AMCO Insurance Company v. Los Gatos Auto Mall, Inc., et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 2007-1-CV-101833

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 20, 2018 at 4:07 AM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo AMCO Insurance Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Cole Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Nelson Cole +1 916 376 0486 +1 916 376 0478 scole@colenetlaw.com
v.
No Logo Auto First Financial Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Michael Fitzsimmons
No Logo Los Gatos Auto Mall, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Water Clarity Plumbing, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Clapp Moroney Bellagamba Vucinich Beeman & Scheley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Michael Vucinich +1 650 989 5400 +1 650 989 5499 jvucinich@clappmoroney.com
No Logo EP&G Properties, Cross Defendant
Case Type Other PI/PD/WD Unlimited (23)
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 17 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
S. N. Cole; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 05/09/2008
    Blank 16 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
    Consolidated with case# 106cv76550, signed by Judge Murphy.; Legacy Name = CV Ord:Consolidate with....; Decision = M; Closed = 05/13/2008
      Blank 15 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
      atty fitzsimmons; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 05/02/2008
        Blank 14 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
        S> V. Harrington; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 04/29/2008
          Blank 13 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: None Answer/Response (No Fee)
          atty gavin; Legacy Name = CV Answer - NO FEES DUE!; Decision = M; Closed = 04/08/2008
            Blank 12 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: None Answer/Response (No Fee)
            J. M. Fitzsimmons; Legacy Name = CV Answer - NO FEES DUE!; Decision = M; Closed = 04/07/2008
              Blank 11 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
              cross complt.; Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed; Decision = M; Closed = 03/20/2008
                Blank 10 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                cross complt.; Legacy Name = CV Summons Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 03/20/2008
                  Blank 9 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: None Cross Complaint
                  Atty Vucinich; Legacy Name = CV Cross-Complaint; Decision = M; Closed = 03/20/2008
                    Blank 8 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                    re (Atty J. Michael Fitzsimmons); Legacy Name = CV Answer, Unltd, w/fees; Decision = M; Closed = 03/13/2008
                      Blank 7 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: None Dismissal
                      as to Def Los Gatos Auto Mall, Inc. Only, Atty Cole; Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial W/O Prej; Decision = M; Closed = 03/06/2008
                        Blank 6 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                        CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 01/28/2008
                          Blank 5 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                          CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 01/28/2008
                            Blank 4 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                            atty vicinich; Legacy Name = CV Answer, Unltd, w/fees; Decision = M; Closed = 01/25/2008
                              Blank 3 Filed: 12/24/2007, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                              CV Summons Filed; Decision = M; Closed = 12/24/2007
                                Blank 2 Filed: 12/24/2007, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                atty: S. Cole; Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 12/24/2007
                                  Blank 1 Filed: 12/24/2007, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                  CV Case Cover Sheet; Decision = M; Closed = 12/24/2007

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?