Capcom Entertainment, Inc. v. J. Phu
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 2011-1-CV-193659

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 22, 2018 at 6:05 AM EST (3.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Phu, Jimmy, Defendant
Case Type Intellectual Property Unlimited (19)
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 4 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None Request Dismissal
CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/Prej; Decision = M; Closed = 04/22/2011
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 3 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
    CV Summons Filed; Decision = M; Closed = 02/04/2011
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 2 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
      CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 02/04/2011
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 1 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
        CV Case Cover Sheet; Decision = M; Closed = 02/04/2011
          Request RequestSpace

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 4 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?