NATIONAL COUNCIL FOR ADOPTION v. POMPEO
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-02704

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 4, 2020 at 6:19 PM DT (11.6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo NATIONAL COUNCIL FOR ADOPTION, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kwaku Akowuah, Counsel kakowuah@sidley.com
v.
No Logo CARL C. RISCH, Defendant
Pompeo, Michael Richard Pompeo, Michael Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "MICHAEL R. POMPEO"
No Logo SCOTT RENNER, Defendant
No Logo TRISH MASKEW, Defendant
United States Department of State United States Department of State, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE"
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 704
Nature of Suit 899 - Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
  Entries (66) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/4/2020, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/4/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/20/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Strike
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/20/2020, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/12/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/5/2019, Entered: None Joint Appendix
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/30/2019, Entered: None Strike
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/22/2019, Entered: None Reply to (non-motion) Document
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/22/2019, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Amicus Brief
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/21/2019, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: None Amicus Brief
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: None Amicus Brief
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/29/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/29/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/26/2019, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: None Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/23/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: None Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/19/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/19/2019, Entered: None Administrative Record
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: None Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: None Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: None Administrative Record
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: None Administrative Record
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: None Administrative Record
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/27/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: 11/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  RULE 26a1 STATEMENT. (Akowuah, Kwaku)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: 11/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against NATIONAL COUNCIL FOR ADOPTION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5801887) filed by NATIONAL COUNCIL FOR ADOPTION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons Pompeo, # 6 Summons Risch, # 7 Summons Renner, # 8 Summons Maskew, # 9 Summons Department of State, # 10 Summons Attorney General, # 11 Summons Liu)(Akowuah, Kwaku)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?