Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company v. Commercial Seating Specialists, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 2011-1-CV-197707

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 22, 2018 at 7:12 AM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Cole Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Nelson Cole +1 916 376 0486 +1 916 376 0478 scole@colenetlaw.com
v.
No Logo Commercial Seating Specialists, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropers Majeski Kohn & Bentley, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James C Hyde +1 408 287 6262 +1 408 918 4501 jhyde@rmkb.com
Case Type Other Contract Unlimited (37)
Case Status Consolidated
Case Location Civil
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 10 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None Substitution-Attorney
Old Attorney: Stephen J Schori ; New Attorney: James Charles Hyde; Legacy Name = CV Substitution of Attorney; Decision = M; Closed = 08/18/2011
    Blank 9 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
    atty Cole; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 08/08/2011
      Blank 8 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
      CV Memo:Ps & As/Suppt of Demurrer; Decision = M; Closed = 05/16/2011
        Blank 7 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None Demurrer
        To compl.; Legacy Name = CV Demurrer, no fees; Decision = M; Closed = 05/16/2011
          Blank 6 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None Proof of Service
          CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 05/16/2011
            Blank 5 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None Demurrer
            Ntc of hrng on demrr to compl (Atty Schori) 09/15/11 9AM D-8.; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Demurrer, Unltd; Decision = M; Closed = 05/16/2011
              Blank 4 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
              re (Atty S. Cole); Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 05/10/2011
                Blank 3 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                CV Summons Filed; Decision = M; Closed = 03/30/2011
                  Blank 2 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                  CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 03/30/2011
                    Blank 1 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                    CV Case Cover Sheet; Decision = M; Closed = 03/30/2011

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 0 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?