Dain Rauscher, Inc. v. Qumram, Inc., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:01-cv-00099-JNE-JGL

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Dain Rauscher Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michelle S Grant +1 612 340 5671 +1 612 340 2807 grant.michelle@dorsey.com
Space James K Langdon +1 612 340 2600 +1 612 340 8800 langdon.jim@dorsey.com
Space Richard B Solum +1 612 340 8871 +1 612 340 8800 solum.rick@dorsey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by uhc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mitchell W Granberg +1 763 797 7123 +1 763 797 7142 mitch_granberg@uhc.com
No Logo Abingbury Investment, Ltd., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard I Diamond +1 763 545 4474 +1 763 595 0794 lawcrosdik@aol.com
No Logo Anastasias Drivas, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Eastover Ltd., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Fard International Trading Limited, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Haresh Patel, Counter-Claimant
No Logo JMD International, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard I Diamond +1 763 545 4474 +1 763 595 0794 lawcrosdik@aol.com
No Logo Jon Kappes, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew M Luger +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 aluger@gr-espel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy E Brasel +1 612 664 5690 nancy.brasel@usdoj.gov
No Logo Marlene Oilgisser, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Sinesio Jesus Pasarin Diaz, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kalina Wills Gisvold & Clark, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James R Crassweller +1 763 259 3428 +1 763 503 7070 crassweller@kwgc-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Oppenheimer Wolff & Donnelly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathy S Kimmel +1 612 607 7306 +1 612 607 7100 kkimmel@oppenheimer.com
v.
No Logo Abingbury Investment, Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Anastasias Drivas, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George R Dunn +1 651 224 7687 +1 651 224 0239 grdunn@juno.com
No Logo Baracuda Economical Resource, Defendant
No Logo Cornelia Beens, Defendant
No Logo Does, Defendant
No Logo Eastover Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George R Dunn +1 651 224 7687 +1 651 224 0239 grdunn@juno.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Liddle & Robinson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James A. Batson +1 212 687 8500 +1 212 687 1505 jbatson@liddlerobinson.com
No Logo Frunzik Galstyan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hassan A. Abbas +011 323 233 3910
No Logo Haresh Patel, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George R Dunn +1 651 224 7687 +1 651 224 0239 grdunn@juno.com
No Logo JMD International, Defendant
No Logo John Baulian, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Oppenheimer Wolff & Donnelly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary M. Hansen +1 612 607 7584 +1 612 607 7100 ghansen@oppenheimer.com
No Logo Marlene Oilgisser, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George R Dunn +1 651 224 7687 +1 651 224 0239 grdunn@juno.com
No Logo Qumram, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Sinesio Jesus Pasarin Diaz, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kalina Wills Gisvold & Clark, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James R Crassweller +1 763 259 3428 +1 763 503 7070 crassweller@kwgc-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Oppenheimer Wolff & Donnelly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathy S Kimmel +1 612 607 7306 +1 612 607 7100 kkimmel@oppenheimer.com
No Logo Tempel Intl Corp, Defendant
No Logo United Bank Open Joint-Stock Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hassan A. Abbas +011 323 233 3910
No Logo Abingbury Investment, Ltd., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard I Diamond +1 763 545 4474 +1 763 595 0794 lawcrosdik@aol.com
No Logo Dain Rauscher Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James K Langdon +1 612 340 2600 +1 612 340 8800 langdon.jim@dorsey.com
Space Richard B Solum +1 612 340 8871 +1 612 340 8800 solum.rick@dorsey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by uhc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mitchell W Granberg +1 763 797 7123 +1 763 797 7142 mitch_granberg@uhc.com
No Logo Fard International Trading Limited, Counter-Defendant
No Logo JMD International, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard I Diamond +1 763 545 4474 +1 763 595 0794 lawcrosdik@aol.com
No Logo Jon Kappes, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew M Luger +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 aluger@gr-espel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy E Brasel +1 612 664 5690 nancy.brasel@usdoj.gov
No Logo Abingbury Investment, Ltd., Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard I Diamond +1 763 545 4474 +1 763 595 0794 lawcrosdik@aol.com
No Logo Anastasias Drivas, Cross-Claimant
No Logo Eastover Ltd., Cross-Claimant
No Logo Fard International Trading Limited, Cross-Claimant
No Logo Haresh Patel, Cross-Claimant
No Logo JMD International, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard I Diamond +1 763 545 4474 +1 763 595 0794 lawcrosdik@aol.com
No Logo Marlene Oilgisser, Cross-Claimant
No Logo Sinesio Jesus Pasarin Diaz, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kalina Wills Gisvold & Clark, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James R Crassweller +1 763 259 3428 +1 763 503 7070 crassweller@kwgc-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Oppenheimer Wolff & Donnelly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathy S Kimmel +1 612 607 7306 +1 612 607 7100 kkimmel@oppenheimer.com
No Logo De Verney Brook Taylor, Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by sheehylawltd.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James B Sheehy +1 612 341 1011 +1 612 341 0116 jim@sheehylawltd.com
No Logo John Baulian, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Oppenheimer Wolff & Donnelly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary M. Hansen +1 612 607 7584 +1 612 607 7100 ghansen@oppenheimer.com
No Logo Qumram, Inc., Cross-Defendant
Office DMN
Filed 1/18/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Hennepin
Terminated 4/18/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ATYADM, CLOSED, PROTO
  Entries (138) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 129 Filed: 4/18/2003, Entered: 4/24/2003 Stipulation
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT separate and sealed (DFL)
    LREF
    Blank 128 Filed: 4/18/2003, Entered: 4/24/2003 OrderCourt Filing
    STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Judge Joan N. Ericksen ) approving settlement. 5pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
      LREF
      Blank 127 Filed: 4/18/2003, Entered: 4/24/2003 OrderCourt Filing
      STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Judge Joan N. Ericksen ) of dismissal with prejudice as to defendants Galsytan, Diaz, Eastover Ltd., Oilgisser, Patel, Drivas, Abingbury Investments, JMD Int'l, United Bank Open Joint-Stock Co, AMF Co., Inc. and counterclaim defendant, Kappes; plaintiff is discharged from all liability related to the funds, cash, or securities regarding the remaining Qumram Proceeds; all other claims, counterclaims or crossclaims are dismissed without prejudice, without costs to any party. termination notice 5pg(s)(cc: all counsel) (DFL) Modified on 04/24/2003
        LREF
        Legal Document 126 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER Allowing Withdrawal of John C. James and John M. James ( Chief Mag. Judge Jonathan G. Lebedoff ) that the Court herewith permits the withdrawal of local counsel of record, John C. James and John M. James, and by their motion have noticed withdrawal, effective as of the date hereof; further notices for dft Frunzik Galstyan and United Bank Open Joint Stock Company shall be sent to counsel pro hac vice Hassan Abbas at Hoveniersstrat 2, Suite 232, Box 344, B-2018 Antwerpen, Belgium [121-1] 2pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (SJH)
          LREF
          Blank 125 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          MINUTES ( Chief Mag. Judge Jonathan G. Lebedoff ) re granting motion to withdraw attorney [121-1] as to attorney John Charles James for United Bank Open and for Frunzik Galstyan 2pg(s) (SJH)
            LREF
            Blank 124 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
            NOTICE by Frunzik Galstyan, United Bank Open and AMF Company, Inc. setting hearing for motion to withdraw attorney. ( to Chief Mag. Judge Jonathan G. Lebedoff ) [121-1]ret. at 2:00pm on 4/4/03. 6pg(s) (RJL)
              LREF
              Blank 123 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 Affidavit
              AFFIDAVIT of John M. James regarding motion to withdraw attorney [121-1] 2pg(s) (DFL)
                LREF
                Blank 122 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 AffidavitCourt Filing
                AFFIDAVIT of John C. James regarding motion to withdraw attorney ( to Chief Mag. Judge Jonathan G. Lebedoff ) [121-1] 4pg(s) (DFL)
                  LREF
                  Blank 121 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                  MOTION by John C. James, counsel for Frunzik Galstyan, United Bank Open to withdraw attorney ( to Chief Mag. Judge Jonathan G. Lebedoff ) 6pg(s) (DFL)
                    LREF
                    Blank 120 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/19/2002 Stipulation
                    SATISFACTION of Attorney's Lien 2pg(s) (SJH)
                      LREF
                      Blank 119 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 11/7/2002 Order
                      PETITION AND ORDER for admission pro hac vice ( Clerk Richard D. Sletten ) on behalf of defendant Eastover Ltd. by James A Batson 2pg(s) (JMH)
                        LREF
                        Blank 118 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 11/7/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                        MINUTES:( Judge Joan E. Lancaster / Anderson, Jeanne) granting motion for default judgment against John Baulian, Cornelia Beens, Qumram, Inc., Tempel Intl Corp, Baracuda Economical [109-1] 1pg(s) (DFL)
                          LREF
                          Blank 117 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Order
                          DEFAULT JUDGMENT entered as to John Baulian, Cornelia Beens, Qumran Inc., Tempel Int'l and Baracuda Economical Resources and Dain Rauscher is awarded costs and disbursements of $1,788.60 for the filing fee and for costs of service 2pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 116 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER ( Judge Joan E. Lancaster / 10/28/02) granting motion for default judgment against John Baulian, Cornelia Beens, Qumram, Inc., Tempel Intl Corp, Baracuda Economical [115-1] 2pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                              LREF
                              Blank 115 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002, Terminated: 10/28/2002 Motion for Default JudgmentCourt Filing
                              MOTION by plaintiff for default judgment against John Baulian, Cornelia Beens, Qumram, Inc., Tempel Intl Corp, Baracuda Economical , and further, to approve settlement agreement ( to Judge Joan E. Lancaster ) ret. 10/28/02 9:30 2pg(s) (SJH)
                                LREF
                                Blank 114 Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/21/2002 Affidavit
                                AFFIDAVIT of Mitchell W. Granberg regarding motion for default judgment against Qumram, Inc., John Baulian, Cornelia Beens, Tempel Intl Corp, Baracuda Economical [112-1] 4+pg(s) (DFL)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 113 Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/21/2002 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                  MEMORANDUM by plaintiff in support of motion for default judgment against Qumram, Inc., John Baulian, Cornelia Beens, Tempel Intl Corp, Baracuda Economical [112-1] 11pg(s) (DFL)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 112 Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/21/2002 Motion for Default JudgmentCourt Filing
                                    MOTION by plaintiff for default judgment against Qumram, Inc., John Baulian, Cornelia Beens, Tempel Intl Corp, Baracuda Economical ( to Judge Joan E. Lancaster ) 4 pg(s) (DFL)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 111 Filed: 9/6/2002, Entered: 9/10/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                      NOTICE by James Sheehy of attorney lien in the amount of $45,456.13 7pg(s) (DFL)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 110 Filed: 8/23/2002, Entered: 8/28/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER ( Judge Joan E. Lancaster / 8/23/02) denying motion to dismiss the action or the crossclaims [86-1] denying motion to dismiss both or either of the defendants [86-2] denying motion to stay the action [86-3] denying motion to compel arbitration [86-4] 2pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 109 Filed: 8/21/2002, Entered: 8/28/2002 MOTION - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                          LETTER RE: SVC OF DISPOSITIVE MOTION PAPERS by plaintiff for default judgment against John Baulian, Cornelia Beens, Qumram, Inc., Tempel Intl Corp, Baracuda Economical SVC LTR ( to Judge Joan E. Lancaster ) 1pg(s) (DFL)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 108 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: 7/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Chief Mag. Judge Jonathan G. Lebedoff ) that the mediation take place on 9/5-6/02 and the Magistrte Judge's Order of 6/27/02 be may be modified to allow the mediation to occur on those dates 4pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 107 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/5/2002 Report and RecommendationCourt Filing
                                              REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ( Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel / 7/1/02) that the motions to dismiss the action or the crossclaims [86-1], to dismiss both or either of the defendants [86-2], to stay the action [86-3], to compel arbitration [86-4] be denied in its entirety 15pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 106 Filed: 6/27/2002, Entered: 6/28/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER ( Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel / 6/27/2) that 1. The parties shall agree on a mediator on or before 7/1/2. 2.The parties shall schedule & hold necessary mediation sessions on or before 9/1/2. 3. Mediation shall proceed upon the assumption that pltf will be successful in obtaining default judgments against all non-responding parties; in the event such judgments are not entered, any party would then be free to change its settlement position accordingly. 4. If the case has not settled by 10/1/2 the parties shall on that day: a) notify the then assigned Magistrate Judge; b) request a case management conference; c) submit to the Court the report contemplated by Fed.R.Civ.P.26(f). (2pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DDB)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 105 Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: 6/28/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                  MINUTES:( Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel / ) PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. (3pg(s) (DDB)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 104 Filed: 6/20/2002, Entered: 6/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ( Clerk Richard D. Sletten / ) Case referred to Chief Mag. Judge Jonathan G. Lebedoff 1pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (VEM)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 101 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      NOTICE (Clerk Richard D. Sletten / 5/20/02) Case reassigned to Judge Joan E. Lancaster. Case referred to Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan 1 pg (cc: all counsel) (
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 103 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 Order
                                                        JUDGMENT: 1 pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (VEM)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 102 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER ( Judge Richard H. Kyle / 5/10/02) Pltf's Dain Rauscher motion for default judgment against Fard International be granted. [80-1] terminating party Fard International 2 pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (VEM)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: 5/13/2002 Order
                                                            Text not available.
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 100 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 Letter
                                                              LETTER to court from Attorney George Dunn for defts Eastover Ltd., Marlene Oilgisser, Haresh Patel, and Anastasias Drivas dated 5/3/02, re: additional authorities 7pg(s) (GJS)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 99 Filed: 5/1/2002, Entered: 5/1/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                MINUTES:( Judge Richard H. Kyle / R. Riley) taking under advisement Pltf's motion for default judgment against Fard International. [80-1] 1 pg(s) (VEM)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 97 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/30/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER ( Judge Richard H. Kyle / 4/26/02) referring pending motions of Galstyan and United Bank Open Joint Stock to Magistrate Judge Noel per consent and stipulation of the parties 2pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 98 Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: 5/1/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                    MINUTES:(Magistrate Judge Franklin L.Noel/Jeanne Anderson.) taken under advisement on the motion to dismiss the action or the crossclaims [86-1], and on the motion dismiss both or either of the defendants [86-2] 1pg(s) (GJS)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 96 Filed: 4/16/2002, Entered: 4/19/2002 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                      MEMORANDUM by Eastover Ltd., Marlene Oilgisser, Haresh Patel, Anastasias Drivas in opposition to motion to dismiss the action or the crossclaims [86-1], to motion to dismiss both or either of the defendants [86-2] 13pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 95 Filed: 4/16/2002, Entered: 4/18/2002 Affidavit
                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Michelle S. Grant regarding motion to dismiss the action or the crossclaims [86-1], regarding motion to dismiss both or either of the defendants [86-2] 4+pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 94 Filed: 4/16/2002, Entered: 4/18/2002 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                          MEMORANDUM by Dain Rauscher, Inc. in opposition to motion to dismiss the action or the crossclaims [86-1], to motion to dismiss both or either of the defendants [86-2] 18pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 93 Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                            MEMORANDUM by Sinesio Jesus Pasarin Diaz in opposition to motion to dismiss the action or the crossclaims [86-1], to motion to dismiss both or either of the defendants [86-2], to motion to stay the action [86-3], to motion to compel arbitration [86-4] 9pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 92 Filed: 4/4/2002, Entered: 4/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER ( Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel ) 6pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 91 Filed: 3/29/2002, Entered: 4/4/2002 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                                Amended NOTICE by defendant Frunzik Galstyan and United Bank Open Joint-Stock Company re-setting hearing for motion to dismiss the action or the crossclaims [86-1] at 10:00 4/26/02, setting hearing for motion to dismiss both or either of the defendants [86-2] at 10:00 4/26/02, setting hearing for motion to stay the action [86-3] at 10:00 4/26/02, setting hearing for motion to compel arbitration ( to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel ) [86-4] at 10:00 4/26/02 3pg(s) (SJH)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 90 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: 3/28/2002 Affidavit
                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of United Bank Open regarding motion to dismiss the action or the crossclaims [86-1], regarding motion to dismiss both or either of the defendants [86-2], regarding motion to stay the action [86-3], regarding motion to compel arbitration [86-4] 5pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 88 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: 3/28/2002 Affidavit
                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of John C. James regarding motion to dismiss the action or the crossclaims [86-1], regarding motion to dismiss both or either of the defendants [86-2], regarding motion to stay the action [86-3], regarding motion to compel arbitration [86-4] 10pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 87 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: 3/28/2002 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by Frunzik Galstyan and United Bank in support of motion to dismiss the action or the crossclaims [86-1], of motion to dismiss both or either of the defendants [86-2], of motion to stay the action [86-3], of motion to compel arbitration [86-4] 28pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 86 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: 3/28/2002, Terminated: 8/23/2002 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                        MOTION by Frunzik Galstyan and United Bannk Open Joint Stock Co to dismiss the action or the crossclaims , or to dismiss both or either of the defendants , or in the alternative to stay the action , and to compel arbitration ( to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel ) , ret. 5/17/02 at 10:00 a.m. 3pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 85 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: 3/28/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ATTORNEY by John C. James, attorney Frunzik Galstyan and United Bank Open Joint Stock Co. 6pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 89 Filed: 3/26/2002, Entered: 3/28/2002 Affidavit
                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Frunzik Galstyan regarding motion to dismiss the action or the crossclaims [86-1], regarding motion to dismiss both or either of the defendants [86-2], regarding motion to stay the action [86-3], regarding motion to compel arbitration [86-4] 8pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 84 Filed: 3/26/2002, Entered: 3/27/2002 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                              NOTICE of assignment of case for trial jury trial set as of 9/1/02 5pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/19/2002, Entered: 3/19/2002 Notice - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                NOTICE by defendant Frunzik Galstyan of association of counsel John Charles James (MMC)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 82 Filed: 3/18/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002 Affidavit
                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Michael S. Grant regarding motion for default judgment against Fard International [80-1] 10pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 81 Filed: 3/18/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by plaintiff in support of motion for default judgment against Fard International [80-1] 5pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 80 Filed: 3/18/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002 Motion for Default JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                      MOTION by plaintiff for default judgment against Fard International ( to Judge Richard H. Kyle ) , ret. 5/1/02 at 8:15 a.m. 4pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 83 Filed: 3/15/2002, Entered: 3/21/2002 Order
                                                                                                        PETITION AND ORDER for admission pro hac vice ( Clerk Richard D. Sletten ) on behalf of Frunzik Galstyan and United Bank Open Joint Stock Co by Hassan A Abbas 1pg(s) (DFL) Modified on 03/21/2002
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 79 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: 2/26/2002 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                          LETTER dated 2/22/02 from James Crassweller withdrawing motion to compel responses to discovery requests ( to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel ) [74-1] 1pg (DFL)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 78 Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: 2/13/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            SECOND AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULE ( Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel / 2/4/02) that Fard Int'l and Taylor shall have until 3/4/02 to enter appearance; if no appearance has been entered, the court will conclude that Fard Int'l is in default and Taylor is proceeding pro se and will comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules; regarding discovery, the taking of depositions; negotiations to the distribution of funds; parties to submit Rule 26(f) report on or before 6/1/02; certain topics to be discussed at case management conference set for 6/25/02 at 9:00 a.m. 2pg(s) (cc: counsel) (copies mailed from chambers to Fard Int'l through Rezo Mozdianfard and to John James) (DFL) Modified on 02/13/2002
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 77 Filed: 2/4/2002, Entered: 2/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              MINUTES OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/ORDER ( Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel / 2/4/02); Fard and Taylor shall have until 3/4/02 to enter appearances; if no appearance has been entered by 3/4/02, the court will conclude that Fard is in default and that Taylor will proceed pro se and will comply with all of the Federal Rules and Local Rules of this court; parties represented by John James shall respond to outstanding discovery on or before 3/4/02; Dain may take no more than five depositions to be conducted in Mpls., or by video conference on or before 5/1/02; parties shall attempt to negotiate the distribution of the funds remaining on deposit at Dain and report on or before 6/1/02, whether they have reached agreement on that issue; parties submit on or before 6/1/02 Rule 26(f) report case management conference set for 9:00 a.m. on 6/25/02 2pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 76 Filed: 1/31/2002, Entered: 2/2/2002 Affidavit
                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of James R. Crassweller regarding motion to compel responses to discovery requests [74-1] 2+pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 75 Filed: 1/31/2002, Entered: 2/2/2002 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by Sinesio Jesus Pasarin Diaz in support of motion to compel responses to discovery requests [74-1] 7pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 74 Filed: 1/31/2002, Entered: 2/2/2002 Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    MOTION by Sinesio Jesus Pasarin Diaz to compel responses to discovery requests ( to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel ) , ret. 3/4/02 at 9:00 a.m. 3pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 73 Filed: 1/17/2002, Entered: 1/19/2002 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                      LETTER TO COUNSE/NOTICE of hearing case management conference set for 2:00 p.m. on 2/4/01 1pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 72 Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: 1/16/2002 Motion to ExtendCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        JOINT LETTER/MOTION by several counterclaim defenants and defendants for extension of pretrial schedule dates , to bifurcate discovery and trial of the interpleader action from the discovery and trial of the counterclaims ( to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel ) 1pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 71 Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: 1/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER ( Judge Richard H. Kyle / 1/14/02) that the attached letter from counsel is referred to Chief Magistrate Judge Noel for disposition 2pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 70 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/15/2002 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                            RETURNS OF SERVICE, Re: amended complaint and second amended complaint - executed upon defendant Frunzik Galstyan and United Bankon 9/15/01 11pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 69 Filed: 12/28/2001, Entered: 1/7/2002 Notice - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Abingbury Investment, JMD International, of association of counsel Richard I Diamond. 1 pg(s) (VEM)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 68 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 1/3/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defts Eastover Ltd., Marlene Oilgisser, Haresh Patel & Anastasias Drivas. (2pg(s) (DDB)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 67 Filed: 11/21/2001, Entered: 11/26/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER ( Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel / 11/21/01) granting James B. Sheehy's motion to withdraw as attorney for Marlene Oilgisser, Haresh Patel, Anastasias Drivas, Eastover Ltd., Abingbury Investments, JMD Int'l and Fard Int'l [59-1]; all defendants previously represented by Mr. Sheehy must enter new appearance by counsel on or before 1/1/02; in the absence of new appearance, all corporate entites shall be declared in default, and all individuals shall presumed to be appearing pro se, thereby attaching forthwith the obligations to comply with the deadlines of this action and rules of the court 2pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 66 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/20/2001 Reply to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                    ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS by Dain Rauscher, Inc. of Eastover, Oilgisser, Patel, Drivas, Abingbury Investments, JMD Int'l and Fard Int'l 9pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 65 Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      MINUTES:( Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel / tape 2090-3081) granting motion to withdraw attorney James Brian Sheehy [59-1] for Fard International, for JMD International, for Abingbury Investment, for Anastasias Drivas, for Haresh Patel, for Marlene Oilgisser. All defts previously represented by Mr. Sheehy enter new appearance of counsel on or before 1/1/02. 1 pg(s) (VEM)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 64 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/10/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY LIEN. 3 pg(s) (VEM)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 63 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/10/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                          COUNTECLAIM SUMMONS - RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon counter-defendant Jon Kappes on 8/6/01 pg(s) (VEM)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 62 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/10/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                            COUNTERCLAIM SUMMONS - RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon plaintiff Dain Rauscher, Inc. on 7/20/01. 4 pg(s) (VEM)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 61 Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: 11/3/2001 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of James Brian Sheehy regarding motion to withdraw attorney . [59-1] (4 pgs) (MKC)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 60 Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: 11/3/2001 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM by Eastover Ltd., Marlene Oilgisser, Haresh Patel, Anastasias Drivas , Abingbury Investments Ltd, JMD Int'l and fard Int'l Trading Ltd. in support of motion to withdraw attorney . [59-1] (4 pgs) (MKC)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 59 Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: 11/3/2001, Terminated: 11/21/2001 Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by counsel for Marlene Oilgisser, Haresh Patel, Anastasias Drivas , Eastover Ltd., Abingbury Investments, Ltd, JMD Int'l and Fard Int'l Trading Ltd. to withdraw attorney ( to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. )ret 11/13/01 at 11:30 (James Brian Sheehy) (2 pgs) (MKC)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 58 Filed: 10/26/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001 Answer
                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, COUNTERCLAIMS AND CROSS-CLAIMS by Eastover Ltd., Marlene Oilgisser, Haresh Patel, Anastasias Drivas, Sinesio Jesus Pasarin Diaz, Abingbury Investment; jury demand 34+pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 57 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: 10/5/2001 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                      LETTERS/REQUEST by Mitchell Granberg that the second amended complaint for interpleader be served, by registered mail on Frunzik Galstyan and H.Hk.Galstyan 2pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: 10/5/2001 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                        Issued second amended summons as to Frunzik Galstyan and H.Hk.Galstyan; original summons will be maintained on left-side of file as only a copy of the summons will be mailed; service is being made by registered mail, therefore, the mail will be the means of service and not a person or entity, so the original summons need not be mailed (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 56 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/28/2001 Reply to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER by dft Jon Kappes to amended Counterclaims of Sinesio jesus Pasarin Diaz. [53-1] 10pg(s) (PAK)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 55 Filed: 9/24/2001, Entered: 9/25/2001 Reply to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                            SEPARATE ANSWER of Pltf Daine Rauscher Inc. to amended counterclaims of Dft Sinesio Jesus Pasarin Diaz. [53-1] 9pg(s) (PAK)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 54 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 9/5/2001 Crossclaim
                                                                                                                                                              CROSSCLAIM ; by Sinesio Jesus Pasarin Diaz against Qumram, Inc., John Baulian (filed as part of answer to second amended complaint) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 53 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 9/5/2001 Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                COUNTERCLAIM ; by Sinesio Jesus Pasarin Diaz against Dain Rauscher, Inc. (filed as part of answer to second amended complaint), this counterclaim includes countercalim against Jon Kappes - countercalim already filed against Jon Kappes (Document No. 20) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 52 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 9/5/2001 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER by Sinesio Jesus Pasarin Diaz; jury demand 20pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 51 Filed: 8/21/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                    SECOND AMENDED INTERPLEADER COMPLAINT [14-1] by plaintiff; adding dfts Abingbury Investments Limited, JMD International, Fard International Trading Limited, United Bank Open Joint-Stock Company and Does 1-10 16pg(s) (DFL) Modified on 04/04/2002
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 50 Filed: 8/17/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001 Reply to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER by Dain Rauscher, Inc. to Counterclaim [46-1] 19 pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 49 Filed: 8/17/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel ) granting motion to amend amended complaint for interpleader [40-1] 3pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 48 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001 Reply to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER by counter-defendant Jon Kappes to Counterclaim [46-1] 17pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 47 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: 8/8/2001 Crossclaim
                                                                                                                                                                            CROSSCLAIM ; by Eastover Ltd., Marlene Oilgisser, Haresh Patel, Anastasias Drivas, Abingbury Investment, JMD International, Fard International against Qumram, Inc., John Baulian (filed as part of amended answer, Doc. No. 45) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 46 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: 8/8/2001 Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                              COUNTERCLAIM; jury demand ; by Eastover Ltd., Marlene Oilgisser, Haresh Patel, Anastasias Drivas, Abingbury Investment, JMD International, Fard International against Dain Rauscher, Inc., Jon Kappes (filed as part of amended answer) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: 8/8/2001 Amended Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED ANSWER [14-1] by Eastover Ltd., Marlene Oilgisser, Haresh Patel, Anastasias Drivas, Abingbury Investment, JMD International, Fard International; jury demand 32+pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: 8/8/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                  COPY OF SUMMONS AND RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Frunzik Galstyan on 5/31/01 20pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 43 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: 8/8/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                    COPY OF SUMMONS AND RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Haresh Patel on 5/30/01 3pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 42 Filed: 8/1/2001, Entered: 8/4/2001 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Mitchell W. Grandberg re: motion to amend amended complaint [40-1]. (37pg(s) (CJF)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 41 Filed: 8/1/2001, Entered: 8/4/2001 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by pltf in support of motion to amend amended complaint [40-1]. (6pg(s) (CJF)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 40 Filed: 8/1/2001, Entered: 8/4/2001, Terminated: 8/17/2001 Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by pltf to amend amended complaint ( to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel ) ret. 8/20/01 at 9:30 A.M. (2pg(s) (CJF)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 39 Filed: 7/24/2001, Entered: 7/26/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel), Re: discovery and that Oilgesser, Patel, Drivas, Eastover, JMD, Abingbury and Fard have to and including 7/18/01 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint 4pg(s)(cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 38 Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: 7/24/2001 Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                              COUNTERCLAIM; jury demand ; by Jon Kappes against Dain Rauscher, Inc. (filed as part of answer and counterclaim to amended complaint - above docketentry) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 37 Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: 7/24/2001 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIMS by Eastover Ltd., Marlene Oilgisser, Haresh Patel, Anastasias Drivas, Abingbury Investment, JMD International, Fard International; jury demand 31+pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: 7/24/2001 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                  COUNTERCLAIM SUMMONS issued as to Dain Rauscher, Inc. (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 36 Filed: 6/20/2001, Entered: 6/22/2001 Reply to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER by counter-defendant Jon Kappes to Counterclaim of defendant, Diaz [20-2] 9pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 35 Filed: 6/15/2001, Entered: 6/19/2001 Reply to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER by Dain Rauscher, Inc. to Counterclaim of Jesus Pasarin Diaz [20-2] 9pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 34 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: 6/7/2001 Notice - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: terminating attorney James McDonald for JMD International, Abingbury Investment, De Verney Brook Taylor, Anastasias Drivas, Haresh Patel, Marlene Oilgisser & Eastover Ltd. and substituting attorney James Brian Sheehy. (3pg(s) (DDB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 33 Filed: 6/1/2001, Entered: 6/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER ( Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel / 6/1/01) ; amd complaint set for 8/1/01 ; discovery set for 5/1/02 ; non-dispositive motions set for 5/1/02 ; dispositive motions set for 7/1/02 ; ready for jury trial set 9/1/02 (3 pgs) (cc: counsel) (MKC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 32 Filed: 5/30/2001, Entered: 6/6/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES:( Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel / ) re: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (3 pgs) (MKC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 31 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Judge Richard H. Kyle ) that Dain Rauscher has to and including 6/15/01 to answer, move or otherwise respond to counterclaim of Diaz; defendant, Diaz, shall respond to plaintiff's discovery requests on or before 6/15/01 3pg(s)(cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 30 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel ) that Jon Kappes has to and including 6/20/01 to answer or otherwise respond to Diaz's counterclaims 3pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 5/18/2001, Entered: 5/21/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COPY OFSUMMONS AND RETURNS OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Eastover Ltd. on 3/7/01, on defendant Marlene Oilgisser and defendant Anastasias Drivas on 3/8/01 4pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 5/10/2001, Entered: 5/11/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by JMD International to complaint [14-1] 1pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 5/10/2001, Entered: 5/11/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by Abingbury Investment to complaint [14-1] 1 pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 5/10/2001, Entered: 5/11/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by De Verney Brook Taylor to complaint [14-1] 1pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 5/10/2001, Entered: 5/11/2001 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER/RESPONSE by Haresh Patel 1pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 5/10/2001, Entered: 5/11/2001 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER/RESPONSE by Eastover Ltd. 1pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 5/10/2001, Entered: 5/11/2001 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER/RESPONSE by Marlene Oilgisser 1pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 5/10/2001, Entered: 5/11/2001 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER/RESPONSE by Anastasias Drivas 1pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 5/4/2001, Entered: 5/8/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COUNTERCLAIM SUMMONS - executed upon counter-defendant Jon Kappes (no date indicated) 2pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 4/30/2001, Entered: 5/1/2001 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to amended complaint [14-1] and COUNTERCLAIM; jury demand by Sinesio Jesus Pasarin Diaz against Jon Kappes 16+pg(s) (DFL) Modified on 05/01/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/30/2001, Entered: 5/1/2001 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COUNTERCLAIM SUMMONS issued as to Jon Kappes (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: 3/28/2001 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Copy of LETTER (Chief Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel) in regards to scheduling pretrial conference set for 2:00 5/30/01 before FLN 1pg(s) (mailed from chambers) (SJH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 18 Filed: 3/26/2001, Entered: 3/27/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Pretrial SCHEDULE (Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel) amd complaint set for 7/1/01 ; discovery set for 5/1/02 ; non-dispositive motions set for 5/1/02 ; dispositive motions set for 7/1/02 ; ready for trial set for 9/1/02 3pg(s) (cc: counsel) (JMR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 3/23/2001, Entered: 3/27/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES:( Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel ) re: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE 3pg(s) (JMR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/23/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS issued as to Frunzik Galstyan and served by registered mail (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER to court from counsel for plaintiff requesting that summons and complaint be served upon defendant, Frunzik Galstyan 1pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 3/12/2001, Entered: 3/16/2001 Report of Rule 26.f Planning Meeting
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPORT OF RULE 26(f) MEETING by Dain Rauscher, Inc., Eastover Ltd., Marlene Oilgisser, Haresh Patel, Anastasias Drivas 9pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 3/12/2001, Entered: 3/16/2001 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT [1-1] by plaintiff; adding Eastover Ltd., Marlene Oilgisser, Haresh Patel, Anastasias Drivas 13pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/12/2001, Entered: 3/16/2001 Notice - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PRO HAC VICE SENT to out of state attorney: James McDonald (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/6/2001, Entered: 3/6/2001 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS issued as to defendants and given to counsel (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 13 Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: 2/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ( Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel / 2/15/01) initial pretrial conference set for 9:00 a.m. on 3/23/01 ; Rule report ddl set for 3/12/01 2pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 12 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/25/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER OF RECUSAL ( Magistrate Judge John M. Mason / 1/23/01) Case referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel per Magistrate Recusal list , 4:01 AD 30 2pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 11 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER ( Judge Richard H. Kyle) Pltf's motion for temporary restraining order denied without prejudice. [2-1] 1 pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (VEM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES:( Judge Richard H. Kyle / R. Riley) Pltf's motion for temporary restraining order argued and denied. [2-1] 1 pg(s) (VEM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT OF AUTHORITY FILED by John Baulian regarding motion for temporary restraining order. [2-1] 2pgs (VEM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT of James K.Langdon in support of temporary restraining order certifying efforts to give notice. [2-1] 8pg(s) (VEM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by plaintiff in support of motion for temporary restraining order. [2-1] 3pg(s) (VEM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 Notice - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by John Baulian of association of counsel Gary Maynard Hansen (MMC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: 1/22/2001 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by plaintiff of setting hearing for motion for temporary restraining order to Judge Richard H. Kyle [2-1] at 8:00 am on 1/23/01. 2 pg(s) (VEM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: 1/19/2001 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of David M. Fogel regarding motion for temporary restraining order. [2-1] 4+pg(s) (VEM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: 1/19/2001 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of James K. Langdon regarding motion for temporary restraining order. [2-1] 3pg(s) (VEM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: 1/19/2001 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM by plaintiff in support of motion for temporary restraining order. [2-1] 8pg(s) (VEM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: 1/19/2001 Motion for TROCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by plaintiff for temporary restraining order. ( to Judge Richard H. Kyle ) 2 pg(s) (VEM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: 1/19/2001 ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT - No summons issued. Assigned to Judge Richard H. Kyle per Master list and referred to Magistrate Judge M. Mason, rcpt. no. 419724 6pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 423 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?