S. Spanek v. R. Reagan, et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 2011-1-CV-197842

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 22, 2018 at 7:15 AM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Spanek, Shirley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Miller, Ernest L.
v.
Coldwell Banker Corporation Coldwell Banker Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Coldwell Banker"
Coldwell Banker Residential Brokerage, Inc. Coldwell Banker Residential Brokerage, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Coldwell Banker Residential Brokerage"
No Logo Myers, Pete Mark, Defendant/Cross Def/Cross Compl
No Logo Reagan, Anne M, Defendant/Cross Def/Cross Compl
No Logo Reagan, Rick L., Defendant/Cross Def/Cross Compl
No Logo Valley Of California, Inc., Defendant/Cross Def/Cross Compl
State Compensation Insurance Fund State Compensation Insurance Fund, Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston, Catherine Bordin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alston, Catherine Bordin +1 408 882 2023
Case Type Other PI/PD/WD Unlimited (23)
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (83) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 83 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None Notice: Dismissal of Action
CV-Ntc:Dismissal of Action; Decision = M; Closed = 05/22/2014
    Blank 82 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
    This case is dismissed without prejudice due to no appearance by all parties at 5-8-14 hearing - signed by Judge Overton; Legacy Name = CV Order; Decision = M; Closed = 05/22/2014
      Blank 81 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS
      CV Ntc:Entry of Dismissal w/POS; Decision = M; Closed = 03/07/2014
        Blank 80 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None Request Dismissal
        Cross-Complt filed by Pete Myers and Valley of California on 5-18-11 by Def's atty Breen; Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial; Decision = M; Closed = 03/07/2014
          Blank 79 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None Request Dismissal
          by atty for Defs Miller; Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial; Decision = M; Closed = 03/07/2014
            Blank 78 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None Request Dismissal
            Cross-Complaint Filed by Rick L. Reagan & Anne M. Reagan on 3-3-11 dism w/prejudice by Def's atty Hart; Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial; Decision = M; Closed = 03/07/2014
              Blank 77 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None Notice-Settlement
              Atty Ernie Miller; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Settlement; Decision = M; Closed = 01/09/2014
                Blank 76 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None Statement: Settlement Conference
                Atty Catherine E. Alston; Legacy Name = CV Statement:Settlement Conf; Decision = M; Closed = 01/13/2014
                  Blank 75 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None Statement: Settlement Conference
                  CV Statement:Settlement Conf; Decision = M; Closed = 01/08/2014
                    Blank 74 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                    To preclude plt from calling any expert witnesses.; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 01/07/2014
                      Blank 73 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None Statement: Settlement Conference
                      1-8-13 1:30 D5 (Paul Breen); Legacy Name = CV Statement:Settlement Conf; Decision = M; Closed = 01/02/2014
                        Blank 72 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None Notice: Lien Claimant
                        4th amended ntc of lien $78,511.91 against plt; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Lien Claimant; Decision = M; Closed = 10/02/2013
                          Blank 71 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None Order: Ex ParteCourt Filing
                          Granting Def's Ex Parte Application and Vacating Trial Date and Setting Hearing for TSC on 9-10-13 @11am d-5 *signed by Judge Arand*; Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Order; Decision = M; Closed = 08/02/2013
                            Blank 70 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                            CV Ntc:Entry of Order; Decision = M; Closed = 08/01/2013
                              Blank 69 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None Application: Ex Parte (Fee Applies)
                              for an Order to Continue Trial Date by Def Pete M. Myers and Valley of California (Jennifer M. Protas); Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Appl; Decision = M; Closed = 08/01/2013
                                Blank 68 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None Notice: Lien Claimant
                                3rd amended; $76,173.05; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Lien Claimant; Decision = M; Closed = 06/10/2013
                                  Blank 67 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None Order After Hearing - POSCourt Filing
                                  order re: motion to compel responses by Plt; GRANTED by Judge Manoukian (see file for details).; ; Legacy Name = CV Ord After Hearing; Decision = G; Closed = 06/07/2013
                                    Blank 66 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None Statement: Settlement Conference
                                    Atty Catherine E. Alston - 6-12-13 9:00 D5; Legacy Name = CV Statement:Settlement Conf; Decision = M; Closed = 06/04/2013
                                      Blank 65 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                                      CV Ntc:Entry of Order; Decision = M; Closed = 06/03/2013
                                        Blank 64 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None Order: Ex ParteCourt Filing
                                        cont'g trial date: The trial date shall be cont'd untl from 6-17-13 to 10-07-13, 8:45am; the msc from 6-12-13 to 10-02-13, 9am, dept. 5, granted by Judge Overton; ; Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Order; Decision = G; Closed = 05/31/2013
                                          Blank 63 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None Ex-Parte Application
                                          trial date, Paul W. Breen; Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Mtn to Continue; Decision = M; Closed = 05/31/2013
                                            Blank 62 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                            CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 05/29/2013
                                              Blank 61 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                              CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 05/24/2013
                                                Blank 60 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                                                CV Ntc:Entry of Order; Decision = M; Closed = 05/24/2013
                                                  Blank 59 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                                                  CV Ntc:Entry of Order; Decision = M; Closed = 05/24/2013
                                                    Blank 58 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                    The mtn to compel the deposition of Arthur Ting is GRANTED. Arthur Ting shall pay sanctions to defs in the amount of $750. Signed by Judge Manoukian; Legacy Name = CV Order; Decision = G; Closed = 05/24/2013
                                                      Blank 57 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                      of David Y. Yoshida; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 05/23/2013
                                                        Blank 56 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                        CV Memo:Ps & As/Suppt of Mtn; Decision = M; Closed = 05/23/2013
                                                          Blank 55 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day
                                                          CV Court Reporter Per Diem Fees; Decision = M; Closed = 05/23/2013
                                                            Blank 54 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                            CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 05/23/2013
                                                              Blank 53 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None Motion-Compel
                                                              responses to supplemental written discovery. 5-31-13, 9am, D19. atty David Yoshida; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Mtn to Compel; Decision = M; Closed = 05/23/2013
                                                                Blank 52 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None Order: Ex ParteCourt Filing
                                                                Granting Def Pete M. Myers and Valley California's Ex Parte Application for OST on Motion to Compel Responses to Supplemental Written Discovery on 5/31/13 @9am d19 by Judge Maoukian; Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Order; Decision = M; Closed = 05/23/2013
                                                                  Blank 51 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None Application: Ex Parte (Fee Applies)
                                                                  for ost; memo in sup; decl of David Y. Yoshida; Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Appl; Decision = M; Closed = 05/23/2013
                                                                    Blank 50 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                                                                    CV Ntc:Entry of Order; Decision = M; Closed = 05/09/2013
                                                                      Blank 49 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
                                                                      re: supplemental declaration; Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc/Regular Mail; Decision = M; Closed = 05/09/2013
                                                                        Blank 48 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                                                                        CV Ntc:Entry of Order; Decision = M; Closed = 05/09/2013
                                                                          Blank 47 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                          of Allison Ara; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 05/08/2013
                                                                            Blank 46 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                            CV Memo:Ps & As/Suppt of Mtn; Decision = M; Closed = 05/08/2013
                                                                              Blank 45 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
                                                                              $30 Court Reporter fee not paid; Legacy Name = CV Clerk Rejection Ltr; Decision = M; Closed = 05/08/2013
                                                                                Blank 44 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 05/08/2013
                                                                                  Blank 43 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Motion-Compel
                                                                                  the deposition of Arthur Ting, M.D. & monetary sanctions; A. Ara; 5/24/13, 9a, D19; $30 Court Reporter fee not paid; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Mtn to Compel; Decision = M; Closed = 05/08/2013
                                                                                    Blank 42 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Declaration: Supplemental
                                                                                    of Allison R. Ara in support of Def's Ex Parte Application for OSC on Motion to Compel Deposition of Arthur Ting, M.D. and Sanctions; Legacy Name = CV Supplemental Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 05/08/2013
                                                                                      Blank 41 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Order: Ex ParteCourt Filing
                                                                                      Granting Def's Ex Parte Application for an OST on Motion to Compel Deposition for 5-24-13 @9am in D-19 *signed by Judge Monahan*; Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Order; Decision = M; Closed = 05/08/2013
                                                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                        CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 05/08/2013
                                                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Application: Ex Parte (Fee Applies)
                                                                                          for an order shortening Time re: hearing on a motion to compel the deposition of Arthur Ting, M.D. and for Monetary Sanctions (Atty Ara); Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Appl; Decision = M; Closed = 05/08/2013
                                                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None Order: Ex ParteCourt Filing
                                                                                            Ex Parte App for OST on Mtn to Compel Deposition is DENIED without prejudice. (Judge Monahan); Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Order; Decision = D; Closed = 05/07/2013
                                                                                              Blank 37 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None Proof of Service: Fax
                                                                                              CV Proof of Svc/Fax; Decision = M; Closed = 05/07/2013
                                                                                                Blank 36 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None Application: Ex Parte (Fee Applies)
                                                                                                for OST on Mtn to Compel Deposition (Allison R. Ara); Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Appl; Decision = M; Closed = 05/07/2013
                                                                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Jury Fee Deposit
                                                                                                  $150 jury fee deposited by defs; Legacy Name = CV Jury Fee Deposit; Decision = M; Closed = 12/21/2012
                                                                                                    Blank 34 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Jury Fee Deposit
                                                                                                    $150 paid; Legacy Name = CV Jury Fee Deposit; Decision = M; Closed = 12/21/2012
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                      P. W. Breen; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 11/28/2012
                                                                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                        Atty Breen; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 07/03/2012
                                                                                                          Blank 31 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None Notice: Lien Claimant
                                                                                                          2nd AMENDED ntc of lien; Lien amt: $65912.45; atty Alston; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Lien Claimant; Decision = M; Closed = 05/17/2012
                                                                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None Notice of Hearing (no fee)
                                                                                                            ARB-Ntc of Mediation Status Conf; Decision = M; Closed = 04/18/2012
                                                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                              Atty: Stephanie M. Dopp; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 04/12/2012
                                                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                atty Ernest Miller; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 04/11/2012
                                                                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                  Atty: Paul W. Breen; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 04/05/2012
                                                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None Substitution-Attorney
                                                                                                                    old: pro per new: Atty. Ernest Miller; Legacy Name = CV Substitution of Attorney; Decision = M; Closed = 04/02/2012
                                                                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: None Dismissal
                                                                                                                      Atty Dopp; Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial W/O Prej; Decision = M; Closed = 03/28/2012
                                                                                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None Substitution-Attorney
                                                                                                                        old: Aceves new: Hart; Legacy Name = CV Substitution of Attorney; Decision = M; Closed = 03/26/2012
                                                                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None Substitution-Attorney
                                                                                                                          old: Aceves new: Hart; Legacy Name = CV Substitution of Attorney; Decision = M; Closed = 03/26/2012
                                                                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None Notice: Association/Co-Counsel
                                                                                                                            Atty Sylvia S. Aceves associates w/Santana & Hart.; Legacy Name = CV Association of Attys; Decision = M; Closed = 03/06/2012
                                                                                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None Substitution-Attorney
                                                                                                                              pltf in pro per; Legacy Name = CV Substitution of Attorney; Decision = M; Closed = 02/27/2012
                                                                                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: None Notice: Change Address/Firm Name
                                                                                                                                CV Change of Atty address/Firm; Decision = M; Closed = 01/18/2012
                                                                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None Document: Other
                                                                                                                                  points and authorities in supoprt of plt's opposition to OSC 1-19-12 10:02am dept.2 Mark Millen; Legacy Name = CV Other
                                                                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 10/5/2011, Entered: None MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                    of P's and A's in support of Opposition to OSC; Legacy Name = CV Memorandum; Decision = M; Closed = 10/05/2011
                                                                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 10/5/2011, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                      in opposition to Courts OSC; 10-13-11; 10:02am; dept: 2; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 10/06/2011
                                                                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                        atty Millen; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 08/17/2011
                                                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                          (Atty Breen); Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 08/10/2011
                                                                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                            Atty Aceves; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 08/08/2011
                                                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Notice: Lien Claimant
                                                                                                                                              re: 1st amdd ntc of Lien agst plt for worker's compl benefits plus interest: to date: $57,871.69 (Atty C. Alston for State Comp. Ins. Fund); Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Lien Claimant; Decision = M; Closed = 07/20/2011
                                                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None Answer/Response (No Fee)
                                                                                                                                                atty aceves; Legacy Name = CV Answer - NO FEES DUE!; Decision = M; Closed = 06/15/2011
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: None Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                  CV Cross-Complaint; Decision = M; Closed = 05/18/2011
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                                                                                                                                    CV Summons Filed; Decision = M; Closed = 05/18/2011
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: None Answer/Response (No Fee)
                                                                                                                                                      Atty. Breen; Legacy Name = CV Answer - NO FEES DUE!; Decision = M; Closed = 05/18/2011
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 5/5/2011, Entered: None General Denial: Unlimited
                                                                                                                                                        (Atty Breen); Legacy Name = CV General Denial, Unltd; Decision = M; Closed = 05/05/2011
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                                                                                                                                          xcomplt; Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed; Decision = M; Closed = 05/03/2011
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None General Denial: Unlimited
                                                                                                                                                            Atty Aceves; Legacy Name = CV General Denial, Unltd; Decision = M; Closed = 05/03/2011
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                              Atty Aceves; Legacy Name = CV Cross-Complaint; Decision = M; Closed = 05/03/2011
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: None Notice: Lien Claimant
                                                                                                                                                                re: Ntc of Lien agst Plt Shirley Spanek: $54,771.70 (Atty C. Alston); Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Lien Claimant; Decision = M; Closed = 04/20/2011
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                                                                                                                                                  CV Summons Filed; Decision = M; Closed = 04/01/2011
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                                                                                                                    CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 04/01/2011
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                      CV Case Cover Sheet; Decision = M; Closed = 04/01/2011

                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?