West v. Mitchell
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-02694

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 12, 2020 at 1:33 PM DT (11 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Timothy West, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by #604-876

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy West
v.
No Logo Andrew Eddy, Defendant
No Logo Andrew Weurstner, Defendant
No Logo David Hannah, Defendant
No Logo Dr. Janice Douglas, Defendant
No Logo Elizabeth Labutta, Defendant
No Logo Ivan Roberts, Defendant
No Logo James Wesson, Defendant
No Logo Jennifer Gellice, Defendant
No Logo Karen Stanforth, Defendant
No Logo LaShann Eppinger, Defendant
No Logo Lt. Diamond, Defendant
No Logo Nurse Mitchell, Defendant
No Logo Nurse Snowden, Defendant
No Logo Ronald Armbruster, Defendant
No Logo Tina Costello, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: None memorandum opinion and order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/6/2020, Entered: None Extension (Other)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/30/2020, Entered: None Extension (Other)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: None Extension (Other)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: None Extension (of deadlines)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: None Reconsideration
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/10/2019, Entered: None Compel Discovery
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: None Leave
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: None Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/6/2019, Entered: None Minute Order _ Case Management Conference
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/2/2019, Entered: None Case Management Conference Scheduling Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: None Leave
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: None Relief
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None memorandum opinion and order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: None Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: 11/20/2018 Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                          Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Timothy West. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Inmate demand statement)(S,SR)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: 11/20/2018 Complaint
                                            Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Timothy West. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Informal complaints, # 3 envelope) (S,SR)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case, (S,SR)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (S,SR)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?