USA v. Bishop
Criminal Case Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:01-cr-00129-DWF-RLE

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey S Paulsen +1 612 664 5600 jeff.paulsen@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office DMN
Filed 5/1/2001
County Beltrami
Terminated 9/17/2002
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 922G.F
Offense Level 4
18922(g)(1) and 924(e) FELON IN POSSESSION OF A FIREARM
Count 2
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 5841.F
Offense Level 4
265841, 5861(d), and 5871 POSSESSION OF A DESTRUCTIVE DEVICE
Def Custody Status Released
Flags 6DIV, CLOSED, FRC
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 40 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008 Petition and Order re: Modifying ConditionsCourt Filing
Petition and Order re: Modifying Conditions of Supervised Release as to Charles Arthur Bishop. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 4/25/08. (Attachments: # (1) Hearing Waiver) (BJS)
LREF
Blank 39 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: 11/4/2002 Judgment Returned Executed
JUDGMENT returned executed as to defendant Charles Arthur Bishop on 10/30/02, v/s to FPC Duluth, Duluth, MN (5pgs) (BLW
    LREF
    Blank 38 Filed: 9/17/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
    REQUEST FOR TRAVEL AUTHORIZATION ORDER as to Charles Arthur Bishop by Judge Donovan W. Frank that deft appear on 9/17/02, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the USM furnish the deft mileage for his appearance before the Court on 9/17/02, to and from Warroad, MN (cc: all counsel & USM). 2pgs (LEG)
      LREF
      Blank 37 Filed: 9/17/2002, Entered: 9/17/2002 Judgment*Court Filing
      JUDGMENT/STATEMENT OF REASONS as to defendant Charles Arthur Bishop by Judge Donovan W. Frank (dated 9/17/02). (Copies dist'd) 5 pages (PJS)
        LREF
        Blank 36 Filed: 9/17/2002, Entered: 9/17/2002 SentencingCourt Filing
        MINUTES before Judge Donovan W. Frank re SENTENCING Charles Arthur Bishop (1) count(s) 1: BOP 72 months; supervised release 3 years; special assessment $100; voluntary surrender 10/30/02 by 2:00 pm; Count 2 dism'd; granting govt's motion for downward departure [35-1]; cont'd on bond. Court Reporter: Bruce Tiffany. (1 page) (PJS)
          LREF
          Blank 35 Filed: 9/6/2002, Entered: 9/9/2002 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
          MOTION for downward departure by USA as to Charles Arthur Bishop. (1 page) (PJS)
            LREF
            Blank 34 Filed: 2/12/2002, Entered: 2/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER (Judge Donovan W. Frank / date signed 2/12/02) granting motion for a two week extension of deadlines for sentencing proceedings [33-1] as to Charles Arthur Bishop. (cc: all counsel, Prob) 1 pg (
              LREF
              Blank 33 Filed: 2/7/2002, Entered: 2/8/2002, Terminated: 2/12/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File
              MOTION for extension of deadlines for sentencing proceedings by Charles Arthur Bishop. (1 page) (PJS)
                LREF
                Blank 32 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: 10/9/2001 Plea Agreement
                PLEA AGREEMENT AND SENTENCING STIPULATIONS as to Charles Arthur Bishop. 6 pgs (
                  LREF
                  Blank 31 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: 10/9/2001 Plea EnteredCourt Filing
                  MINUTES: before Judge Donovan W. Frank Charles Arthur Bishop enters guilty plea to count 1; count 2 to be dismissed at sentencing; PSI ordered; bond cont'd. Court Reporter: Bruce Tiffany. 1 pg (
                    LREF
                    Blank 30 Filed: 10/4/2001, Entered: 10/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                    REQUEST FOR TRAVEL AUTHORIZATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE OF DEFT AND FOR TRANSPORTATION EXPENSES as to Charles Arthur Bishop by Magistrate Judge E. S. Swearingen for appearance 10/5/01 at 3:00 p.m. (cc: all counsel, USM) 2 pages (PJS)
                      LREF
                      Blank 29 Filed: 9/12/2001, Entered: 9/12/2001 Notice of Hearing.
                      SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF JURY TRIAL: set for 9:00 a.m. on 10/1/01 before DWF as to deft Charles Bishop. Voir dire & Jury Instructions due 9/24/01. (1 page) (PJS)
                        LREF
                        Blank 28 Filed: 8/27/2001, Entered: 8/27/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER (Judge Donovan W. Frank / date signed 8/27/01) 1. The Court's order of 8/8/01, for the reasons stated above, is hereby VACATED. 2. Magistrate Judge Erickson's R & R dated 7/17/01 is ADOPTED. 3. The deft's motion to suppress evidence obtained as a result of search & seizure is DENIED. 4. The deft's motion to suppress statements, admissions, and answers is DENIED as to deft Charles Arthur Bishop (cc: all counsel). 2pgs (LEG)
                          LREF
                          Blank 27 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: 8/10/2001 Objection to Report and Recommendations
                          OBJECTIONS by defendant Charles Arthur Bishop to Report & Recommendation [23-1]. 2pg(s) (LEG)
                            LREF
                            Blank 26 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: 8/10/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                            MOTION/MEMORANDUM to file objections to R & R out of time by Charles Arthur Bishop. 18pg(s) (LEG)
                              LREF
                              Blank 25 Filed: 8/8/2001, Entered: 8/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER (Judge Donovan W. Frank / date signed 8/8/01) AS TO CHARLES ARTHUR BISHOP denying motion to suppress statements, admissions & answers [17-1], denying motion to suppress evidence obtained as a result of search & seizure [16-1]. RR Ruling Deadline satisfied (cc: all counsel). 1pg (LEG)
                                LREF
                                Blank 24 Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: 7/19/2001 Notice of Hearing.
                                AMENDED NOTICE OF JURY TRIAL set for 9:00 a.m. on 8/20/01 before DWF. Pretrial materials, as listed in the Local Rules, are due by 8/13/01 as to Charles Arthur Bishop . 1pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (LEG)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 23 Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: 7/18/2001 Report and RecommendationCourt Filing
                                  REPORT and RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Raymond L. Erickson date signed: 7/17/01 recommending that deft's motions to suppress statements, admissions & answers [17-1] and to suppress evidence obtained as a result of search & seizure [16-1] be denied. RR Ruling deadline set for 8/16/01. [part of Doc. #22] (PJS)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 22 Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: 7/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER ( Magistrate Judge Raymond L. Erickson / date signed 7/17/01) as to deft Charles Arthur Biship granting deft's motion for discovery of Rule 16(a)(1)(E) evidence [11-1]; granting deft's motion to compel atty for the govt to disclose evidence favorable to the deft [12-1]; granting deft's motion for discovery and inspection of products & records of electronic surveillance [13-1]; granting in part, denying in part deft's motion to disclose & make informant available for interview [14-1]; and granting deft's motion for early disclosure of Jencks Act material [15-1]. (cc: all counsel) 26 pages (PJS)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 21 Filed: 6/25/2001, Entered: 6/26/2001 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                      MEMORANDUM by USA in opposition to deft Charles Bishop's motion to suppress [17-1] [16-1]. 6 pages (PJS)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 20 Filed: 6/20/2001, Entered: 6/21/2001 Miscellaneous Document
                                        SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in support of motion to suppress statements, admissions & answers [17-1] and motion to suppress evidence obtained as a result of search & seizure [16-1] by Charles Arthur Bishop. 14 pgs (
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 19 Filed: 6/11/2001, Entered: 6/11/2001 MinutesCourt Filing
                                          MINUTES: before Magistrate Judge Raymond L. Erickson for motion hearing as to Charles Arthur Bishop. Testimony of Agent Traurig. Motions under advisement. Addt'l brief due by deft 6/20/01 & govt 6/22/01. Tape: 01-40 & 01-41. 1 pg (
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 18 Filed: 6/8/2001, Entered: 6/8/2001 Response to Motion
                                            OMNIBUS RESPONSE by pltf USA to deft Charles Bishop's pretrial motions. 16 pgs (
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 17 Filed: 6/5/2001, Entered: 6/6/2001, Terminated: 8/8/2001 Motion to Suppress
                                              MOTION/MEMORANDUM to suppress statements, admissions & answers by Charles Arthur Bishop. 4 pg(s) (
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 16 Filed: 6/5/2001, Entered: 6/6/2001 Motion to Suppress
                                                MOTION to suppress evidence obtained as a result of search & seizure by Charles Arthur Bishop. 2 pg(s) (
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 6/5/2001, Entered: 6/6/2001 Motion for Disclosure
                                                  MOTION for early disclosure of Jencks Act Material by Charles Arthur Bishop. 2 pg(s) (
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 6/5/2001, Entered: 6/6/2001 Motion for Disclosure
                                                    MOTION/MEMORANDUM to disclose & make informant available for interview by Charles Arthur Bishop. 3 pg(s) (
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 6/5/2001, Entered: 6/6/2001 Motion for Discovery
                                                      MOTION/MEMORANDUM for discovery and inspection of products & records of electronic surveillance by Charles Arthur Bishop. 3 pg(s) (
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 6/5/2001, Entered: 6/6/2001 Motion to Compel
                                                        MOTION/MEMORANDUM to compel atty for the govt to disclose evidence favorable to the deft by Charles Arthur Bishop. 4 pg(s) (
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 6/5/2001, Entered: 6/6/2001, Terminated: 7/17/2001 Motion for Discovery
                                                          MOTION for discovery of Rule 16(a)(1)(E) evidence by Charles Arthur Bishop. 2 pg(s) (
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 6/5/2001, Entered: 6/6/2001 Affidavit
                                                            DECLARATION In Lieu of Discovery Motions and Outline of Pretrial Motions by defendant Charles Arthur Bishop. 3 pgs (
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 5/25/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER (Magistrate Judge Raymond L. Erickson / date signed 5/25/01) granting motion for gov't agents to rtn rough notes [6-1] as to Charles Arthur Bishop (cc: all counsel). 1 pg (LEG)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 5/25/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ARRAIGNMENT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Raymond L. Erickson (Date Signed: 5/25/01) as to Charles Arthur Bishop. Same as minutes, Doc. 7. pg(s) 3 pgs (LEG)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 5/23/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001 ArraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                  MINUTES: before Magistrate Judge Raymond L. Erickson dft Charles Arthur Bishop arraigned; not guilty plea entered; Attorney present; disclosure due 6/6/01 ; pretrial motions due 6/4/01; motion hearing set for 11:00 on 6/11/01 before RLE in Duluth; Voir Dire / Jury Instructions due 7/16/01; jury trial set for 9:00 on 7/23/01 before DWF. 1 pg (LEG)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 5/23/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001, Terminated: 5/25/2001 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                    MOTION for gov't agents to rtn rough notes by Charles Arthur Bishop. 2 pg(s) (LEG)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 5/23/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001 Utility - Miscellaneous
                                                                      APPEARANCE BOND ($25,000 RPR executed on 5/23/01) by Charles Arthur Bishop 1pg (LEG)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 5/23/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS OF RELEASE by Magistrate Judge Raymond L. Erickson for Charles Arthur Bishop in the of $25,000 RPR. 4 pgs (LEG)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 5/23/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                                          MINUTES: before Magistrate Judge Raymond L. Erickson first appearance of Charles Arthur Bishop. $25,000 RPR bond set. Counsel appt'd. 1 pg (LEG)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 5/18/2001, Entered: 5/21/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                            SUMMONS executed upon Charles Arthur Bishop on 5/10/01. 2 pgs (
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/4/2001, Entered: 5/4/2001 Summons Issued
                                                                              SUMMONS issued as to Charles Arthur Bishop, deft to appear on 5/23/01, at 10:00 a.m. before RLE in CR # 3, St. Paul. (LEG)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 5/1/2001, Entered: 5/1/2001 IndictmentCourt Filing
                                                                                INDICTMENT assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank, referred to Magistrate Judge Raymond L. Erickson by USA Eric P Johnson. Counts filed against Charles Arthur Bishop (1) counts 1 & 2. 2pgs (LEG)
                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                  This case has been viewed 303 times.

                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                  Space
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                   
                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                  Need Password Help?