Hidalgo County Drainage District No, 1 v. Integ Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 7:18-cv-00369

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 4, 2019 at 12:39 PM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Hidalgo County Drainage District No. 1, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Butcher & Blanchard, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael Joshua Blanchard +1 210 888 9299 +1 210 910 6577 michael@blanchardfirm.com
v.
No Logo Annie Q. Garza, Defendant
No Logo Dannenbaum Engineering Company-McAllen LLC, Defendant
No Logo Dannenbaum Engineering Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Dos Logistics, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Godfrey Garza, III, Defendant
No Logo Godfrey Garza, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Integ Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Jonathan Garza, Defendant
No Logo Tedsi Infrastructure Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Valley Data Collection Specialists, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Mail Returned Undeliverable
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/29/2019, Entered: None Notice of Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: None Summons - Request for Issuance
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Clerks Notice of Filing Fee Due (FORM, noticing) - Civil
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/23/2018, Entered: 11/23/2018 Order for Initial Conference - FORMCourt Filing
          ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/6/2019 at 02:30 PM before Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa(by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: 11/21/2018 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc
            AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Hidalgo County Drainage District No. 1. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Meeting Minutes, # 2 Exhibit B - Integ Invoice, # 3 Exhibit C - Integ Invoice, # 4 Exhibit D - Integ Invoice, # 5 Exhibit E - Integ Invoice, # 6 Exhibit F - Integ Invoice, # 7 Exhibit G - Integ Invoice, # 8 Exhibit H - Integ Invoice, # 9 Exhibit I - Integ Invoice, # 10 Exhibit J - Integ Invoice, # 11 Exhibit K - Integ Invoice, # 12 Exhibit L - Integ Invoice, # 13 Exhibit M - Integ Invoice, # 14 Exhibit N - Integ Invoice, # 15 Exhibit O - Integ Invoice, # 16 Exhibit P - Agenda Item, # 17 Exhibit Q - VDCS Invoices, # 18 Exhibit R - DEC / HCDD1 Contract, # 19 Exhibit S - DEC / VDCS Contract, # 20 Exhibit T - DEC / VDCS Contract, # 21 Exhibit U - Construction Management Work Auths, # 22 Exhibit V - Supp. Agmts. Topography Svcs., # 23 Exhibit W - Conflict of Interest Questionnaires, # 24 Exhibit X - Part 1 Cert. of Merit, # 25 Exhibit X - Part 2 Cert. of Merit, # 26 Exhibit X - Part 3 Cert. of Merit, # 27 Exhibit X - Part 4 Cert. of Merit, # 28 Exhibit Y - Godfrey Garza Dep., # 29 Exhibit Z - Annie Garza Dep., # 30 Exhibit AA - VDCS Filings, # 31 Exhibit BB - Dec. Hugo Gonzalez, # 32 Exhibit CC - 2000 Integ Agmt., # 33 Exhibit DD - Banking Records, # 34 Exhibit EE - Req. to ID Subcontractors, # 35 Exhibit FF - Integ Agmt., # 36 Exhibit HH - Meeting Minutes, # 37 Exhibit II - Meeting Minutes, # 38 Exhibit JJ - Phillips Affidavit, # 39 Exhibit KK - Federal Forms, # 40 Exhibit LL - Quarterly Performance Reports, # 41 Exhibit MM - Grant Award, # 42 Exhibit NN - Grant Amendment 1, # 43 Exhibit OO - Grant Amendment 2, # 44 Exhibit PP - Grant Amendment 3, # 45 Exhibit QQ - Grant Amendment 4, # 46 Exhibit RR - Dos Logistics / HCDD1 Contract, # 47 Exhibit SS - Dos Logistics / HCDD1 Contract, # 48 Exhibit TT - TEDSI / HCDD1 Contract, # 49 Exhibit UU - TEDSI / HCDD1 Contract, # 50 Exhibit VV - Stat Court Dismissal Without Prejudice)(Blanchard, Michael)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: 11/20/2018 SEALED Order
              Sealed Order, filed.
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 6 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?