.(1pg(s) (DDB)
                                LREF
                                Blank 23 Filed: 10/31/2000, Entered: 11/1/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                MINUTES:( Judge Donovan W. Frank / Bruce Tiffany) Pltf's motion for preliminary injunction. Pltf calls Richard Lurie as witness. Hearing continued to Monday, 11/6/00 at 1:30 p.m. All orders to remain in effect until then unless stipulated by parties. (1pg(s) (DDB)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 22 Filed: 10/27/2000, Entered: 10/30/2000 Affidavit
                                  AFFIDAVIT of Larry D. Espel regarding production of documents & information objection [19-1]. (10pg(s) (DDB)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 21 Filed: 10/27/2000, Entered: 10/30/2000 Response
                                    RESPONSE by pltf to defts' objection to production of certain documents & information [19-1]. (3pg(s) (DDB)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: 10/27/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                      NOTICE OF ( Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan ) pretrial conference set for 1:45 pm on 11/30/00; Rule 26(f) report ddl set for 11/24/00 pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (VEM)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 19 Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: 10/27/2000 Response - Miscellaneous
                                        OBJECTIONS by defendants to order dated 10/19/00. [18-1] to procductionof certain documents and information. 3 pg(s) (VEM)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 18 Filed: 10/19/2000, Entered: 10/23/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER ( Judge Donovan W. Frank / 10/18/00) Records relating to Equity Conservation Incorporated, the Pltf shall be entitled to all records of Equity Conservation, Inc. reveiwed by the Court from the time the underlying civil action was filed, namely 10/25/96, through the present. This order is stayed until 10/27/00 to permit the Defts to submit to the court any objections or argument as to why the provisions of this order shall not be implemented. 2 pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (VEM) Modified on 10/31/2000
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 17 Filed: 10/13/2000, Entered: 10/18/2000 BondCourt Filing
                                            BOND FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION in amount of $ 5000.00. Empire, Fire & Marine Insurance as surety. Bond No. 95962 filed by pltfs. Approved by the Honorable Judge Donovan W. Frank. (3pg(s) (DDB) Modified on 10/18/2000
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 16 Filed: 10/13/2000, Entered: 10/16/2000 Answer
                                              ANSWER by defts to the amended complaint. (4pg(s) (DDB)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/5/2000, Entered: 10/6/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER ( Judge Donovan W. Frank / 10/05/00) regarding Firstar Bank's production of documents. (10pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DDB) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/18/2004 (akl).
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/5/2000, Entered: 10/5/2000 Notice - Miscellaneous
                                                  NOTICE by William Gross, Elizabeth Gross of association of counsel Andrew Luger (MMC)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/5/2000, Entered: 10/5/2000 Notice - Miscellaneous
                                                    NOTICE by Richard Lurie, Francelyne Lurie, Adam Lurie, Option Resources of association of counsel John R Stoebner, David Andrew Harbeck (MMC)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 10/3/2000, Entered: 10/4/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed summons, amended complaint & motion papers for TRO upon deft Option Resources on 9/27/00. (1pg(s) (DDB)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 9/29/2000, Entered: 10/3/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        MEMORANDUM, OPINION, AND ORDER: ( Judge Donovan W. Frank ) Pltfs' motion for temporary restraining order [2-1], for preliminary injunction [2-2] and for attachment is GRANTED IN PART and PROVISONALLY DENIED IN PART [2-3]. This Order shall remain in effect until the evidentiary hearing scheduled for 9:00 a.m. on October 16, 2000, unless otherwise modified by the Court. (9pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DDB) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/18/2004 (akl).
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 9/28/2000, Entered: 10/3/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                          MINUTES:( Judge Donovan W. Frank / Julie Rixe, Shaddex) taking under advisement Pltf's motion for temporary restraining order [2-1] 1 pg(s) (VEM)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 9/26/2000, Entered: 9/27/2000 Affidavit
                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Francelyne Lurie regarding defts Francelyne Lurie & Richard Luries' memorandum in opposition to pltf's motion for temporary restraining order [2-1], motion for preliminary injunction [2-2] & their motion for order of attachment & notice of hearing & exemption notice [2-3]. (37pg(s) (DDB)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 9/26/2000, Entered: 9/27/2000 Affidavit
                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Richard Lurie regarding defts Richard Lurie & Francelyne Luries' memorandum in opposition to pltfs' motion for temporary restraining order [2-1], motion for preliminary injunction [2-2] & motion for order of attachment notice of hearing & exemption notice [2-3]. (10pg(s) (DDB)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 9/26/2000, Entered: 9/27/2000 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                MEMORANDUM by defts Richard Lurie & Francelyne Lurie in opposition to pltf's motion for temporary restraining order [2-1], pltf's motion for preliminary injunction [2-2] & pltf's motion for order of attachment & notice of hearing & exemption notice [2-3]. (14pg(s) (DDB)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 9/25/2000, Entered: 9/27/2000 Affidavit
                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Larry D. Espel in support of pltfs' motions for temporary restraining order [2-1], for preliminary injunction [2-2] & for order of attachment & notice of hearing & exemption notice [2-3]. (14pg(s) (DDB)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 9/25/2000, Entered: 9/27/2000 Affidavit
                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Deborah A. Bailey in support of pltfs' motions for temporary restraining order [2-1], for preliminary injunction [2-2] & for order of attachment & notice of hearing & exemption notice [2-3]. (2pg(s) (DDB)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 9/25/2000, Entered: 9/27/2000 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                      MEMORANDUM by pltfs in support of their motions for temporary restraining order [2-1], for preliminary injunction [2-2] & for an order of attachment & of hearing & exemption notice [2-3]. (3pg(s) (DDB)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 9/25/2000, Entered: 9/27/2000 Amended Complaint
                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT [1-1] by pltfs. (7pg(s) (DDB)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 9/21/2000, Entered: 9/21/2000 Affidavit
                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Larry D. Espel regarding pltfs' motions for TRO [2-1], for preliminary injunction [2-2] & for order of attachment notice of hearing & exemption notice [2-3]. (3pg(s) +EXHIBITS (DDB)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 9/21/2000, Entered: 9/21/2000 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                            MEMORANDUM by pltfs in support of their motions for temporary restraining order [2-1], for preliminary injunction [2-2] & for order of attachment & of hearing & exemption notice [2-3]. (11pg(s) (DDB)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 9/21/2000, Entered: 9/21/2000, Terminated: 10/19/2000 Motion for TROCourt Filing
                                                                              MOTION by pltf for temporary restraining order and for preliminary injunction and for order of attachment & notice of hearing & exemption notice ( to Judge Donovan W. Frank ) (3pg(s) (DDB)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 9/21/2000, Entered: 9/21/2000 ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                                                COMPLAINT - Summons issued. Assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Master list and referred to Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan. (6pg(s) (Receipt #236088) (DDB)
                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                  This case has been viewed 1,082 times.

                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                  Space
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                   
                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                  Need Password Help?