Abukar v. Ashcroft, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:01-cv-00242-JRT-AJB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Ayub Abukar Haji, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey J Keyes +1 612 334 8540

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin M Magnuson +1 612 349 8242 +1 612 339 4181 kmmagnuson@rkmc.com
v.
No Logo Curtis J Aljets, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo John Ashcroft, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Mary Ann Wyrsch, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office DMN
Filed 2/9/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 08 U.S.C. § 1252(a)(2) Injunction for Deportation
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County Chisago
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CV, PRI-CR, STAYED
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 40 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: 3/17/2004 Order Rejecting Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
ORDER REJECTING AS MOOT Report and Recommendation [Docket No. 33]. Petitioner's habeas corpus petition will be held in abeyance consistent with this Order. Petitioner shall be released from custody under reasonable release conditions as set by the Bureau of Customs and Immigration Enforcement. Respondent is ordered to release petitioner on March 24, 2004. Signed by Judge John R Tunheim on 031704. (DML)
    LREF
    Blank 38 Filed: 2/29/2004, Entered: 2/29/2004 Reply
    PETITONER'S REPLY to Resp's response opposing release.(VEM)
      LREF
      Blank 39 Filed: 2/24/2004, Entered: 2/29/2004 Affidavit
      AFFIDAVIT of Kevin M. Magnuson re [37] Resp's Response opposing release by Ayub Abukar Haji. (VEM)
        LREF
        Blank 37 Filed: 2/12/2004, Entered: 2/12/2004 Response
        RESPONSE by respondents to petitioner's request for release of pending supreme court's review of the petition for writ of certiorari in Jama v INS. 11pg(s) (DFL) Modified on 02/13/2004
          LREF
          Blank 36 Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: 11/20/2003 Letter
          LETTER/REQUEST to court dated 11/10/03 by petitioner for relief. 13pg(s) (DFL) Modified on 11/21/2003
            LREF
            Blank 35 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Affidavit
            AFFIDAVIT of Kevin M. Magnuson regarding report & recommendation. [33-1] 5 pg(s) (JMM)
              LREF
              Blank 34 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Response - Miscellaneous
              OBJECTIONS by petitioner Ayub Abukar Haji to report & recommendation. [33-1] 7 pg(s) (JMM)
                LREF
                Legal Document 33 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: 6/11/2003 Report and RecommendationCourt Filing
                REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION( to Judge John R. Tunheim ) ( Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan ) Petitioner's amended habeas corpus petition be denied. This action be dismissed. 11 pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (VEM)
                  LREF
                  Blank 32 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: 10/27/2002 Affidavit
                  AFFIDAVIT of Kevin M. Magnuson regarding habeas corpus petition [19-1], regarding motion to dismiss. [26-1] 3+pg(s) (VEM)
                    LREF
                    Blank 31 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: 10/27/2002 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                    MEMORANDUM by petitioner in support of amended habeas corpus petition [19-1] and oppositin to Resp's motion to dismiss [26-1] 35 pg(s) (VEM)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 30 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: 10/24/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                      STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AND ORDER ( Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan ) Petitioner shall have an extension of time to 10/22/02 within which to file his response to Resp's return, motion to dismiss and memorandum in support. 2 pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (VEM)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 9/25/2002, Entered: 9/25/2002 Notice - Miscellaneous
                        NOTICE by respondent John Ashcroft, respondent Curtis J Aljets, respondent Mary Ann Wyrsch of association of counsel Friedrich Anson Paul Siekert (MMC)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 28 Filed: 9/24/2002, Entered: 9/25/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                          STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan ) Petitioner shall have an extension of time to and including October 11, 2002, within which to file his Response to Respondents' Return, Motion to Dismiss, and Memorandum in Support. 2pg(s)(cc: all counsel) (
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 9/24/2002, Entered: 9/24/2002 Notice - Miscellaneous
                            NOTICE by petitioner Ayub Abukar Haji of association of counsel Kevin M Magnuson (MMC)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 29 Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: 9/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                              PETITION AND ORDER for admission pro hac vice ( Judge John R. Tunheim ) on behalf of respondent by Greg D Mack. 2 pg(s) (VEM)
                                LREF
                                Blank 27 Filed: 9/6/2002, Entered: 9/10/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                EXHIBITS 1-3 by respondents [26-1] separate (DFL)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 26 Filed: 9/6/2002, Entered: 11/19/2002 Response to Habeas Petition
                                  RESPONSE by respondent to habeas corpus petition [19-1] 17pg(s) (dmn)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 25 Filed: 9/6/2002, Entered: 9/10/2002 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                    MEMORANDUM by respondents in opposition to amended habeas corpus petition [19-1] 31pg(s) (DFL)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 24 Filed: 9/3/2002, Entered: 9/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER ( Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan / 9/3/02) granting motion to extend time to file a reply to amended habeas corpus petition to 9/6/02 [20-2] 1pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 23 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/8/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                        REPLY by petitioner to motion to hold case is abeyance [20-1] 4pg(s) (DFL)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 22 Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: 7/2/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER ( Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan)that the motion to hold case is abeyance is granted. [20-1] 1 pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (VEM)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 21 Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: 6/21/2002 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                            MEMORANDUM by respondents in support of motion to hold case is abeyance [20-1], of motion to extend time to file a reply to amended habeas corpus petition [20-2] 5pg(s) (DFL)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 20 Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: 6/21/2002 Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                              MOTION by respondents to hold case is abeyance , or in the alternative to extend time to file a reply to amended habeas corpus petition ( to Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan ) 3pg(s) (DFL)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 19 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: 5/2/2002 Petition for Writ of Habeas CorpusCourt Filing
                                                AMENDED FEDERAL PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS - Assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per habeas corpus and referred to Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan. 5 pg(s) (VEM)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: 5/2/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                  REPLY by petitioner to Rep's non-opposition to motion to amend petition for writ of habeas corpus. [13-1] 5 pg(s) (VEM)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 4/29/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER ( Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan )Petitioner's motion to amend is granted and Petitioner shall file and serve his amended habeas corpus petition within 20 days after the date of this order. [13-1] If Petitioner files an amended petition, Resps shall have 60 days thereafter in which to response to the amended petition and Petitioner shall have 10 days after the filing of the response in which to file a reply, but such reply shall not exceed 10 pages. 2pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (VEM)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 4/22/2002, Entered: 4/26/2002 Response
                                                      Respondents' non-opposition to motion to amend petition for writ of habeas corpus. [13-1] pg(s) (
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/10/2002 Affidavit
                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Kevin M Magnuson regarding motion to amend petition for writ of habeas corpus. [13-1] 2+pg(s) (VEM)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/10/2002 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                          MEMORANDUM by petitioner in support of motion to amend petition for writ of habeas corpus. [13-1] 5 pg(s) (VEM)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/10/2002 Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                            MOTION by petitioner to amend petition for writ of habeas corpus. ( to Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan ) 5 pg(s) (VEM)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 11/21/2001, Entered: 11/27/2001 Notice - Miscellaneous
                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: terminating attorney Gregory Guy Brooker for Mary Ann Wyrsch, Curtis J Aljets, John Ashcroft and substituting attorney Lonnie F Bryan. (2 pg(s) (MKC)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 11 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: 9/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan ) Petitioner's habeas proceeding may be stayed during the pendency of the INS'a review of the propriety of pre-removal detention of Petitioner. The INS's stipulation to not deport the Petitioner during the pendency of this action stays in effect during the stay and the remainder of this action. This stipulation is without prejudice to any right which Petitioner has to seek legal review of the INS's decision on pre-removal detention of Petitioner. [8-1] 2 pg(s)(cc: all counsel) (VEM)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 8/24/2001, Entered: 8/29/2001 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                  EXHIBITS by respondent to motion to stay habeas proceeding. [8-1] 2+pg(s) (VEM)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 8/24/2001, Entered: 8/29/2001 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                    MEMORANDUM by respondent in support of motion to stay habeas proceeding. [8-1] 13 pg(s) (VEM)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 8/24/2001, Entered: 8/29/2001 Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                                                      MOTION by respondent to stay habeas proceeding. ( to Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan ) 2 pg(s) (VEM)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: 7/31/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER ( Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan / 7/30/01) directing Resp to show cause why habeas corpus writ should not be granted and allowing reply. Resp are directed tomake a return in writing. Such return shall be due 8/24/01. Petitioner shall thereafter have until 9/14/01 to serve and file a reply to Resps' return. 2 pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (VEM)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 6/11/2001, Entered: 6/13/2001 Stipulation
                                                                          STIPULATION of withdrawal of motion for temporary restraining order 1pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 3/21/2001, Entered: 3/21/2001 Order
                                                                            PETITION AND ORDER for admission pro hac vice ( Clerk Francis E. Dosal ) on behalf of respondents by Paul D Kovac. 1 pg(s) (VEM)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/9/2001 Affidavit
                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Michele Garnett McKenzie regarding motion for temporary restraining order [2-1] 5pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/9/2001 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                MEMORANDUM by petitioner in support of motion for temporary restraining order [2-1] 8pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/9/2001, Terminated: 5/25/2001 Motion for TROCourt Filing
                                                                                  MOTION by petitioner for temporary restraining order ( to Judge John R. Tunheim ) 2pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/9/2001 Petition for Writ of Habeas CorpusCourt Filing
                                                                                    FEDERAL PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS - Assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per habeas corpus and referred to Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan, rcpt. no. 238545 4pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/9/2001 Docket Annotation
                                                                                      Sent copy of petition, motion for tro, memo in support of tro and affidavit to U.S. Attorney's Office (DFL)
                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                        This case has been viewed 127 times.

                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                        Space
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                         
                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                        Need Password Help?