USA v. Kipper
Criminal Case Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:01-cr-00266-RHK-SRN

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James E Lackner +1 612 664 5600 +1 612 664 5787 james.lackner@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office DMN
Filed 9/11/2001
County Hennepin
Terminated 10/25/2002
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 846=ND.F
Offense Level 4
21846, 841(a)(1), 841(b)(1)(B) & 183237 CONSPIRACY TO POSSESS WITH INTENT TO DISTRIBUTE COCAINE
Count 2
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 841A=ND.F
Offense Level 4
21841(a)(1), 841(b)(1)(B), 846 and 182 & 3237 AID & ABET - ATTEMPT TO POSSESS WITH INTENT TO DISTRIBUTE COCAINE
Count 1s
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 846=ND.F
Offense Level 4
21841(a)(1), 841(b)(1)(B), and 846, and 183237 CONSPIRACY TO DISTRIBUTE AND TO POSSESS WITH INTENT TO DISTRIBUTE COCAINE
Count 2s-8s
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 841A=ND.F
Offense Level 4
21841(a)(1), and 841(b)(1)(B) POSSESSION WITH INTENT TO DISTRIBUTE COCAINE
Count 9s
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 841A=ND.F
Offense Level 4
21841(a)(1), 841(b)(1)(B), and 846 and 182 and 3237 AIDING AND ABETTING ATTEMPT TO POSSESS WITH INTENT TO DISTRIBUTE COCAINE
Def Custody Status Released
Flags 3DIV, CLOSED, FRC
  Entries (64) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: 1/24/2007 Notice of Special Assessment Paid in Full
NOTICE OF SPECIAL ASSESSMENT PAID IN FULL as to Troy Lamar Kipper, $100.00 Special Assessment paid on 3/14/03. (LEG) Modified text on 1/24/2007 (mkf).
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 60 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002 Judgment*Court Filing
    JUDGMENT/STATEMENT OF REASONS as to defendant Troy Lamar Kipper by Judge Richard H. Kyle (dated 10/25/02) (Copies dist'd). 5pg(s) (LEG)
      LREF
      Blank 59 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002 SentencingCourt Filing
      MINUTES: before Judge Richard H. Kyle SENTENCING Troy Lamar Kipper (1) to count 9s. Custody of BOP for 87 months; 4 years supervised release; $100.00 spec assmt; remaining counts dismissed. Deft's objections criminal history - DENIED. Court Reporter: Robert Riley. 1pg (LEG)
        LREF
        Blank 58 Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: 10/21/2002 Notice of Hearing.
        NOTICE OF SENTENCING set for 10:30 a.m. on 10/25/02 for Troy Lamar Kipper before RHK. (1 page) cc: counsel, PO (PJS)
          LREF
          Blank 57 Filed: 6/20/2002, Entered: 6/20/2002 Plea Agreement
          PLEA AGREEMENT AND SENTENCING STIPULATIONS as to Troy Larmar Kipper. 5 pgs (
            LREF
            Blank 56 Filed: 6/20/2002, Entered: 6/20/2002 Plea EnteredCourt Filing
            MINUTES: before Judge Richard H. Kyle Troy Larmar Kipper enters guilty plea to count 9 of the superseding indictment; remaining counts to be dismissed at sentencing; PSI ordered. Court Reporter: Robert Riley. 1 pg (
              LREF
              Blank 55 Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: 6/13/2002 Notice of Hearing.
              NOTICE of change of plea set for 8:30 on 6/20/02 for Troy Larmar Kipper before RHK. 1pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (LEG)
                LREF
                Blank 54 Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: 6/6/2002 MinutesCourt Filing
                MINUTES before Judge Richard H. Kyle for HEARING as to Troy Larmar Kipper: Plea cont'd. Court Reporter: Robert Riley. (1 page) (PJS)
                  LREF
                  Blank 53 Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: 5/30/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                  REASSIGNMENT ORDER (Judge Richard H. Kyle signed 5/28/02 & Judge John R. Tunheim signed 5/29/02. Case CR 02-157 has been reassigned to RHK as a related case. (cc: all counsel, USM & PTS). 1 pg (
                    LREF
                    Blank 52 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 Notice of Hearing.
                    NOTICE of pretrial status conference set for 8:30 on 6/6/02; jury trial set for 9:00 on 6/11/02 for Troy Larmar Kipper before RHK. 1 pg (
                      LREF
                      Blank 51 Filed: 4/29/2002, Entered: 4/30/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE and ORDER as to Troy Larmar Kipper by Judge Richard H. Kyle that the ends of justice are served by granting a continuance at least until the month of June, 2002 (cc: all counsel). 2pgs (LEG)
                        LREF
                        Blank 50 Filed: 4/16/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002 Notice of Hearing.
                        NOTICE of pretrial status conference set for 8:30 on 5/25/02 and jury trial set for 9:00 on 5/28/02 for Troy Larmar Kipper before RHK. 1pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (LEG)
                          LREF
                          Blank 49 Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: 4/2/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                          WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL ACT AND ORDER (Judge Richard H. Kyle / 4/2/02) as to Troy Larmar Kipper that the ends of justice are served by granting a continuance of trial at least until the month of June, 2002. (cc: all counsel) 2 pages (PJS)
                            LREF
                            Blank 48 Filed: 4/1/2002, Entered: 4/1/2002 Waiver - Miscellaneous
                            WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL ACT by deft Troy Larmar Kipper. (1 page) (PJS)
                              LREF
                              Blank 47 Filed: 3/29/2002, Entered: 3/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                              ARRAIGNMENT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson (Date Signed: 3/29/02) as to Troy Larmar Kipper. Same as minutes, Doc. #46. 2pg(s) (LEG)
                                LREF
                                Blank 46 Filed: 3/29/2002, Entered: 3/29/2002 ArraignmentCourt Filing
                                MINUTES: before Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson dft Troy Larmar Kipper arraigned on the superseding indictment; not guilty plea entered; Attorney David DeSmidt present on behalf of retained counsel Lawrence Rapoport; disclosure due date 4/5/02; pretrial motions due on 4/12/02; response date 4/19/02; motion hearing set for 1:30 on 4/25/02 before SRN RHK to issue order re: trial date. 1pg (LEG)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 45 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: 3/28/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                  MOTION and ORDER FOR COMPLIANCE WITH CRIMINAL SUBPOENA as to Troy Larmar Kipper by Magistrate Judge E. S. Swearingen (cc: all counsel). 3pgs * filed under seal * (LEG)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 44 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: 3/21/2002 Indictment
                                    SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT Troy Larmar Kipper (1) counts 1s, 2s-8s, 9s. 5pgs (LEG)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 43 Filed: 3/13/2002, Entered: 3/14/2002 Notice of Hearing.
                                      NOTICE OF JURY TRIAL: set for 9:00 a.m. on 4/8/02 for Troy Larmar Kipper before RHK. (1 page) (PJS)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 42 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/5/2002 Notice of Hearing.
                                        NOTICE of pretrial status conference set for 8:30 on 4/4/02 for Troy Larmar Kipper before Kyle. (cc: counsel). 1 pg (
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 41 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: 2/19/2002 MinutesCourt Filing
                                          MINUTES: before Judge Richard H. Kyle CONT'D DELIBERATIONS as to Troy Larmar Kipper. Court declares mistrial. Court Reporter: Robert Riley. 1 pg (
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 38 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: 2/19/2002 Jury Notes
                                            Jury Note & court response as to Troy Larmar Kipper. 3 pgs (
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 40 Filed: 2/15/2002, Entered: 2/19/2002 Jury Notes
                                              JURY QUESTION/NOTE with Jury Instruction #27 attached (which was read to jury) as to Troy Larmar Kipper. (4 pgs) (PJS)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 39 Filed: 2/15/2002, Entered: 2/19/2002 Jury Notes
                                                JURY QUESTION/NOTE from jury as to Troy Larmar Kipper. (2 pages) (PJS)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 37 Filed: 2/15/2002, Entered: 2/19/2002 MinutesCourt Filing
                                                  MINUTES: before Judge Richard H. Kyle CONTINUED DELIBERATIONS as to Troy Larmar Kipper Court Reporter: Robert Riley. 1pg (LEG)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 36 Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: 2/19/2002 MinutesCourt Filing
                                                    MINUTES: before Judge Richard H. Kyle CONTINUED DELIBERATIONS as to Troy Larmar Kipper Court Reporter: Robert Riley. 1pg (LEG)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 35 Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: 2/15/2002 Jury Notes
                                                      Jury Question & Court's response as to Troy Larmar Kipper. 2 pgs (
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 34 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: 2/15/2002 MinutesCourt Filing
                                                        MINUTES: before Judge Richard H. Kyle CLOSING ARGUMENTS BY BOTH PARTIES. Court instructs the jury. Jury begins their deliberations as to Troy Larmar Kipper Court Reporter: Robert Riley. 1pg (LEG)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 33 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002 Exhibit
                                                          EXHIBIT LIST by pltf USA as to deft Troy Larmar Kipper. 6 pgs (
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 32 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002 Jury Instructions
                                                            COURT JURY INSTRUCTIONS as to deft Troy Larmar Kipper. 35 pgs (
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 31 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002 Jury Notes
                                                              Jury Question & Court's Response as to Troy Larmar Kipper. 3 pgs (
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 30 Filed: 2/12/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002 MinutesCourt Filing
                                                                MINUTES: before Judge Richard H. Kyle 2ND DAY OF JURY TRIAL as to Troy Larmar Kipper. Testimony of Craig Johnson, Daniel Zimbro, James Peterson, Juile Ann Tousignart, Dana Nelson, Donald Holtz, Troy Kipper. Court Reporter: Robert Riley. 1 pg (
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 2/11/2002, Entered: 2/12/2002 MinutesCourt Filing
                                                                  MINUTES: before Judge Richard H. Kyle 1ST DAY OF JURY TRIAL as to Troy Larmar Kipper. Opening statements. Testimony of Bruce Giller, Donald Holtz, David Lind, John Cich, Derek Levin, Carnell Kirkland. Court Reporter: Robert Riley. 1 pg (
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: 2/11/2002 Jury List
                                                                    JURY PANEL RECORD as to Troy Larmar Kipper. 3 pgs (
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: 2/11/2002 MinutesCourt Filing
                                                                      MINUTES: before Judge Richard H. Kyle jury impaneled & sworn as to Troy LaMar Kipper. Court Reporter: Robert Riley. 1 pg (
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 2/7/2002, Entered: 2/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER (Judge Richard H. Kyle / date signed 2/7/02) PTS is directed to supervise Derek Michael Levin, as before, during his presence in MN as to Troy Larmar Kipper (cc: all counsel by fax & U.S. Mail & PTS). 1pg (LEG)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 2/5/2002, Entered: 2/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          EXPARTE APPLICATION and ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA ON BEHALF OF DEFT as to Troy Larmar Kipper by Magistrate Judge E. S. Swearingen. (cc: deft, USM) 2 pages *filed under seal* (PJS)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 12/19/2001, Entered: 12/19/2001 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                            NOTICE of jury trial set for 9:00 on 2/11/02 for Troy Larmar Kipper before Kyle. (copies dist'd) 1 pg(s) (
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: 12/14/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER ( Judge Richard H. Kyle / date signed 12/14/01) as to Troy Larmar Kipper that the 1/8/02 trial date is deferred until a date to be determine, but no earlier than 2/1/02; the U.S. is directed to forthwith transfer witness Derek Michael Levin so as to effect his arrival at FCI Lompoc no later than 12/20/01. (cc: all counsel, USM, BOP & faxed to USM, BOP) 1 page (PJS)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 12/7/2001, Entered: 12/11/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                TWO MOTIONS and TWO ORDERS FOR CHANGE OF CUSTODY as to Troy Larmar Kipper by Magistrate Judge E. S. Swearingen Re: Witnesses (copies dist'd). 4 pgs (
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 12/7/2001, Entered: 12/10/2001 MinutesCourt Filing
                                                                                  MINUTES: before Judge Richard H. Kyle for status conference hearing as to Troy Larmar Kipper. Jury selection set for 9:00 on 12/14/01 before RHK. Court Reporter: Robert Riley. 1pg (LEG)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 12/7/2001, Entered: 12/10/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER (Judge Richard H. Kyle / date signed 12/7/01) adopting report & recommendation [18-1]; motion to suppress evidence [8-1] is denied as to Troy Larmar Kipper. (cc: all counsel) 1 pg (
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 12/4/2001, Entered: 12/5/2001 Utility - Miscellaneous
                                                                                      WITNESS & EXHIBIT LIST & EXHIBIT as to deft Troy Larmar Kipper re motion hearing held 11/8/01 before SRN. (1 page + tape recording) (PJS)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: 12/3/2001, Terminated: 12/7/2001 Report and RecommendationCourt Filing
                                                                                        REPORT and RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson date signed: 12/3/01 recommending that deft's motion to suppress evidence be denied [8-1]. RR Ruling deadline set for 1/2/02 for Troy Larmar Kipper. (cc: all counsel) 3 pages (PJS)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: 12/3/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER ( Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson / 12/3/01) as to Troy Kipper denying as moot deft's motions for preservation and retention of notes and tapes [9-1], to disclose Rule 404(b) evidence [10-1], for disclosure of evidence favorable to the deft [11-1], and for discovery and inspection [12-1]. (cc: all counsel) 2 pages (PJS)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 MinutesCourt Filing
                                                                                            MINUTES: before Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson for motion hearing as to Troy Larmar Kipper. Deft's addt'l briefs due 11/13/01. Motions taken under advisement as of 11/13/01. Order and R & R to be issued. Exhibits retained by the Court. Court Reporter: Robert Riley. 1pg (LEG)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 11/7/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001, Terminated: 1/2/2002 Motion to Strike
                                                                                              MOTION to strike suppression motion by USA as to Troy Larmar Kipper. [part of Doc. #14] (PJS)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 11/7/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA to deft's pretrial motions as to deft Troy Kipper. (19 pages) (PJS)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 11/2/2001 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                  BENCH Warrant returned executed as to Troy Larmar Kipper 10/16/01. (1 page) (PJS)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 10/31/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001, Terminated: 12/3/2001 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                    MOTION for discovery and inspection by Troy Larmar Kipper 4pg(s) (LEG)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 10/31/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001, Terminated: 12/3/2001 Motion for Disclosure
                                                                                                      MOTION for disclosure of evidence favorable to the deft by Troy Larmar Kipper. 1pg(s) (LEG)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 10/31/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001, Terminated: 12/3/2001 Motion for Disclosure
                                                                                                        MOTION to disclose Rule 404(b) evidence by Troy Larmar Kipper. 1pg(s) (LEG)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 10/31/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001, Terminated: 12/3/2001 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                          MOTION for preservation and retention of notes and tapes by Troy Larmar Kipper. 1pg(s) (LEG)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 10/31/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001, Terminated: 12/7/2001 Motion to Suppress
                                                                                                            MOTION to suppress evidence by Troy Larmar Kipper. 1 pg(s) (LEG)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              AMENDED ORDER (Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson / date signed 10/17/01) motion hearing rescheduled for 2:00 p.m. on 11/8/01 for Troy Larmar Kipper. (cc: all counsel) 2 pgs (PJS)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 10/16/2001, Entered: 10/17/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ARRAIGNMENT ORDER by Magistrate Judge E. S. Swearingen (Date Signed: 10/16/01) as to Troy Larmar Kipper. Same as minutes, Doc. 5. 2 pg(s) (
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 10/16/2001, Entered: 10/17/2001 ArraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  MINUTES: before Magistrate Judge E. S. Swearingen dft Troy Larmar Kipper arraigned; not guilty plea entered; Attorney present; disclosure due 10/23/01 ; pretrial motions due 10/30/01; motion hearing set for 2:00 on 11/13/01 before SRN; pretrial status conference set for 8:30 on 12/7/01 before RHK; Voir Dire / Jury Instructions due 12/3/01; jury set for 9:30 on 12/10/01 before RHK. Tape: 01 40 26-156. 1 pg (
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 10/16/2001, Entered: 10/17/2001 Utility - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                    APPEARANCE BOND ($25,000 RPR executed on 10/16/01) by Troy Larmar Kipper. 1pg (
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 10/16/2001, Entered: 10/17/2001 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS OF RELEASE by Magistrate Judge E. S. Swearingen for Troy Larmar Kipper in the amount of $25,000 RPR. 4 pg(s) (
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 10/16/2001, Entered: 10/17/2001 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        MINUTES: before Magistrate Judge E. S. Swearingen first appearance of Troy Larmar Kipper; $25,000 RPR bond set. Atty Lawrence Rapoport present as retained counsel. Tape: 01 40 26-156. 1 pg (
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/16/2001, Entered: 10/17/2001 Order
                                                                                                                          Per AUSA, case is unsealed (
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 9/11/2001, Entered: 9/13/2001 IndictmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            INDICTMENT assigned to Judge Richard H. Kyle, referred to Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson by USA Joseph Thomas Walbran. Counts filed against Troy Larmar Kipper (1) counts 1 & 2. Warrant issued for Troy Larmar Kipper 2 pgs (
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/11/2001, Entered: 9/13/2001 Order
                                                                                                                              ORAL ORDER (Magistrate Judge Jonathan G. Lebedoff /) sealing case (
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/11/2001, Entered: 9/13/2001 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                BENCH WARRANT issued for Troy Larmar Kipper by Magistrate Judge Jonathan G. Lebedoff (
                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 1,240 times.

                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?