A. Hiramanek v. N. Daruwalla, et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 2010-1-CV-164055

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 21, 2018 at 9:01 AM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Hiramanek, Adil, Plaintiff
v.
Coldwell Banker Corporation Coldwell Banker Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Coldwell Banker"
No Logo Daruwalla, Nina, Defendant
Case Type Breach of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06)
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (75) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 75 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition
of Moncia Burneikis to mtn to strike/tax costs; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 09/10/2010
    Blank 74 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None Proof of Service
    CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 08/16/2010
      Blank 73 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None Declaration in Support
      CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 08/06/2010
        Blank 72 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None Motion-Strike
        9-23-10, 9am, d.9; atty fitzpatrick; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Mtn to Strike; Decision = M; Closed = 08/06/2010
          Blank 71 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None Substitution-Attorney
          old pro per; new fitzpatrick; Legacy Name = CV Substitution of Attorney; Decision = M; Closed = 08/06/2010
            Blank 70 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None Memorandum Of Costs
            summary costs:$870.00; mailed on: 7-26-10; Legacy Name = CV Memo of Costs; Decision = M; Closed = 07/26/2010
              Blank 69 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
              CV Ntc:Entry of Order; Decision = M; Closed = 07/20/2010
                Blank 68 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None Proof of Service
                CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 07/16/2010
                  Blank 67 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                  1st amended cmplt; Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 07/16/2010
                    Blank 66 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None Order After Hearing - POSCourt Filing
                    Motion for Sanctions against Plt Pursuant to CCP 128.7 by Defs Nina Daruwalla and Coldwell Banker was scheduled to be heard on 7-13-10. The Court issued its tentative ruling. Demurrer is off calendar, First Amended Complaint filed. Both Parties' Requests for Sanctions are Denied, signed by Judge Mark Pierce.; Legacy Name = CV Ord After Hearing; Decision = D; Closed = 07/15/2010
                      Blank 65 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None Request Dismissal
                      Atty Adil Hiramanek; Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/o Prej; Decision = M; Closed = 07/14/2010
                        Blank 64 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None Declaration: Supplemental
                        supplemental decl of monica burneikis luca in support of defs' demurrer and motion for sanctions (monica burneikis luca); Legacy Name = CV Supplemental Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 07/12/2010
                          Blank 63 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None Declaration: Supplemental
                          supplemental decl of plt adil hiramanek in opposition to defs' demurrer and defs' motion for sanctions (theresia c. sandhu); Legacy Name = CV Supplemental Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 07/09/2010
                            Blank 62 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None Proof of Service
                            CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 07/07/2010
                              Blank 61 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None MEMORANDUM
                              of P's&A's in reply to pltf's opposition to mtn for sanctions.; Legacy Name = CV Memorandum; Decision = M; Closed = 07/07/2010
                                Blank 60 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None Declaration
                                of Monica Burneikis Luca in reply to pltf's opposition to mtn for sanctions.; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 07/07/2010
                                  Blank 59 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None MEMORANDUM
                                  of P's & A's in reply to pltf's oppsition to defts' demurrer.; Legacy Name = CV Memorandum; Decision = M; Closed = 07/07/2010
                                    Blank 58 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None Request-Judicial Notice
                                    (Monica B. Luca); Legacy Name = CV Req:Judicial Ntc; Decision = M; Closed = 07/07/2010
                                      Blank 57 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None Declaration
                                      of Aziza Simpson in reply to pltf's opposition to defts' demurrer. (Monica B. Luca); Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 07/07/2010
                                        Blank 56 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                        CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 06/30/2010
                                          Blank 55 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                          For Sanctions (Theresia C. Sandhu) 07-13-10 D-9 @ 9AM; Legacy Name = CV Memo:Ps & As/Opposn to Mtn; Decision = M; Closed = 06/29/2010
                                            Blank 54 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None Complaint - Amended
                                            CV 1st Amended Complaint; Decision = M; Closed = 06/29/2010
                                              Blank 53 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                              In Opposition to Defs Demurrer(Theresia C. Sandhu) 07-13-10 D-9 @ 9AM; Legacy Name = CV Memo:Ps & As/Opposn to Mtn; Decision = M; Closed = 06/29/2010
                                                Blank 52 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None Declaration
                                                Of Theresia C. Sandhu 07-13-10 D-9 @ 9AM; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 06/29/2010
                                                  Blank 51 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None Request-Judicial Notice
                                                  in Opposition to Demurrer (Theresia C. Sandhu) 07-13-10 D-9 @ 9AM; Legacy Name = CV Req:Judicial Ntc; Decision = M; Closed = 06/29/2010
                                                    Blank 50 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None Declaration
                                                    Of Plt Adi Hiramanek in Opposition to Demurrer & Mtn. for Sanctions (Theresia C. Sandhu) 07-13-10 D-9 @ 9AM; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 06/29/2010
                                                      Blank 49 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                      To Defs Req for Judicial Notice (Theresia C. Sandhu) 07-13-10 D-9 @ 9AM; Legacy Name = CV Objection...; Decision = M; Closed = 06/29/2010
                                                        Blank 48 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                        atty ballesteros; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2010
                                                          Blank 47 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                                                          CV Ntc:Entry of Order; Decision = M; Closed = 05/04/2010
                                                            Blank 46 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None Request-Judicial Notice
                                                            CV Req:Judicial Ntc; Decision = M; Closed = 05/04/2010
                                                              Blank 45 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                              monica burneikis luca; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 05/04/2010
                                                                Blank 44 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                CV Memo:Ps & As/Suppt of Mtn; Decision = M; Closed = 05/04/2010
                                                                  Blank 43 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                  CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 05/04/2010
                                                                    Blank 42 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None Motion-Sanctions
                                                                    hrg 7.13.10 at 9am dept 1; atty luca; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Mtn for Sanction; Decision = M; Closed = 05/04/2010
                                                                      Blank 41 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                      monica burneikis luca; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 05/04/2010
                                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                        CV Memo:Ps & As/Suppt of Demurrer; Decision = M; Closed = 05/04/2010
                                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None Demurrer
                                                                          CV Demurrer, no fees; Decision = M; Closed = 05/04/2010
                                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                            CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 05/04/2010
                                                                              Blank 37 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None Demurrer
                                                                              hrg 7.13.10 at 9am dept 1; atty luca; Legacy Name = CV Demurrer & Ntc of Hrg; Decision = M; Closed = 05/04/2010
                                                                                Blank 36 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None Order
                                                                                setting aside defaults; granted by judge pierce; Legacy Name = CV Order; Decision = M; Closed = 05/04/2010
                                                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                  of plt re: def's mtn to vacate default judgments; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 04/29/2010
                                                                                    Blank 34 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                                                    CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 04/29/2010
                                                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                      of Moncia Burneikis in reply to opp to mtn to set aside entry of defaults; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 04/26/2010
                                                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                        to opp to mtn to set aside entry of defaults, Monica Burneikis; Legacy Name = CV Reply; Decision = M; Closed = 04/26/2010
                                                                                          Blank 31 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Personal
                                                                                          of memo p&as & decl in opp to mtn to set aside entry of default jgmt; decl of J. Majd; obj to req judt ntc; proof of serv, on Daniel W. Ballesteros, 4-19-10; Legacy Name = CV Proof of Personal Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 04/19/2010
                                                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                            to req for jud ntc to mtn to set aside entry of default, Adil Hiramanek; Legacy Name = CV Objection...; Decision = M; Closed = 04/19/2010
                                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                              & decl to mtn to set aside entry of default, Adil Hiramanek, Pro Per; Legacy Name = CV Memo:Ps & As/Opposn to Mtn; Decision = M; Closed = 04/19/2010
                                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                                                                CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 04/19/2010
                                                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                                                                  CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 04/19/2010
                                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                    CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 04/12/2010
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
                                                                                                      served summons/complaint; Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc/Regular Mail; Decision = M; Closed = 04/09/2010
                                                                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                                                                        CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 04/09/2010
                                                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None Request-Judicial Notice
                                                                                                          in Support of Mtn to Set Aside Entry of Default Judgment (atty Monica Burneikis Luca) OST 5-04-10 D9; Legacy Name = CV Req:Judicial Ntc; Decision = M; Closed = 04/09/2010
                                                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                            Decl of Nina Daruwalla in Support of Mtn to Set Aside Entry of Default Judgment (atty Monica Burneikis Luca) OST 5-04-10 D9; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 04/09/2010
                                                                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                              Decl of Whitney Diaz in Support of Mtn to Set Aside Entry of Default Judgment (atty Monica Burneikis Luca) OST 5-04-10 D9; ; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 04/09/2010
                                                                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                Decl of Daniel Mueller in Support of Mtn to Set Aside Entry of Default Judgment (atty Monica Burneikis Luca) OST 5-04-10 D9; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 04/09/2010
                                                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                  Decl of Monica Burneikis Luca in Support of Mtn to Set Aside Entry of Default Judgment (atty Monica Burneikis Luca) OST 5-04-10 D9; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 04/09/2010
                                                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                                                    to Set Aside Entry of Default Judgment (atty Monica Burneikis Luca) OST 5-04-10 D9; Legacy Name = CV Memo:Ps & As/Suppt of Mtn; Decision = M; Closed = 04/09/2010
                                                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None Motion (Other)
                                                                                                                      to Set Aside Entry of Default Judgment (atty Monica Burneikis Luca) OST 5-04-10 D9; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Motion w/fee; Decision = M; Closed = 04/09/2010
                                                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                        plt's decl and memo of p's and a's in opposition to defs' ex parte application (adil hiramanek in pro per); Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 04/09/2010
                                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None Application: Ex Parte (No Fees)
                                                                                                                          Ex Parte Appl & Order for OST a Mtn to Set Aside Default (atty Monica Burneikis Luca); Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte No Fee; Decision = M; Closed = 04/09/2010
                                                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                                                                            Ex Parte Appl & Order for OST a Mtn to Set Aside Default (atty Monica Burneikis Luca); Legacy Name = CV First Paper Def - Unltd; Decision = M; Closed = 04/09/2010
                                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: None Default Entered
                                                                                                                              *per order granted by judge pierce on 5.4.10, default is set aside for both parties**; Legacy Name = CV Default Entered; Decision = M; Closed = 04/07/2010
                                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                                                                                                CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 04/06/2010
                                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                                                                                                  CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 04/06/2010
                                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None Order: Ex ParteCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    DENIED by Judge Pierce; Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Order; Decision = M; Closed = 03/18/2010
                                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None Application: Ex Parte (Fee Applies)
                                                                                                                                      sup decl, memo p&as for tro & osc, Adil Hiramanek, Pro Per; Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Appl; Decision = M; Closed = 03/05/2010
                                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None Notice: Reassignment of Case
                                                                                                                                        CV Ntc:Reassignment of Case; Decision = M; Closed = 02/26/2010
                                                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          Request for Action and Order of Court: challenge is timely filed (Judge Kleinberg); Legacy Name = CV Order; Decision = M; Closed = 02/26/2010
                                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003)
                                                                                                                                            granted by judge kleinberg; Legacy Name = Order on Court Fee Waiver; Decision = G; Closed = 02/23/2010
                                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None Affidavit: Peremptory Challenge CCP 170.6
                                                                                                                                              pro per; Legacy Name = CV Peremptory Challenge/170.6; Decision = M; Closed = 02/22/2010
                                                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001)
                                                                                                                                                Req to Waive Court Fees; Decision = M; Closed = 02/19/2010
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                                                                                                                                  CV Summons Filed; Decision = M; Closed = 02/19/2010
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                                                                                                    CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 02/19/2010
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                      CV Case Cover Sheet; Decision = M; Closed = 02/19/2010

                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?