Armstrong V. Sgarlato R.P. Inc, Et Al.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 2009-1-CV-146589

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 21, 2018 at 3:55 AM ST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Armstrong, Scott, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Sizemore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sizemore, Paul +1 310 322 8800
v.
No Logo Abott Laboratories, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian J. Mooney +4159 865 900 3181 +1 415 986 8054 bmooney@gordonrees.com
No Logo B. Braun of America, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Hospira, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian J. Mooney +4159 865 900 3181 +1 415 986 8054 bmooney@gordonrees.com
AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Interested Party
No Logo Benson, Jarred, Interested Party
No Logo Breg, Inc., Interested Party
No Logo Dial, George L, Interested Party
No Logo Fisher, James, Interested Party
No Logo Graves, Terry, Interested Party
No Logo Hospira Worldwide, Inc., Interested Party
No Logo I-flow Corporation, Interested Party
No Logo Jackson, Renee, Interested Party
No Logo Kairis, Glenda, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica L Wilber

Toggle Switch Represented by Hodes Milman Liebeck Mosier, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey A Milman +1 949 640 8222 +1 949 640 8294 jmilman@hml-lawyers.com
No Logo Kilgore, Sharon, Interested Party
No Logo Kratz, Craig, Interested Party
No Logo Laliberte, James, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica L Wilber

Toggle Switch Represented by Hodes Milman Liebeck Mosier, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey A Milman +1 949 640 8222 +1 949 640 8294 jmilman@hml-lawyers.com
No Logo Lape, Jeffrey, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica L Wilber

Toggle Switch Represented by Hodes Milman Liebeck Mosier, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey A Milman +1 949 640 8222 +1 949 640 8294 jmilman@hml-lawyers.com
No Logo Mansker, Roy, Interested Party
No Logo Mcdaniel, Sean, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica L Wilber

Toggle Switch Represented by Hodes Milman Liebeck Mosier, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey A Milman +1 949 640 8222 +1 949 640 8294 jmilman@hml-lawyers.com
No Logo Mickelson, Kathy, Interested Party
No Logo Ojendyk, Traci, Interested Party
No Logo Peters, Patricia, Interested Party
No Logo Richmond, Gregory, Interested Party
No Logo Salazar-Briones, Merry, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica L Wilber

Toggle Switch Represented by Hodes Milman Liebeck Mosier, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey A Milman +1 949 640 8222 +1 949 640 8294 jmilman@hml-lawyers.com
No Logo Sherman, Ivie, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica L Wilber

Toggle Switch Represented by Hodes Milman Liebeck Mosier, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey A Milman +1 949 640 8222 +1 949 640 8294 jmilman@hml-lawyers.com
No Logo Smith, Patrick, Interested Party
No Logo Stryker Corporation, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ralph A. Campillo +1 310 586 3200 +1 310 586 3202 racampillo@mintz.com
No Logo Stryker Sales Corporation, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ralph A. Campillo +1 310 586 3200 +1 310 586 3202 racampillo@mintz.com
No Logo Turner, Brian, Interested Party
No Logo Wallin, Carolyn, Interested Party
No Logo Weidt, Diana, Interested Party
No Logo Yates, Anthony, Interested Party
No Logo Zuck, Allen, Interested Party
No Logo B. Braun Medical Inc., Defendant/Cross Complainant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Lynberg & Watkins

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Jay Larin +1 213 624 8700 +1 213 892 2763 mlarin@lynberg.com
No Logo Sgarlato Laboratories, Inc., Defendant/Cross Defendant
No Logo SGARLATO R.P., INC., Defendant/Cross Defendant
Case Type Product Liability Unlimited (24)
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (93) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 93 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None Request Dismissal
#G-65067; Dismissal With Prejudice of the Entire Action; (Atty D. Watkins); Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/Prej; Decision = M; Closed = 08/11/2014
    Blank 92 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
    CV Summons Filed; Decision = M; Closed = 12/04/2013
      Blank 91 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
      #G-24127; Order issued by the Judicial Council of California Authorizing the Presiding Judge of the Superior Court of California, County of Orange, to Appoint a Coordination Trial Judge, signed by Chief Justice Ronald George.; Legacy Name = CV Order; Decision = M; Closed = 07/22/2010
        Blank 90 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None Dismissal
        #G-23992; Dismissal Without Prejudice of the Complaint filed 7/6/09 against Defendant B. Braun of America, Inc. only (Atty J. Paul Sizemore); Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial W/O Prej; Decision = M; Closed = 07/19/2010
          Blank 89 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None Errata
          [Copy of]; Errata to Decl of Charles G. Kabele re Filing and Service of Notice of Submission; Legacy Name = CV Errata; Decision = M; Closed = 07/06/2010
            Blank 88 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None Declaration in Support
            [Copy of]; Decl of Charles G. Kabele re Filing and Service of Notice of Submission; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 07/06/2010
              Blank 87 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None appendix
              [Copy of]; Compendium of Exhibits in support of I-Flow Corporation's Petition for Coordination of Add-On Cases (Atty C. Kabele); Legacy Name = CV Appendix; Decision = M; Closed = 07/06/2010
                Blank 86 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None Request-Judicial Notice
                [Copy of]; Request for Judicial Notice in support of I-Flow Corporation's Petition for Coordination of Add-On Cases (Atty C. Kabele); Legacy Name = CV Req:Judicial Ntc; Decision = M; Closed = 07/06/2010
                  Blank 85 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                  [Copy of]; Decl of Crystal L. Van Der Putten in support of I-Flow Corporation's Petition for Add-On Cases; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 07/06/2010
                    Blank 84 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                    [Copy of]; Decl of Charles G. Kabele in support of I-Flow Corporation's Petition for Coordination of Add-On Cases; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 07/06/2010
                      Blank 83 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None Notice
                      [Copy of]; Defendant I-Flow Corporation's Notice of Potential Add-On Cases and Petition for Coordination of Add-On Cases (Atty Charles G. Kabele); Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 07/06/2010
                        Blank 82 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                        #G-23082; [Copy of] Order Setting Preliminary Trial Conference for 6/28/10, signed by Coordination Trial Judge, Hon. Gail Andler, Orange County Superior Court.; Legacy Name = CV Order; Decision = M; Closed = 06/07/2010
                          Blank 81 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None Order
                          #G-22773; Copies of Minute Order issued by Los Angeles County Superior Court on May 17, 2010 and Order Granting Plaintiffs' Petition for Coordination, filed in the Los Angeles County Superior Court on May 17, 2010; Legacy Name = CV Order; Decision = M; Closed = 05/24/2010
                            Blank 80 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None Supplemental
                            [Copy of] Supplemental Reply in support of Petition for Coordination (Atty J. Paul Sizemore); Legacy Name = CV Supplemental; Decision = M; Closed = 05/10/2010
                              Blank 79 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                              [Copy of] Objection and Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs' Untimely "Supplemental Reply" in support of Petition for Coordination (Atty Ralph A. Campillo); Legacy Name = CV Objection...; Decision = M; Closed = 05/07/2010
                                Blank 78 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None Dismissal
                                #G-22263; Dismissal Without Prejudice of Complaint as to Defendants Abbott Laboratories and Hospira Worldwide, Inc. only (Atty Christopher Spain); Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial W/O Prej; Decision = M; Closed = 05/05/2010
                                  Blank 77 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                  [Copy of] Decl of Christopher T. Williams in support of Verified Application of Kathleen S. Hardway; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 05/03/2010
                                    Blank 76 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None Notice
                                    [Copy of] Notice of Verified Application and Verified Application of Kathleen S. Hardway to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice; Memo of P&A (Atty Christopher T. Williams).; Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 05/03/2010
                                      Blank 75 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                      [Copy of] Reply in support of Petition for Coordination (Atty Joshua Parilman); Legacy Name = CV Reply; Decision = M; Closed = 04/26/2010
                                        Blank 74 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                        [Copy of] Opposition to Petition for Coordination; Decl of Jenny A. Covington in support thereof; Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 04/23/2010
                                          Blank 73 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition
                                          [Copy of] Decl of Kathleen S. Hardway in opposition to Petition for Coordination; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 04/22/2010
                                            Blank 72 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                            [Copy of] Memo of P&A in opposition to Petition for Coordination (Atty Ben D. Whitwell); Legacy Name = CV Memo:Ps & As/Opposn to Mtn; Decision = M; Closed = 04/22/2010
                                              Blank 71 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                              [Copy of] Response in support of Petition for Coordination (Atty Jeffrey A. Milman); Legacy Name = CV Response; Decision = M; Closed = 04/22/2010
                                                Blank 70 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None appendix
                                                [Copy of] Compendium of Non-Calif Authorities in suppt of Opposition to Petition for Coordination (Atty Sara G. Noel); Legacy Name = CV Appendix; Decision = M; Closed = 04/20/2010
                                                  Blank 69 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition
                                                  [Copy of] Decl of Sara G. Noel in opposition to Petition for Coordination; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 04/20/2010
                                                    Blank 68 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                    (Atty Peter A. Strotz); Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 04/20/2010
                                                      Blank 67 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                      [Copy of] Opposition to Petition for Coordination (Atty Peter Strotz); Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 04/20/2010
                                                        Blank 66 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition
                                                        [Copy of] Decl of Christopher P. Norton in opposition to Petition for Coordination; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 04/20/2010
                                                          Blank 65 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                          [Copy of] Memo of P&A in opposition to Petition for Coordination (Atty Christopher Norton); Legacy Name = CV Memo:Ps & As/Opposn to Mtn; Decision = M; Closed = 04/20/2010
                                                            Blank 64 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                            [Copy of] Response in opposition to Petition for Coordination (Atty C. Norton); Legacy Name = CV Response; Decision = M; Closed = 04/20/2010
                                                              Blank 63 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                              [Copy of] Opposition to Petition for Coordination; Decl of James J. Yukevich (Atty J. Yukevich); Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 04/20/2010
                                                                Blank 62 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                (Atty James J. Yukevich); Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 04/20/2010
                                                                  Blank 61 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None Notice
                                                                  [Copy of] Notice of Submission of Opposition to Petition for Coordination (Atty James J. Yukevich); Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 04/20/2010
                                                                    Blank 60 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None Pleading: Amended
                                                                    [Copy of] Amended Memo of P&A in opposition to Petition for Coordination (Atty Vita J. Maselis); Legacy Name = CV Amended Pleading; Decision = M; Closed = 04/20/2010
                                                                      Blank 59 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None Notice
                                                                      [Copy of] Notice of Continuance of Hearing on Petition for Coordination (Atty C. Spain); Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 04/20/2010
                                                                        Blank 58 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                        [Copy of] Memo of P&A in oppo to Petition for Coordination; Decl of Vita J. Masellis in suppt thereof; Legacy Name = CV Memo:Ps & As/Opposn to Mtn; Decision = M; Closed = 03/29/2010
                                                                          Blank 57 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          #G-21347; Order Staying Action Pending Coordination Proceedings in Los Angeles County Superior Court, signed by Judge Joseph H. Huber.; Legacy Name = CV Order; Decision = M; Closed = 03/24/2010
                                                                            Blank 56 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            #G-21347; COPY of Order Assigning Coordination Motion Judge (Los Angeles County Superior Court) and Setting Date for Hearing, signed by Chief Justice Ronald George, issued in I-Flow, Inc., et al. Cases, JCCP No. 4615.; Legacy Name = CV Order; Decision = M; Closed = 03/24/2010
                                                                              Blank 55 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              #G-21314; Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Application of Richard J. Hood, signed by Judge Joseph H. Huber.; Legacy Name = CV Order; Decision = M; Closed = 03/23/2010
                                                                                Blank 54 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                appl for pro hac vice g20806; Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 03/01/2010
                                                                                  Blank 53 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                  g20806; Legacy Name = CV Memo:Ps & As/Suppt of Mtn; Decision = M; Closed = 03/01/2010
                                                                                    Blank 52 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                    g20806; Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 08/11/2014
                                                                                      Blank 51 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None Application-Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                      EF #G-20806; Pro Hac Vice Application of Richard J. Hood - GRANTED, PER MINUTE ORDER ISSUED 3/15/10 (JUDGE JOSEPH H. HUBER); Legacy Name = CV Appl/Ord:Appear Pro Hac Vice; Decision = M; Closed = 08/11/2014
                                                                                        Blank 50 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                        Notice of Submission of Petition for Coordination, along with 22 other cases, into the consolidated matter of Patrick R. Smith, et al. v. I-Flow, Inc., et al., Los Angeles County Superior Court, Case No. BC417154, assigned to the Honorable Judge Emilie Elias (Central Civil West) [Atty J. Paul Sizemore]; Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 02/25/2010
                                                                                          Blank 49 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None Motion-Strike
                                                                                          1st amended complaint, set for 04/16/10 at 9:00am in Dept. 8, by atty Mooney.; ef# G-20548.; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Mtn to Strike; Decision = M; Closed = 02/10/2010
                                                                                            Blank 48 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                            Lodgment of foreign authority in support of demurrer to 1st amended complaint, set for 04/16/10 at 9:00am in Dept. 8, by atty Mooney.; ef# G-20548.; Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 02/10/2010
                                                                                              Blank 47 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                              To 1st amended complaint, set for 04/16/10 at 9:00am in Dept. 8, by atty Mooney.; ef# G-20548.; Legacy Name = CV Memo:Ps & As/Suppt of Demurrer; Decision = M; Closed = 02/10/2010
                                                                                                Blank 46 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None Demurrer
                                                                                                Set for 04/16/10 at 9:00am in Dept. 8, by atty Mooney.; ef# G-20548.; Legacy Name = CV Demurrer, 1st Amended Complaint; Decision = M; Closed = 02/10/2010
                                                                                                  Blank 45 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                  EF #G-20472; CMC reset from 3-26-10 to 4-16-10, by the Court.; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Continued CMC; Decision = M; Closed = 02/04/2010
                                                                                                    Blank 44 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                    lodgment of foreign Authorities in support; ef# G-20468; Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 02/04/2010
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 43 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: None Demurrer
                                                                                                      to 1st amended compl.; ef# G-20468; Legacy Name = CV Demurrer, no fees; Decision = M; Closed = 02/04/2010
                                                                                                        Blank 42 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: None Demurrer
                                                                                                        to 1st amended compl. 4-16-10 9:00am dept.8 Michael larin; ef# G-20468; Legacy Name = CV Demurrer & Ntc of Hrg; Decision = M; Closed = 02/04/2010
                                                                                                          Blank 41 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: None Motion (Other)
                                                                                                          mtn to strike 1st amended compl. 4-16-10 9:00am dept.8 Michael larin; ef# G-20468; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Motion/no fee; Decision = M; Closed = 02/04/2010
                                                                                                            Blank 40 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: None Document: Complex Lit
                                                                                                            taken on ntc of mtn to strike 4-16-10 9:00am dept.8 Michael larin; ef# G-20468; Legacy Name = CV Complex First Paper; Decision = M; Closed = 02/04/2010
                                                                                                              Blank 39 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                              EF #G-20158; CMC reset from 1-29-10 to 3-26-10, by the Court.; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Continued CMC; Decision = M; Closed = 01/21/2010
                                                                                                                Blank 38 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                                CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 01/07/2010
                                                                                                                  Blank 37 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: None Complaint - Amended
                                                                                                                  CV 1st Amended Complaint; Decision = M; Closed = 01/07/2010
                                                                                                                    Blank 36 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    EF #G-19505; Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Application of Terry M. Henry, signed by Judge Joseph H. Huber.; Legacy Name = CV Order; Decision = M; Closed = 12/15/2009
                                                                                                                      Blank 35 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                                      EF #G-19054; Proof of Service to State Bar of California re Notice of Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice (Atty Vita J. Masellis); Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 08/11/2014
                                                                                                                        Blank 34 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                                        EF #G-19504; Proof of Service to State Bar of California re Notice of Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice (Atty Vita J. Masellis); Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 08/11/2014
                                                                                                                          Blank 33 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                          EF #G-19438; CMC reset from 12/18/09 to 1/29/10, by the Court.; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Continued CMC; Decision = M; Closed = 12/10/2009
                                                                                                                            Blank 32 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None waiverCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            EF #G-19437; Waiver of Disqualification and Consent to Assignment to Judge Joseph H. Huber, signed by Plaintiff Scott Armstrong.; Legacy Name = CV Waiver; Decision = M; Closed = 12/10/2009
                                                                                                                              Blank 31 Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: None waiverCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              of disqualification and consent to assignment to Judge Huber *ef-19403*; Legacy Name = CV Waiver; Decision = M; Closed = 12/09/2009
                                                                                                                                Blank 30 Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                Lodgment of Foreign Authority in Support of Defendants Hospira, Inc. and Abbott Laboratories' Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint (with Exhibits 1-7 Attached) ; #G-19401; Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 12/08/2009
                                                                                                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                                                                  #G-19401; Legacy Name = CV Memo:Ps & As/Suppt of Demurrer; Decision = M; Closed = 12/08/2009
                                                                                                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                    #G-19401; Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 12/08/2009
                                                                                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: None Demurrer
                                                                                                                                      to Plaintiff's Complaint ; (B. J. Mooney); 1/8/10, 9a, D-8; EF #G-19401; Legacy Name = CV Demurrer & Ntc of Hrg; Decision = M; Closed = 12/08/2009
                                                                                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None Application-Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                        g19115; Legacy Name = CV Appl/Ord:Appear Pro Hac Vice; Decision = M; Closed = 08/11/2014
                                                                                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None waiverCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          EF #G-19101; Waiver of Disqualification and Consent to Assignment to Judge Joseph H. Huber (Atty Patrick Salceda); Legacy Name = CV Waiver; Decision = M; Closed = 11/20/2009
                                                                                                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                            EF #G-18973; CMC reset from 12/8/09 to 12/18/09, by the Court.; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Continued CMC; Decision = M; Closed = 11/13/2009
                                                                                                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None Notice: Reassignment of Case
                                                                                                                                              CV Ntc:Reassignment of Case; Decision = M; Closed = 11/12/2009
                                                                                                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                Order on Request for Action regarding late submittal of Waiver of Order of Recusal. Signed by Judge Huber; Legacy Name = CV Order; Decision = M; Closed = 11/12/2009
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                                                                                                                  CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 11/09/2009
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                                                                                                                    CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 11/09/2009
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                                                                                                                      CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 11/09/2009
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        on Stipulation of parties to extend time for deft Abbott Laboratories to file its response to pltf's complaint to 12/8/09 signed by Judge Levinger.; Legacy Name = CV Order; Decision = G; Closed = 11/10/2009
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                                                                                                          M. Larin; Legacy Name = CV Complex Answer; Decision = M; Closed = 11/03/2009
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                                                                                                                                            on x-cmplt; Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed; Decision = M; Closed = 11/03/2009
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                                                                                                                                              on x-cmplt; Legacy Name = CV Summons Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 11/03/2009
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                M. J. Larin; summons issued; Legacy Name = CV Cross-Complaint; Decision = M; Closed = 11/03/2009
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: None Notice: Reassignment of Case
                                                                                                                                                                  CV Ntc:Reassignment of Case; Decision = M; Closed = 11/02/2009
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    EF #G-18647 [RECUSAL]; Notice Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 170.1(a)(3)(A) and Order, signed by Judge Joseph H. Huber.; Legacy Name = CV Order; Decision = M; Closed = 10/20/2009
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                      EF #G-18561 ; Application/Stip for Extension of Time for Deft Abbott Laboratories' Response to Plaintiff's Complaint (Atty Brian J. Mooney); Legacy Name = CV Stipulation; Decision = M; Closed = 10/15/2009
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None Document: Complex Lit
                                                                                                                                                                        taken on application/stipulation for extension of time for def Abbott Laboratories' response to plt's complaint. Brian J. Mooney; ef# G-18561; Legacy Name = CV Complex First Paper; Decision = M; Closed = 10/15/2009
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          EF #G-18554; Order on Hospira, Inc.'s and Plaintiff's Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint, signed by Judge Joseph H. Huber.; Deft Hospira, Inc. shall have until and including 12/8/09 to file their responses to Plaintiff's Complaint.; Legacy Name = CV Order; Decision = M; Closed = 10/08/2009
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None Application
                                                                                                                                                                            EF #G-18553; Appl & Stip for Extension of Time for Deft Hospira, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiff's Complaint (Atty Patrick S. Salceda); Legacy Name = CV Application...; Decision = M; Closed = 10/08/2009
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None Document: Complex Lit
                                                                                                                                                                              appl & stip for extension of time; Legacy Name = CV Complex First Paper; Decision = M; Closed = 10/08/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None Order: Deeming Case ComplexCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                EF #G-17112; signed by Judge Joseph H. Huber; Legacy Name = CV Order Deeming Case Complex; Decision = M; Closed = 07/29/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                                                                                                                                  CV Complex Complaint; Decision = M; Closed = 07/06/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                    CV Case Cover Sheet; Decision = M; Closed = 07/06/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: None Complex Litigation: Provisional
                                                                                                                                                                                      boxes 7 through 12 checked; Legacy Name = CV Complex Lit/Provisional; Decision = M; Closed = 07/06/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                        CV Summons Filed; Decision = M; Closed = 07/06/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                          CV Summons Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 07/06/2009

                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?