A. Cabaluna v. WMC Mortgage Corporation, et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 2010-1-CV-182875

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 21, 2018 at 2:29 PM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cabaluna, Aurora, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Bay Valley Professional Center, Defendant
No Logo Citinet Mortgage, Defendant
No Logo Executive Trustee Services, LLC, Defendant
No Logo First American Title Company, Defendant
No Logo Gmac Mortgage Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Defendant
No Logo Westwood Associates, Defendant
No Logo Wmc Mortgage Corporation, Defendant
Case Type Other Complaint (Not Spec) Unlimited (42)
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 38 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
of dismissal of action due to no appearance by pltf on 4/14/11 signed by Judge McKenney.; Legacy Name = CV Order; Decision = G; Closed = 04/25/2011
    Blank 37 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None Notice: Dismissal of Action
    CV-Ntc:Dismissal of Action; Decision = M; Closed = 04/20/2011
      Blank 36 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
      alisa a givental; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 01/25/2011
        Blank 35 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
        atty Kreft; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 01/25/2011
          Blank 34 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None Request-Judicial Notice
          CV Req:Judicial Ntc; Decision = M; Closed = 12/22/2010
            Blank 33 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
            CV Memo:Ps & As/Suppt of Demurrer; Decision = M; Closed = 12/22/2010
              Blank 32 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None Demurrer
              to compl. 5-12-11 9am dept.21 Alisa A. Givental; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Demurrer, Unltd; Decision = M; Closed = 12/22/2010
                Blank 31 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None Declaration
                of non monetary status. Atty Wechsler; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 12/21/2010
                  Blank 30 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                  Taken on decl of non monetary status ; ; Legacy Name = CV First Paper Def - Unltd; Decision = M; Closed = 12/21/2010
                    Blank 29 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                    CV Memo:Ps & As/Suppt of Mtn; Decision = M; Closed = 12/17/2010
                      Blank 28 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None Proof of Service
                      CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 12/17/2010
                        Blank 27 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None Motion-Strike
                        improper remedies from plts complt. 5/12/11 at 9am Dept 21. Atty Wechsler; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Mtn to Strike; Decision = M; Closed = 12/17/2010
                          Blank 26 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None Request-Judicial Notice
                          CV Req:Judicial Ntc; Decision = M; Closed = 12/17/2010
                            Blank 25 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                            CV Memo:Ps & As/Suppt of Mtn; Decision = M; Closed = 12/17/2010
                              Blank 24 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None Request-Judicial Notice
                              CV Req:Judicial Ntc; Decision = M; Closed = 12/17/2010
                                Blank 23 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                CV Memo:Ps & As/Suppt of Demurrer; Decision = M; Closed = 12/17/2010
                                  Blank 22 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None Demurrer
                                  CV Demurrer, no fees; Decision = M; Closed = 12/17/2010
                                    Blank 21 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None Demurrer
                                    hrg 5.12.11 at 9am dept 21; atty lowenthal; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Demurrer, Unltd; Decision = M; Closed = 12/17/2010
                                      Blank 20 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None Demurrer
                                      to plts complt. 5/12/11 at 9am Dept 21. Atty Wechsler; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Demurrer, Unltd; Decision = M; Closed = 12/17/2010
                                        Blank 19 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None Declaration: Non-Service
                                        CV Decl:Non-Service; Decision = M; Closed = 12/16/2010
                                          Blank 18 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None Declaration: Non-Service
                                          CV Decl:Non-Service; Decision = M; Closed = 12/16/2010
                                            Blank 17 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None Declaration: Non-Service
                                            CV Decl:Non-Service; Decision = M; Closed = 12/16/2010
                                              Blank 16 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None Declaration: Non-Service
                                              CV Decl:Non-Service; Decision = M; Closed = 12/16/2010
                                                Blank 15 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None Declaration: Non-Service
                                                CV Decl:Non-Service; Decision = M; Closed = 12/16/2010
                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                  CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 12/16/2010
                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                    CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 12/16/2010
                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                      CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 12/16/2010
                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                        CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 12/16/2010
                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None Substitution-Attorney
                                                          old: liverpool; new: pro per; Legacy Name = CV Substitution of Attorney; Decision = M; Closed = 12/06/2010
                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None Order: Ex Parte
                                                            Order for TRO Re: Preliminary Injunction (by Aurora Cabaluna, in Pro Per); Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Order; Decision = D; Closed = 12/03/2010
                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None Declaration
                                                              Re: Exparte Application; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 12/03/2010
                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                Of Aurora Cabaluna; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 12/03/2010
                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None Application: Ex Parte (Fee Applies)
                                                                  TRO re: Preliminary Injunction (William Pierce) *Denied*; Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Appl; Decision = M; Closed = 12/03/2010
                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None Notice
                                                                    limited scope rep; Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 12/03/2010
                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None Substitution-Attorney
                                                                      old: pro per; new: liverpool; Legacy Name = CV Substitution of Attorney; Decision = M; Closed = 12/03/2010
                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                                                        CV Summons Filed; Decision = M; Closed = 09/17/2010
                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                          pro per; Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 09/17/2010
                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                                                            CV Case Cover Sheet; Decision = M; Closed = 09/17/2010

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?