American Family Mutual Insurance v. J. Herrala
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 2011-1-CV-202159

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 22, 2018 at 8:28 AM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo American Family Mutual Insurance, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Cole Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Nelson Cole +1 916 376 0486 +1 916 376 0478 scole@colenetlaw.com
v.
No Logo Herrala, Jon, Defendant
Case Type Auto Unlimited (22)
Case Status Active
Case Location Civil
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None Judgment Satisfaction
CV Acknow/Satisf of Jgmt Full; Decision = M; Closed = 05/24/2013
    Blank 5 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None Abstract of Judgment issued
    CV Abstract of Judgment Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 06/16/2011
      Blank 4 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None Miscellaneous: Converted Document
      American Family Mutual Insurance vs J. Herrala
        Blank 3 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None judgment
        total $94,209.89; Legacy Name = CV Judgment; Decision = M; Closed = 06/02/2011
          Blank 2 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None Application: Entry Sister State Judgment Unlimited
          CV Appl:Entry Sister State Jgmt, Unltd; Decision = M; Closed = 06/02/2011
            Blank 1 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
            CV Case Cover Sheet; Decision = M; Closed = 06/02/2011

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 0 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?