Red Hat Inc. v. Vitria Technology, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 2010-1-CV-166566

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 21, 2018 at 9:44 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Red Hat, Inc. Red Hat, Inc., Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Vitria Technology Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ilana Simone Rubel +1 415 875 2300 +1 415 281 1350 irubel@fenwick.com
Case Type Other Collections Unlimited (09)
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS
re Atty L. Walker; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Dismissal w/POS; Decision = M; Closed = 10/27/2010
    Blank 8 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS
    re (Atty L. Walker); Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Dismissal w/POS; Decision = M; Closed = 10/19/2010
      Blank 7 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None Request Dismissal
      (lorna walker); Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/Prej; Decision = M; Closed = 10/04/2010
        Blank 6 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: None Notice-Settlement
        Conditional Atty Lorna Walker; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Settlement; Decision = M; Closed = 08/06/2010
          Blank 5 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
          **FF By Atty Walker**; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 07/30/2010
            Blank 4 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
            atty rubel; Legacy Name = CV Answer, Unltd, w/fees; Decision = M; Closed = 05/04/2010
              Blank 3 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
              Lorna Walker; Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 03/15/2010
                Blank 2 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                CV Case Cover Sheet; Decision = M; Closed = 03/15/2010
                  Blank 1 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                  CV Summons Filed; Decision = M; Closed = 03/15/2010

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 4 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?