Transclean, et al v. MotorVac Tech, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:01-cv-00287-JRT-FLN

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Schmidt, Johnson, Hovey & Williams, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Donald E Johnson"

Toggle Switch Represented by Briggs & Morgan PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan M Anderson +1 612 977 8400 +1 612 977 8650 aanderson@briggs.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Larkin, Hoffman, Daly & Lindgren, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cynthia M Klaus +1 952 835 3800 +1 952 896 3333 cklaus@larkinhoffman.com

Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

No Logo James P Viken, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Briggs & Morgan PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan M Anderson +1 612 977 8400 +1 612 977 8650 aanderson@briggs.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Larkin, Hoffman, Daly & Lindgren, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cynthia M Klaus +1 952 835 3800 +1 952 896 3333 cklaus@larkinhoffman.com

Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

No Logo Jon A Lang, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Briggs & Morgan PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan M Anderson +1 612 977 8400 +1 612 977 8650 aanderson@briggs.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Larkin, Hoffman, Daly & Lindgren, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cynthia M Klaus +1 952 835 3800 +1 952 896 3333 cklaus@larkinhoffman.com

Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

No Logo Transclean Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Briggs & Morgan PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan M Anderson +1 612 977 8400 +1 612 977 8650 aanderson@briggs.com

Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

v.
No Logo Automotive Shop Services, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Motorvac Technologies, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Blakely, Sokolof, Taylor & Zafman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Willmore F Holbrow, III +1 310 207 3800 +1 310 820 5988 bill_holbrow@bstz.com
Space Dennis G Martin +1 310 207 3800 +1 310 820 5988 dennis_martin@bstz.com
Space RAUL D. MARTINEZ +1 310 207 3800

Toggle Switch Represented by Gustafson Gluek PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karla M Gluek +1 612 333 8844 +1 612 339 6622 kgluek@gustafsongluek.com

Represented by Heins Mills & Olson, PLC

No Logo Penske Auto Centers, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Blakely, Sokolof, Taylor & Zafman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Willmore F Holbrow, III +1 310 207 3800 +1 310 820 5988 bill_holbrow@bstz.com
Space Dennis G Martin +1 310 207 3800 +1 310 820 5988 dennis_martin@bstz.com
Space RAUL D. MARTINEZ +1 310 207 3800

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeanette M Bazis +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 jbazis@greeneespel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gustafson Gluek PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karla M Gluek +1 612 333 8844 +1 612 339 6622 kgluek@gustafsongluek.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William J Otteson +1 612 664 5600 +1 612 664 5786 william.otteson@usdoj.gov
No Logo Snap-on Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Blakely, Sokolof, Taylor & Zafman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Willmore F Holbrow, III +1 310 207 3800 +1 310 820 5988 bill_holbrow@bstz.com
Space Dennis G Martin +1 310 207 3800 +1 310 820 5988 dennis_martin@bstz.com
Space RAUL D. MARTINEZ +1 310 207 3800

Toggle Switch Represented by Gustafson Gluek PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karla M Gluek +1 612 333 8844 +1 612 339 6622 kgluek@gustafsongluek.com
Office DMN
Filed 2/15/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Cause Section 35 U.S.C. § 145 Patent Infringement
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Hennepin
Terminated 1/7/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 03-1283[]
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, PATENT, PROTO
  Entries (73) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 68 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DESTROY DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. (akl)
    LREF
    Legal Document 67 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003 Order
    ORDER (U.S. COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE FEDERAL CIRCUIT / 7/30/03) that the proceeding is dismissed under Fed.R.App.P.42(b). 1pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/17/2003 USCA Case Number
      NOTIFICATION BY FEDERAL CIRCUIT COURT of Appellate Docket Number 03-1283 (doc #66-1) (BLW
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: 2/28/2003 Appeal - Miscellaneous
        DELIVERED/MAILED ONE CERTIFIED copy of each of the following to the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals, Washington, D. C. Office: Notice of Appeal, Orders, Judgments and District Court Clerk's Docket Entries. Copy of Notice of Appeal mailed to counsel (BLW
          LREF
          Blank 66 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 2/28/2003 Notice of Appeal to 8th CircuitCourt Filing
          NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals by defendant MotorVac Technologies, Inc., from Judge John R. Tunheim's order and judgment entered on 1/28/03 and all other orders entered in this case [65-1] [64-1] [62-1] [61-2] (1pg)(Receipt #426894) (BLW
            LREF
            Blank 65 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/28/2003 Order
            JUDGMENT entered 1pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
              LREF
              Legal Document 64 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/28/2003 OrderCourt Filing
              AMENDED ORDER FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ( Judge John R. Tunheim / 1/22/03) that judgment is entered against MotorVac and in favor of plaintiffs in the amount of $829,182 (the "Judgment Amount."); the complaint against MotorVac is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; the complaint against defendants Snap-On and Penske Auto Centers, LLC is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, except that the prior dismissal with prejudice of Counts II and III asserted against Penske Auto Centers remains in tact; upon notice to the court that MotorVac has tendered payment of the judgment amount, the dismissal of defendants Snap-On, Inc. and Penske shall become a dismissal with prejudice 2pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                LREF
                Blank 63 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 Motion for Order toCourt Filing
                MOTION by Penske Auto Centers for entry of final judgment as to identity of parties ( to Judge John R. Tunheim ) 8pg(s) (DFL)
                  LREF
                  Blank 62 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 Order
                  JUDGMENT entere 1pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 61 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ( Judge John R. Tunheim / 1/7/03) that judgment is entered against MotorVac and in favor of plaintiffs in the amount of $829,183 and plaintiffs' claims against MotorVac are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; plaintiffs' remaining claims against Snap-on, Inc., Penske Corp and Automotive Shop Services are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; upon notice to the court that MotorVac has tendered payment of the judgment amount of $829,182, the dismissal of plaintiffs' claims against Snap-on, Inc., Penske Corp. and Automotive Shop Services, Inc. shall become a dismissal with prejudice termination notice 2pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                      LREF
                      Blank 60 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/8/2002 Response - Miscellaneous
                      OBJECTIONS by plaintiff to to defendants' proposed final judgment 16pg(s) (DFL)
                        LREF
                        Blank 59 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 11/7/2002 Response - Miscellaneous
                        OBJECTIONS by defendants to Transclean's proposed judgment 3pg(s) (DFL)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 58 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: 10/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER ( Judge John R. Tunheim / 9/30/02) overruling report & recommendation objection [54-1] adopting report & recommendation [52-1] granting plaintiffs' motion to enforce settlement agreement [19-1] 23pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                            LREF
                            Blank 57 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: 6/7/2002 Memorandum in Opposition to MotionCourt Filing
                            PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE TO MOTORVAC'S objection to the Magistrate Judge's report and recommendation dated 5/3/02 [54-1](11 pgs) (MKC)
                              LREF
                              Blank 56 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/24/2002 Affidavit
                              AFFIDAVIT of Daniel E. Gustafson regarding report & recommendation objection [54-1] 2+pg(s) (DFL)
                                LREF
                                Blank 55 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/24/2002 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                MEMORANDUM by MotorVac Tech in support of report & recommendation objection [54-1] 9pg(s) (DFL)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 54 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/24/2002, Terminated: 9/30/2002 Objection to Report and Recommendations
                                  OBJECTIONS by MotorVac Tech to Report and Recommendation [52-1] 6pg(s) (DFL)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 52 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 Report and RecommendationCourt Filing
                                    REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ( Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel / 5/3/02) that plaintiffs'motion to enforce settlement agreement be granted [19-1] 8pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 53 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Judge John R. Tunheim ) of dismissal with prejudice as to Counts II and III of the complaint between plaintiffs and defendant Penske Auto Centers 2pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 51 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: 4/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING PRETRIAL ORDER ( Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel ) discovery set for 7/1/02 ; dispositive motions set for 8/1/02 3pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 50 Filed: 4/4/2002, Entered: 4/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                          STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER ( Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel ) 11pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 49 Filed: 2/5/2002, Entered: 2/7/2002 Transcript (Conventional)Court Filing
                                            TRANSCRIPT OF motion to enfore settlement agreement held 1/17/02 by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel ( Jean M. Whalen) (SEPARATE) (VEM)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 48 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/22/2002 Affidavit
                                              SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT of Dennis G. Martin regarding motion to enforce settlement agreement [19-1] 5+pg(s) (DFL)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 47 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/22/2002 Notice of Change of Address
                                                NOTICE of change of address by Alan M. Anderson and Christopher K. Larus 1pg(s) (DFL)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 46 Filed: 1/17/2002, Entered: 1/19/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                  MINUTES: ( Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel ) taking under advisement on the motion to enforce settlement agreement [19-1] granting motion for leave to file supplemental memorandum of law in oppositon to motion to enforce settlement and supplemental affidavit of Dennis G. Martin [31-1] granting motion for leave to file second supplemental affidavit [45-1] 1pg(s) (DFL)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 45 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: 1/10/2002 Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
                                                    MOTION by MotorVac Tech for leave to file second supplementall affidavit (to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel) 3pg(s) (
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 44 Filed: 1/2/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                      SECOND AMENDED NOTICE by plaintiffs setting hearing for motion to enforce settlement agreement ( was to Judge John R. Tunheim - now to Magistrate Judge Noel) [19-1] at 9:00 a.m. on 1/17/02 2pg(s) (DFL) Modified on 01/14/2002
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 43 Filed: 12/27/2001, Entered: 1/3/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                                        DECLARATION of Lee W. Melody re motion to enforce settlement agreement [19-1] 5+pg(s) (GJS)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 12/27/2001, Entered: 1/3/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                                          REDACTED DECLARATION of Barry Falk 7+pg(s) (GJS)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 39 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 1/3/2002 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                            NOTICE by pltfs of setting hearing for their motion to enforce settlement agreement ( was to Judge John R. Tunheim - now to Magistrate Judge Noel) [19-1]. ret. at 10:00 a.m. on 1/4/02 (2pg(s) (DDB)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 41 Filed: 12/19/2001, Entered: 1/3/2002 Affidavit
                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Christopher K. Larus regarding pltf's memorandum in opposition to deft Motorvac's motion for leave to file supplemental memorandum of law in oppositon to motion to enforce settlement and supplemental affidavit of Dennis G. Martin [31-1]. (16pg(s) (DDB)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 40 Filed: 12/19/2001, Entered: 1/3/2002 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                MEMORANDUM by pltf in opposition to deft Motorvac's motion for leave to file supplemental memorandum of law in oppositon to motion to enforce settlement and supplemental affidavit of Dennis G. Martin [31-1]. (11pg(s) (DDB)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 38 Filed: 12/19/2001, Entered: 12/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER OF REFERENCE ( Judge John R. Tunheim / 12/18/01) referring to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel motion to enforce settlement agreement [19-1] who will submit proposed findings of fact and a recommendation for the disposition of the motion 1pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 12/12/2001, Entered: 12/14/2001 Affidavit
                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Daniel E. Gustafson regarding motion for leave to file supplemental memorandum of law in oppositon to motion to enforce settlement and supplemental affidavit of Dennis G. Martin [31-1] 2+pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 12/12/2001, Entered: 12/14/2001 Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
                                                                      MOTION by MotorVac Tech for leave to file supplemental memorandum of law in oppositon to motion to enforce settlement and supplemental affidavit of Dennis G. Martin ( to Judge John R. Tunheim ) 2pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 37 Filed: 12/5/2001, Entered: 12/17/2001 Affidavit
                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Dennis G. Martin requesting leave to take necessary discovery pursuant to Rule 56(f) 3+pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 12/5/2001, Entered: 12/17/2001 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                          DECLARATION of Harry Falk re motion to enforce settlement agreement [19-1] filed under seal, but no protective order in place separate (DFL)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 12/5/2001, Entered: 12/17/2001 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                            DECLARATION of LeeW. Melody re motion to enforce settlement agreement [19-1] 10pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 12/5/2001, Entered: 12/17/2001 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                              MEMORANDUM by MotorVac Tech in opposition to motion to enforce settlement agreement [19-1] 28pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 33 Filed: 12/5/2001, Entered: 12/17/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM by plaintiffs in support of motion to enforce settlement agreement [19-1] 14pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 30 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: 11/28/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER ( Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel / 11/26/01) granting in part and denying in part motion for extension of time to respond to plaintiffs' motion to enforce settlement [5-1]; denied insofar as the motion seeks to extend the response; granted to the extent that the motion seeks a response to be served on or before 11/26/01 1pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/20/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                    NOTICE by Cynthia M. Klaus of withdrawal as counsel for plaintiff as she is no longer with the law firm of Fulbright & Jaworski 1pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                      MINUTES:( Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel / ) Deft's for extension of time to respond to plaintiffs' motion to enforce settlement is Granted in part and denied in part. 1. Granted to the extent the response must be served on or before 11/26/01 2. Denied to the exteneit it seeks to extend response time. [15-1] (1 pg) (MKC)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 11/5/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 Affidavit
                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Dennis G. Martin re: motion to quash deposition subpoenas. 2+pg(s) (PAK)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 11/5/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by dft MotorVac Tech in opposition to motion to quash deposition subpoenas of Larus and Anderson. 8pg(s) (PAK)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/5/2001, Entered: 11/6/2001 Notice - Miscellaneous
                                                                                            ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: terminating attorney Roy L Anderson for Snap-on Inc. and substituting attorney Willmore F Holbrow III, Raul D Martinez, Dennis Martin 2pg(s) (PAK)
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 25 Filed: 11/5/2001, Entered: 11/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL OF SNAP-ON INC. AND ORDER ( Judge John R. Tunheim / 11/2/01) pg(s) that Roy L. Anderson withdraws as counsel and Dennis G. Martin, Willmore F. Holbrow and Raul d. Martinez are substituted as counsel for dft. (cc: all counsel) (PAK)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 12/14/2001 Affidavit
                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Christopher K. Larus regarding motion for extension of time to respond to plaintiffs' motion to enforce settlement [15-1] separat and sealed (DFL)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 11/3/2001 Affidavit
                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Christopher K. Larus, dtd. 9/24/01 regarding motion to enforce settlement agreement [19-1] pg(s) (UNDER SEAL - SEPARATE) (PAK)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 12/14/2001 Affidavit
                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Sharna A. Wahlgren regarding motion for extension of time to respond to plaintiffs' motion to enforce settlement [15-1] 2+pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 12/14/2001 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by plaintiffs in opposition to motion for extension of time to respond to plaintiffs' motion to enforce settlement [15-1] 6pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 11/3/2001 Affidavit
                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Alan M. Anderson regarding motion to enforce settlement agreement [19-1] 6+pg(s) (PAK)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 11/3/2001 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by pltfs in support of motion to enforce settlement agreement [19-1] 10pg(s) (PAK)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 11/3/2001 Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                            MOTION by pltf to enforce settlement agreement ( was to Judge John R. Tunheim - now to Magistrate Judge Noel) 1pg(s) (PAK) Modified on 12/19/2001
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 10/25/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                              AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION by dft for extension of time to respond to plaintiffs' motion to enforce settlement [15-1] before FLN at 10:00 11/13/01 2pg(s) (PAK)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 10/24/2001, Entered: 10/29/2001 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Dennis G. Martin re motion for extension of time to respond to plaintiffs' motion to enforce settlement [15-1] 6pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 10/24/2001, Entered: 10/29/2001 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                  COPY OF MEMORANDUM by MotorVac Tech in support of motion for extension of time to respond to plaintiffs' motion to enforce settlement [15-1] 6pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 10/24/2001, Entered: 10/29/2001 Motion to ExtendCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    MOTION by MotorVac Tech for extension of time to respond to plaintiffs' motion to enforce settlement ( to Judge John R. Tunheim ) 3pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 10/9/2001, Entered: 10/11/2001 Notice - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION (approved by Judge John R. Tunheim): terminating law firm of Jeffers Shaff & Falk for MotorVac Technologies and Penske Auto Centers and substituting attorneys Dennis G. Martin, Willmore Holbrow, III and Raul D. Martinez of the law firm of Blakely Sokoloff Taylor & Zafman 6pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/5/2001 Order
                                                                                                                        PETITION AND ORDER for admission pro hac vice ( Clerk Richard D. Sletten ) on behalf of MotorVac Tech by Dennis Martin 1pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/5/2001 Order
                                                                                                                          PETITION AND ORDER for admission pro hac vice ( Clerk Richard D. Sletten ) on behalf of MotorVac Tech by Willmore F Holbrow III 1pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/5/2001 Order
                                                                                                                            PETITION AND ORDER for admission pro hac vice ( Clerk Richard D. Sletten ) on behalf of MotorVac Tech by Raul D Martinez 1pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/23/2001 Notice - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: terminating attorney Byron Todd Jones for Penske Auto Centers, attorney Becky Raye Thorson for Penske Auto Centers and substituting attorney Jeanette M Bazis and William J. Otteson (Otteson already listed) 1pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/6/2001, Entered: 7/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                PRETRIAL SCHEDULE ( Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel / 7/5/01) amendments and adding parties set for 9/1/01 ; discovery set for 5/1/02 ; non-dispositive motions set for 6/1/02 ; dispositive motions set for 7/1/02 ; ready for trial set 9/1/02 3pg(s) (cc: counsel) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 6/29/2001, Entered: 7/9/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  MINUTES: ( Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel ) re: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE 3pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 6/22/2001, Entered: 6/26/2001 Report of Rule 26.f Planning Meeting
                                                                                                                                    JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT. (7 pgs) (MKC)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 5/4/2001, Entered: 5/8/2001 Answer
                                                                                                                                      ANSWER by MotorVac Tech, Snap-on Inc., Penske Auto Centers 12pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/25/2001, Entered: 4/26/2001, Terminated: 11/27/2001 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference (Chief Magistrate Judge Franklin Noel) Initial pretrial conference set for 9:00 6/29/01 before FLN 4pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/23/2001, Entered: 4/24/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel ) that Penske Auto Centers is subsituted as a party in place of Penske Corp.; that Penske Corp. be dismissed without prejudice and all defendants are given an extension to 5/4/01 to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' complaint 3pg(s)(cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/19/2001, Entered: 3/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel ) that defendants MotorVac, Snap-on and Penske have to and including 4/19/01 to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint 2pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 3/16/2001, Entered: 3/20/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                              ORIGINAL SUMMONS AND RETURNS OF SERVICE, Re: service of summons and complaint - executed upon defendant MotorVac Tech, defendant Snap-on Inc. on 2/26/01, on defendant Penske Corporation, defendant Automotive Shop on 2/27/01 5pg(s) (DFL) Modified on 03/20/2001
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: 2/20/2001 ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT - Summons issued. Assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Patent list and referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel, rcpt. no. 419855 8pg(s) - 30pg(s) with exhibits (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: 2/20/2001 Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                  Mailed copy of complaint to Patent Office (DFL)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 110 times.

                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?