RAMOS v. DOMINICAN REPUBLIC
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-02669

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 10, 2019 at 5:48 PM DT (1.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JULIO RAMOS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by #60283-004

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JULIO RAMOS
v.
No Logo DOMINICAN REPUBLIC, Defendant
No Logo EDUARDO SULMAN, Defendant
No Logo JOHN AND JANE DOE, Defendant
No Logo JOSE TOMAS PERZ, Defendant
No Logo MIGUEL MALDONALDO, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/15/2019, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/15/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: None Order Dismissing Pro Se Case
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: None Response to Order of the Court
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 10/24/2018. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 11 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?