G. Camacho-Light, et al v. L. Valenti, et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 2010-1-CV-166578

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 21, 2018 at 9:45 AM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Camacho-Light, Gregory, Plaintiff
No Logo Camacho-Light, Lynn, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo AM & C Pools, Defendant
No Logo Ben Myer Fumigation And Termite Control, Defendant
Coldwell Banker Corporation Coldwell Banker Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Coldwell Banker"
No Logo Fregoso, Gilbert, Defendant
No Logo Home Guard, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Hume, Russ, Defendant
No Logo Intero Real Estate, Defendant
No Logo Malech, Roger, Defendant
No Logo Myer, Ben, Defendant
No Logo Ordaz, Chris, Defendant
No Logo Perales, Leighan, Defendant
No Logo Steffenson, Jim, Defendant
No Logo Steffenson, Scott, Defendant
No Logo Valenti, Christine, Defendant
No Logo Valenti, Larry, Defendant
No Logo Winter Roofing, Inc., Defendant
Case Type Fraud Unlimited (16)
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
of dismissal of action for no appearance on 10/14/10 signed by Judge McKenney.; Legacy Name = CV Order; Decision = M; Closed = 10/21/2010
    Blank 4 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None Notice: Dismissal of Action
    CV-Ntc:Dismissal of Action; Decision = M; Closed = 10/19/2010
      Blank 3 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
      CV Summons Filed; Decision = M; Closed = 03/15/2010
        Blank 2 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
        CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 03/15/2010
          Blank 1 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
          CV Case Cover Sheet; Decision = M; Closed = 03/15/2010

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 0 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?