Fingerhut Business v. eToys Inc, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:01-cv-00064-JRT-FLN

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Fingerhut Business Services, Inc, Petitioner

Represented by Bowman and Brooke LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by The Marvin Companies, Inc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven C Tourek +1 651 686 2490 +1 651 686 2492 stourek@marvin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winthrop & Weinstine, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert R Weinstine +1 612 604 6613 +1 612 604 6813 rweinstine@winthrop.com
v.
No Logo eToys Distribution, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew M Luger +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 aluger@gr-espel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Irell & Manella, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Philip M. Kelly +1 310 203 7111 +1 310 203 7199 pkelly@irell.com
Space Robert N Klieger +1 213 788 4310 +1 310 556 2705 rklieger@hueston.com
Space Christine W S Byrd +1 310 277 1010 +1 310 203 7199

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy E Brasel +1 612 664 5690 nancy.brasel@usdoj.gov
No Logo Etoys Inc., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew M Luger +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 aluger@gr-espel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Irell & Manella, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Philip M. Kelly +1 310 203 7111 +1 310 203 7199 pkelly@irell.com
Space Robert N Klieger +1 213 788 4310 +1 310 556 2705 rklieger@hueston.com
Space Christine W S Byrd +1 310 277 1010 +1 310 203 7199

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy E Brasel +1 612 664 5690 nancy.brasel@usdoj.gov
Office DMN
Filed 1/12/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 09 U.S.C. § 0010 Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Hennepin
Terminated 9/6/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, FRC
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 30 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: 4/20/2006 Transcript (Conventional)Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Motions held on 5/31/01 before Judge John R. Tunheim. Court Reporter: Karen J. Grufman. (39pgs) FILED CONVENTIONALLY (akl)
    LREF
    Legal Document 29 Filed: 4/1/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002 ~Notice (other)
    NOTICE of intent to destroy documents under seal. 1pg (VEM)
      LREF
      Blank 28 Filed: 10/23/2001, Entered: 10/25/2001 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
      LETTER dated 10/22/01 from AndrewM. Luger finding the letter motion for attorney fees and for prejudgment interest SVC LTR ( to Judge John R. Tunheim ) [27-1] moot. (DFL)
        LREF
        Blank 27 Filed: 10/1/2001, Entered: 10/3/2001 MOTION - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
        LETTER RE: SVC OF DISPOSITIVE MOTION PAPERS by respondents for attorney fees SVC LTR ( to Judge John R. Tunheim ) 2pg(s) (DFL)
          LREF
          Legal Document 26 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: 9/11/2001 Order
          JUDGMENT entered 1pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
            LREF
            Legal Document 25 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: 9/11/2001 OrderCourt Filing
            MEMORANDUM, OPINION, AND ORDER: ( Judge John R. Tunheim / 9/6/01) denying motion to vacate arbitrators' award [1-1] denying motion to modify arbitration award [1-2] granting motion to confirm arbitration award [10-1] and judgment is entered against the petitioner in the amount of $2,512,202; each side shall bear its own costs and attorney's fees. The AAA costs, including the fees of the neutral arbitrator, shall be split evenly between the parties termination notice 16pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
              LREF
              Blank 24 Filed: 5/31/2001, Entered: 6/5/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
              MINUTES:( Judge John R. Tunheim / Karen Grufman) Petitioner's motion to vacate or in the alternative to modify the arbitration award. Respondent's motion to confirm the arbitration award and Responent's motion to strike the affidavit of Robert G. Schiefelbein were moved argued and taken under advisement. [18-1], [10-1], [1-1], [1-2] (1 pg) (MKC)
                LREF
                Blank 23 Filed: 4/30/2001, Entered: 5/2/2001 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                NOTICE by respondents setting hearing for motion to confirm arbitration award ( to Judge John R. Tunheim ) [10-1] at 9:00 a.m. on 5/31/01 2pg(s) (DFL)
                  LREF
                  Blank 22 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: 3/21/2001 Affidavit
                  AFFIDAVIT of Victoria L. Handler regarding motion to strike affidvit of Robert G. Schiefelbein [18-1] separate and sealed (DFL)
                    LREF
                    Blank 21 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: 3/21/2001 Affidavit
                    AFFIDAVIT of Jennifer K. Bower regarding motion to strike affidvit of Robert G. Schiefelbein [18-1] separate and sealed (DFL)
                      LREF
                      Blank 20 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: 3/21/2001 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                      MEMORANDUM by petitioner in opposition to motion to strike affidvit of Robert G. Schiefelbein [18-1] separate and sealed (DFL)
                        LREF
                        Blank 19 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: 3/21/2001 Affidavit
                        AFFIDAVIT of Andrew M. Luger regarding motion to strike affidvit of Robert G. Schiefelbein [18-1] separate and sealed (DFL)
                          LREF
                          Blank 18 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: 3/21/2001 Motion to StrikeCourt Filing
                          MOTION by respondents to strike affidvit of Robert G. Schiefelbein ( to Judge John R. Tunheim ) separate and sealed (DFL)
                            LREF
                            Blank 17 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: 3/21/2001 Affidavit
                            AFFIDAVIT of Robert G. Schiefelbein regarding motion to vacate arbitrators' award [1-1], regarding motion to modify arbitration award [1-2] separate and sealed (DFL)
                              LREF
                              Blank 16 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: 3/21/2001 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                              MEMORANDUM by petitioner in opposition to motion to confirm arbitration award [10-1] (filed as part of petitioner's memo of law in support of motion for arbitration award - above docket entry) (DFL)
                                LREF
                                Blank 16 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: 3/21/2001 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                MEMORANDUM by petitioner in support of motion to vacate arbitrators' award [1-1], of motion to modify arbitration award [1-2] separate and sealed (DFL)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 15 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: 3/21/2001 Miscellaneous Document
                                  DECLARATION of Robert C. Bonner re motion to vacate arbitrators' award [1-1], re motion to modify arbitration award [1-2] separate and sealed (DFL)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 14 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: 3/21/2001 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                    MEMORANDUM by respondents in opposition to motion to vacate arbitrators' award [1-1], to motion to modify arbitration award [1-2] separate and sealed (DFL)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 13 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: 3/21/2001 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                      MEMORANDUM by petitioner in further support of motion to vacate arbitrators' award [1-1], of motion to modify arbitration award [1-2], of motion to stay proceedings pending resolution of all maters before the arbitration panel [1-3] separate and sealed (DFL)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 12 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: 3/21/2001 Affidavit
                                        AFFIDAVIT of Nancy E. Brasel regarding motion to confirm arbitration award [10-1] separate and sealed (DFL)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 11 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: 3/21/2001 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                          MEMORANDUM by respondents in support of motion to confirm arbitration award [10-1] separate and sealed (DFL)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 10 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: 3/21/2001 Motion for Order toCourt Filing
                                            MOTION by respondents to confirm arbitration award ( to Judge John R. Tunheim ) separate and sealed (DFL)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 9 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/8/2001 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                              LETTER by petitioner's counsel withdrawing motion to stay proceedings pending resolution of all maters before the arbitration panel ( to Judge John R. Tunheim ) [1-3] (DFL)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 8 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: 2/6/2001 Order
                                                PETITION AND ORDER for admission pro hac vice ( Clerk Francis E. Dosal ) on behalf of respondent by Philip M Kelly 1pg(s) (DFL)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: 2/6/2001 Order
                                                  PETITION AND ORDER for admission pro hac vice ( Clerk Francis E. Dosal ) on behalf of respondent by Robert N Klieger 1pg(s) (DFL)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: 2/6/2001 Order
                                                    PETITION AND ORDER for admission pro hac vice ( Clerk Francis E. Dosal ) on behalf of respondent by Christine W S Byrd 1pg(s) (DFL)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 1/31/2001, Entered: 1/31/2001 Letter
                                                      LETTER from counsel for petitioner, Re: service of arbitration motion 2pg(s) (DFL)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 1/25/2001, Entered: 1/25/2001 Miscellaneous Document
                                                        EXHIBIT A to motion to vacate of modify arbitration award and to affidavit of Robert R. Weinstine separate and sealed per order of FLN (DFL)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 1/25/2001, Entered: 1/25/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel ) that the seven page portion of Exhibit A to the motion to vacate or modify arbitration and to affidavit of Robert R. Weinstine, both filed on 1/12/01, be immediately filed under seal; that all future filings in connection with the above-referenced matter, that in any manner either attach or refer to the confidential, sensitive and proprietary pricing information contained in the Original Schedule identified shall be filed under seal 3pg(s)(cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001 Affidavit
                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Robert R. Weinstine regarding motions to vacate arbitrators' award [1-1], to modify arbitration award [1-2] and to stay proceedings pending resolution of all maters before the arbitration panel [1-3] 3+pg(s) (DFL)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001, Terminated: 9/6/2001 Motion to VacateCourt Filing
                                                              MOTION by petitioner Fingerhut Business to vacate arbitrators' award , or in the alternative to modify arbitration award , and to stay proceedings pending resolution of all maters before the arbitration panel ( to Judge John R. Tunheim ) Assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Master List and referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel, rcpt. no. 237970 49pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 102 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?