JTS CORPORATION v. INGRAM MICRO
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 1998-1-CV-775906

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 21, 2018 at 4:24 PM EST (3.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Jts Corporation, Plaintiff
v.
Ingram Micro Ingram Micro, Defendant
No Logo Nmb Technologies Inc., Claimant
Case Type Other Contract Unlimited (37)
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 6/28/2003, Entered: None Document: Other
ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY:; MALCOLM CISNEROS & HOUSER; HOUSER, ERIC; 2112 BUSINESS CENTER DRIVE; 2ND FLOOR; IRVINE, CA 92612-1001; Legacy Name = Attorney Information; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
    Blank 7 Filed: 6/28/2003, Entered: None Document: Other
    ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY:; KUMAGAI, LAW OFFICES OF DUANE; KUMAGAI, DUANE; 1900 AVENUE OF THE STARS; SUITE 1800; LOS ANGELES, CA 90067-4409; Legacy Name = Attorney Information; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
      Blank 6 Filed: 6/28/2003, Entered: None Document: Other
      ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY:; BEENE, ADRON; 6472 CAMDEN AVE. STE 204; SAN JOSE, CA 95120-2827; LOS ANGELES, CA 90067-4409; (408) 323-9223; Legacy Name = Attorney Information; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
        Blank 5 Filed: 6/28/2003, Entered: None Not Active
        Case data converted on 06/28/2003; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
          Blank 4 Filed: 11/5/1998, Entered: None Request Dismissal
          REQUEST DISMISSAL WP OF COMPLT BY ADRON BEENE; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
            Blank 3 Filed: 10/8/1998, Entered: None Notice
            NTC OF LIEN; CLAIMANT NMB TECNOLOGIES INC; $4,349,351.70 (ATTY DUANE KUMAGAI); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
              Blank 2 Filed: 10/2/1998, Entered: None Response - Other than Dissolution, 1st Paper Filing
              ANSWER TO COMPLT BY INGRAM MICRO; ATTY ERIC HOUSER; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                Blank 1 Filed: 8/10/1998, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                COMPLAINT FILED; SUMMONS ISSUED; ATTY ADRON BEENE; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 1 time.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?