Fingerhut Business v. Lenk, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:00-cv-02252-JMR-SRN

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Fingerhut Business Services, Inc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Marvin Companies, Inc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven C Tourek +1 651 686 2490 +1 651 686 2492 stourek@marvin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winthrop & Weinstine, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert R Weinstine +1 612 604 6613 +1 612 604 6813 rweinstine@winthrop.com
v.
No Logo Edward C Lenk, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew M Luger +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 aluger@gr-espel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Irell & Manella, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christine W S Byrd +1 310 277 1010 +1 310 203 7199
Office DMN
Filed 10/4/2000
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 320 - Personal Injury: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Hennepin
Terminated 11/21/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, FRC
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 11/21/2000, Entered: 11/24/2000 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL without prejudice 2pg(s) (SJH)
    LREF
    Blank 4 Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: 10/27/2000 MOTION - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
    LETTER RE: SVC OF DISPOSITIVE MOTION PAPERS by defendant to dismiss SVC LTR ( to Judge James M. Rosenbaum ) 1pg(s) (SJH)
      LREF
      Blank 3 Filed: 10/25/2000, Entered: 10/27/2000 Order
      PETITION AND ORDER for admission pro hac vice ( Clerk Francis E. Dosal ) on behalf of defendant by Christine W S Byrd 1pg(s) (DFL)
        LREF
        Blank 2 Filed: 10/11/2000, Entered: 10/13/2000 Acknowledgment of Service
        Summons - ADMISSION OF SERVICE by defendant on 10/9/00 2pg(s) (SJH)
          LREF
          Blank 1 Filed: 10/4/2000, Entered: 10/6/2000 ComplaintCourt Filing
          COMPLAINT - Summons issued. Assigned to Judge James M. Rosenbaum per Master list and referred to Magistrate Susan R. Nelson. (33pg(s) (DDB)
            LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 53 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?