R. Bruce, et al v. Bitmicro Networks, Inc., et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 2013-1-CV-247543

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 20, 2018 at 3:01 PM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Bruce, Leonila T., Plaintiff
No Logo Bruce, Rey, Plaintiff
No Logo Bruce, Ricardo, Plaintiff
No Logo Bruce, Rodolfo, Plaintiff
No Logo BRUCE ROSS, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Bitmicro Networks, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Carson, William, Defendant
No Logo Rankin, Alex, Defendant
No Logo Shapowal, Dave, Defendant
No Logo Uriarte, Stephen, Defendant
Case Type Fraud Unlimited (16)
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (59) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 59 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None Minute Order
    Blank 58 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None Minute Order
    Minutes Non-Criminal
      Blank 57 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None Minute Order
      Minutes Non-Criminal
        Blank 56 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Notice of Hearing (no fee)
        ARB-Ntc:Case Status Rev Pend Arb; Decision = M; Closed = 06/16/2015
          Blank 55 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None Request Dismissal
          by atty Smith as to Plt Rey Bruce only; Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial; Decision = M; Closed = 06/12/2015
            Blank 54 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None Report
            status of Rey Bruce's claim in bankruptcy; Atty Smith; Legacy Name = CV Report of...
              Blank 53 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Notice of Hearing (no fee)
              ARB-Ntc:Case Status Rev Pend Arb; Decision = M; Closed = 12/10/2014
                Blank 52 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                Atty: Vanni; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 11/24/2014
                  Blank 51 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Substitution-Attorney
                  old smith; new finwall; Legacy Name = CV Substitution of Attorney; Decision = M; Closed = 10/30/2014
                    Blank 50 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Substitution-Attorney
                    Old - Harold Smith; New - Harold Smith.; Legacy Name = CV Substitution of Attorney; Decision = M; Closed = 10/27/2014
                      Blank 49 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                      Atty Harold P. Smith; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 10/27/2014
                        Blank 48 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
                        sub/atty - Rudy Bruce is not a party in the case.; Legacy Name = CV Clerk Rejection Ltr; Decision = M; Closed = 10/27/2014
                          Blank 47 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Substitution-Attorney
                          old Harold Smith,; new Gordon Finwall; Legacy Name = CV Substitution of Attorney; Decision = M; Closed = 10/27/2014
                            Blank 46 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Substitution-Attorney
                            old Harold Smith,; new Gordon Finwall; Legacy Name = CV Substitution of Attorney; Decision = M; Closed = 10/27/2014
                              Blank 45 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Substitution-Attorney
                              old Harold Smith,; new Gordon Finwall; Legacy Name = CV Substitution of Attorney; Decision = M; Closed = 10/27/2014
                                Blank 44 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                Re:Notice of Stay of Proceedings; Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 10/16/2014
                                  Blank 43 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Restored to court's control
                                    Blank 42 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Notice: Stay of Proceedings All Parties
                                    as to Rey Bruce; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Stay of Proceedings; Decision = M; Closed = 10/16/2014
                                      Blank 41 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                      Atty Sheeva J. Ghassemi-Vanni; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 09/24/2014
                                        Blank 40 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                        Atty Smith.; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 09/22/2014
                                          Blank 39 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                          CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 05/28/2014
                                            Blank 38 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                            Atty Brandes.; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 05/28/2014
                                              Blank 37 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                              CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 05/22/2014
                                                Blank 36 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                Atty Ghassemi-Vanni.; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 05/21/2014
                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                  Atty Smith.; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 03/26/2014
                                                    Blank 34 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                    atty stanton; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 03/26/2014
                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                      re (Atty P. Brandes); Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 01/06/2014
                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None Stipulation and Order: Ex ParteCourt Filing
                                                        GRANTED staying action pending arb. CMC set for 01/21/14 is vacated and set for 04/10/14 @ 10am in dept 5. See file for details. Granted by Judge Arand (Lee); Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Stip/Order; Decision = G; Closed = 12/09/2013
                                                          Blank 31 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                          joint stip/ord extending time for DEFs to answer or otherwise respond to Complt -- DEFs' time to answer, demur, respond to Complt w/b extended to 12/9/13 -- Granted by Judge Stoelker; Legacy Name = CV Stip & Order/$20 fee; Decision = G; Closed = 11/25/2013
                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                            (Atty Smith); Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 10/15/2013
                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                              atty: Lee; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 10/11/2013
                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                atty smith; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 09/30/2013
                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                  E. Stanton; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 09/26/2013
                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None Errata
                                                                    in FAC, Atty: Brandes; Legacy Name = CV Errata; Decision = M; Closed = 09/13/2013
                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None Complaint - Amended
                                                                      Atty Smith; Legacy Name = CV 1st Amended Complaint; Decision = M; Closed = 09/12/2013
                                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None Jury Fee Deposit
                                                                        $150.00 jury fee deposit for PLTs; Legacy Name = CV Jury Fee Deposit; Decision = M; Closed = 09/09/2013
                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None Substitution-Attorney
                                                                          old Cardosi / new Smith; Legacy Name = CV Substitution of Attorney; Decision = M; Closed = 09/03/2013
                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None Stipulation and Order: Ex ParteCourt Filing
                                                                            Granting Joint Stipulation and Def shall have until 9-30-13 to file an Answer or Demurrer by Judge Stoelker; Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Stip/Order; Decision = M; Closed = 09/03/2013
                                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None Order: Submitted MatterCourt Filing
                                                                              Preliminary Injunction DENIED (Judge Carol Overton); Legacy Name = Order on Submitted Matter; Decision = D; Closed = 08/23/2013
                                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                stip and order extending time for defs to answer or otherwise respond; Garnted by Judge Arand; see file for details.; Legacy Name = CV Stip & Order/$20 fee; Decision = G; Closed = 08/02/2013
                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                  to ex parte appl exclude or limit oral testimony @ hrg on prelim inj, John P. Cardosi; Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 06/21/2013
                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                    of Felix S. Lee, of ex parte appl for ord precluding oral testimony @ hrg; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 06/21/2013
                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None Application: Ex Parte (Fee Applies)
                                                                                      ** 6-28 PER ADRAIN W/ATTY LEE - THE JUDGE DIDN'T SIGN ANYTHING ** for ord precluding oral testimony @ hrg; memo p&as, Felix S. Lee; Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Appl; Decision = M; Closed = 06/21/2013
                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                        intent to introduce oral testimony; Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 06/20/2013
                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                          of Stephen Uriarte; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 06/19/2013
                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                            of William Carson; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 06/19/2013
                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                              of Alex Rankin; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 06/19/2013
                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                of Dave Shapowal; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 06/19/2013
                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                  CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 06/19/2013
                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                                    to OSC re: preliminary injunction; Legacy Name = CV Response; Decision = M; Closed = 06/19/2013
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                                                      taken on response to OSC re: preliminary injunction; Legacy Name = CV First Paper Def - Unltd; Decision = M; Closed = 06/19/2013
                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                                                                        CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 06/12/2013
                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day
                                                                                                          CV Court Reporter's Fee; Decision = M; Closed = 06/07/2013
                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None Order: Ex ParteCourt Filing
                                                                                                            Granting Ex Parte Application and Set Hearing on OSC/TRO re: Preliminary Injunction on 6-24-13 @2pm in d-2 by Judge Overton; Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Order; Decision = M; Closed = 06/07/2013
                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                              of Rey Bruce, of appl for tro & prelim inj; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 06/07/2013
                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None Motion: Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                & tro, John P. Cardosi; Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte OSC re Prelim Inj; Decision = M; Closed = 06/07/2013
                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                                                                                                  CV Summons Filed; Decision = M; Closed = 06/06/2013
                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                                                                    CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 06/06/2013
                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                      CV Case Cover Sheet; Decision = M; Closed = 06/06/2013

                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?