U. Moreno v. Homeq Servicing Corporation, et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 2009-1-CV-137441

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 22, 2018 at 2:10 AM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Moreno, Ubaldina, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo HomeQ Servicing Corp., Defendant
Officially listed as "Homeq Servicing Corporation"
No Logo Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Defendant
No Logo RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES, LP, Defendant
No Logo Wachovia Bank, Defendant
No Logo Wells Fargo & Company, Defendant
No Logo Wmc Mortgage Corporation, Defendant
Case Type Fraud Unlimited (16)
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 34 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None Request Dismissal
by Atty Lawrence P. Ramirez; Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/Prej; Decision = M; Closed = 10/13/2009
    Blank 33 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: None Request Dismissal
    by Atty Lawrence P. Ramirez; Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/o Prej; Decision = M; Closed = 09/24/2009
      Blank 32 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
      CV Memo:Ps & As/Suppt of Mtn; Decision = M; Closed = 09/14/2009
        Blank 31 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None Motion-Strike
        portions of plt's 1st amended comp 11/17/09 9:00 am dept 19 atty lawrence harris; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Mtn to Strike; Decision = M; Closed = 09/14/2009
          Blank 30 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None Request-Judicial Notice
          CV Req:Judicial Ntc; Decision = M; Closed = 09/14/2009
            Blank 29 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
            CV Memo:Ps & As/Suppt of Demurrer; Decision = M; Closed = 09/14/2009
              Blank 28 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None Proof of Service
              CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 09/14/2009
                Blank 27 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None Demurrer
                to plt's 1st amended comp; memo of ps and as; req for judicial ntc 11/17/09 9:00 am dept 19 atty lawrence harris; Legacy Name = CV Demurrer & Ntc of Hrg; Decision = M; Closed = 09/14/2009
                  Blank 26 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None Demurrer
                  11-12-09, 9am, d.19; atty houser; Legacy Name = CV Demurrer & Ntc of Hrg; Decision = M; Closed = 09/03/2009
                    Blank 25 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: None Complaint - Amended
                    CV 1st Amended Complaint; Decision = M; Closed = 08/14/2009
                      Blank 24 Filed: 8/7/2009, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                      E. D. Houser; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 08/07/2009
                        Blank 23 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                        H. Chuang; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 08/03/2009
                          Blank 22 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: None Substitution-Attorney
                          old jagprit; new ramirez; Legacy Name = CV Substitution of Attorney; Decision = M; Closed = 07/30/2009
                            Blank 21 Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                            atty glenn wechsler; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 07/28/2009
                              Blank 20 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                              atty farlin; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 07/13/2009
                                Blank 19 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                to response to osc re preliminary injunction; Legacy Name = CV Reply; Decision = M; Closed = 07/13/2009
                                  Blank 18 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                  to OSC re: Preliminary Injunction; Declaration (Geoffrey Brethen); Legacy Name = CV Response; Decision = M; Closed = 07/08/2009
                                    Blank 17 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None Request-Judicial Notice
                                    Demurrer to complaint. 8/20/09, 9:00am, dept 19. Atty Houser; Legacy Name = CV Req:Judicial Ntc; Decision = M; Closed = 07/02/2009
                                      Blank 16 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None Demurrer
                                      Demurrer to complaint. 8/20/09, 9:00am, dept 19. Atty Houser; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Demurrer, Unltd; Decision = M; Closed = 07/02/2009
                                        Blank 15 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None Order: Ex ParteCourt Filing
                                        re tro & osc re prelim inj is set for 7-16-09, 9am, dept. 19, granted by Judge Emerson; Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Order; Decision = G; Closed = 06/29/2009
                                          Blank 14 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                          Decl of Atty Henry Chuang in Support of Plt's Ex Parte Appl for TRO to Stop Foreclosure Sale and OSC Re: Prelimin Injunction (H. Chuang); Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 06/29/2009
                                            Blank 13 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None Notice
                                            Ex Parte Appl for TRO to Stop Foreclosure Sale and OSC Re: Prelimin Injunction (H. Chuang); Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 06/29/2009
                                              Blank 12 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None Motion: Preliminary Injunction
                                              Ex Parte Appl for TRO to Stop Foreclosure Sale and OSC Re: Prelimin Injunction (H. Chuang); Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte OSC re Prelim Inj; Decision = M; Closed = 06/29/2009
                                                Blank 11 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                CV Memo:Ps & As/Suppt of Mtn; Decision = M; Closed = 06/25/2009
                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None Motion-Strike
                                                  portions of plt's comp 8/20/09 9:00 am dept 19 atty lawrence harris; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Mtn to Strike; Decision = M; Closed = 06/25/2009
                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None Request-Judicial Notice
                                                    CV Req:Judicial Ntc; Decision = M; Closed = 06/25/2009
                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                      CV Memo:Ps & As/Suppt of Demurrer; Decision = M; Closed = 06/25/2009
                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                        CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 06/25/2009
                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None Demurrer
                                                          to comp 8/20/09 9:00 am dept 19 atty lawrence harris - 1655 north main street, suite 230, walnut creek, ca 94596; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Demurrer, Unltd; Decision = M; Closed = 06/25/2009
                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: None Substitution-Attorney
                                                            Old; Jagprit New: Lawrence Ramirez; Legacy Name = CV Substitution of Attorney; Decision = M; Closed = 05/08/2009
                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: None Notice: Lis Pendens
                                                              CV Ntc:Lis Pendens; Decision = M; Closed = 03/16/2009
                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                                                CV Summons Filed; Decision = M; Closed = 03/16/2009
                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                  CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 03/16/2009
                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                                                    CV Case Cover Sheet; Decision = M; Closed = 03/16/2009

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?