R. Pita v. Kondaur Capital Corporation, et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 2011-1-CV-200520

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 22, 2018 at 8:01 AM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pita, Ricardo, Plaintiff
v.
Bank of America, NA Bank of America, NA, Defendant
Unknown Role, Oneida Ltd.
Unknown Role, NATIONSBANK CORP
Unknown Role, Nb Holdings Corp
Coldwell Banker Corporation Coldwell Banker Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Coldwell Banker"
No Logo Kondaur Capital Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Kondaur REO LLC, Defendant
No Logo Mortgage Electronic Registration Services, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Old Republic Title, Defendant
No Logo Recontrust Company, Defendant
No Logo Rouletter, Mark, Defendant
No Logo Valdes, Ivonne, Defendant
No Logo Wmc Mortgage Corporation, Defendant
Case Type Other Petition (Not Spec) Unlimited (43)
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 29 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None Order: Court Fee Waiver After HearingCourt Filing
Denied by Judge McKenney; Legacy Name = Order After Hrg Court Fees; Decision = D; Closed = 06/20/2011
    Blank 28 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS
    CV Ntc:Entry of Dismissal w/POS; Decision = M; Closed = 06/09/2011
      Blank 27 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None Request Dismissal
      *Dismissal as to entire action per atty Christopher Epsha, 7/28/11.* (Christopher P. Epsha); Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/o Prej; Decision = M; Closed = 06/10/2011
        Blank 26 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None Order: Submitted MatterCourt Filing
        Order Granting Application to Expunge Lis Pendens heard 5-24-11 by Judge McKenney; Legacy Name = Order on Submitted Matter; Decision = G; Closed = 06/20/2011
          Blank 25 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None Declaration: Supplemental
          supplemental decl of Ronald M. Arlas, Esq. ins upport of def Kondaur's mtn to expunge Lis Pendens; Legacy Name = CV Supplemental Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 06/06/2011
            Blank 24 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None Declaration
            of Tad Prizant in support of opposition to mtn to expunge lis pendens; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 06/02/2011
              Blank 23 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
              to expunge lis pendes. 6-6-11 9am dept.20 Christopher P Epsha; Legacy Name = CV Memo:Ps & As/Opposn to Mtn; Decision = M; Closed = 06/02/2011
                Blank 22 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None Complaint - Amended
                Christopher P Epsha; *dismissed w/out prejudice on 6/9/11*; Legacy Name = CV 1st Amended Complaint; Decision = M; Closed = 06/02/2011
                  Blank 21 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: None Proof of Service
                  CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 05/24/2011
                    Blank 20 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: None Substitution-Attorney
                    old: pro per: new: Atty. Christopher Epsha; Legacy Name = CV Substitution of Attorney; Decision = M; Closed = 05/24/2011
                      Blank 19 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None Declaration: Non-Service
                      CV Decl:Non-Service; Decision = M; Closed = 05/23/2011
                        Blank 18 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003)Court Filing
                        set for fee waiver hearing 6-13-11 9:00 D20 by Judge McKenney; Legacy Name = Order on Court Fee Waiver; Decision = N; Closed = 05/20/2011
                          Blank 17 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
                          Re: notice of change of address.; Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc/Regular Mail; Decision = M; Closed = 05/19/2011
                            Blank 16 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None Change of Address Pro Per
                            CV Change of Address, Pro Per; Decision = M; Closed = 05/19/2011
                              Blank 15 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: None Order: Ex ParteCourt Filing
                              shortening time to hear mtn to expunge lis pendens is set on 5-24-11, 9am, dept. 20, granted by Judge McKenney; Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Order; Decision = G; Closed = 05/17/2011
                                Blank 14 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: None Request-Judicial Notice
                                CV Req:Judicial Ntc; Decision = M; Closed = 05/17/2011
                                  Blank 13 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: None Declaration
                                  of Gretchen Grant; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 05/17/2011
                                    Blank 12 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: None Declaration
                                    of Ronald M. Arlas; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 05/17/2011
                                      Blank 11 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: None Declaration
                                      oof Randy Hawkins; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 05/17/2011
                                        Blank 10 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: None Application: Ex Parte (No Fees)
                                        Application for order expunging lis ppendens, or in the alternative, for an OST to hear motion to expunge lis pendens, (Atty Arlas); Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte No Fee; Decision = M; Closed = 05/17/2011
                                          Blank 9 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                          Paid Ex Parte Application; Legacy Name = CV First Paper Def - Unltd; Decision = M; Closed = 05/17/2011
                                            Blank 8 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
                                            RE CMC IN PRO PER; Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc/Regular Mail; Decision = M; Closed = 05/11/2011
                                              Blank 7 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None Order: Ex ParteCourt Filing
                                              Denied by Judge McKenney; Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Order; Decision = M; Closed = 05/11/2011
                                                Blank 6 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                Pro Per; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 05/11/2011
                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None Notice
                                                  ntc of pendency of action by Ricardo Pita; Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 05/11/2011
                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None Application: Ex Parte (Fee Applies)
                                                    for temporary restraining order by Ricardo Pita; Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Appl; Decision = M; Closed = 05/11/2011
                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
                                                      Missing civil cover sheet; Legacy Name = CV Clerk Rejection Ltr; Decision = M; Closed = 05/10/2011
                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001)
                                                        Req to Waive Court Fees; Decision = M; Closed = 05/10/2011
                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                          Pro Per; Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/No Summs Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 05/10/2011

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?