Vogland v. Qwest Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:01-cv-00509-RHK-JMM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ronald Vogland, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ckzlawfirm.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark C Hart +1 763 398 0441 +1 763 398 0062 mhart@ckzlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McSweeney & Fay, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rhett A. McSweeney +1 612 333 6900 +1 612 333 0355 ram@mcfay.com
v.
Qwest Corporation Qwest Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles D. Henson +1 303 297 2400 +2977 297 297 7799

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeanette M Bazis +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 jbazis@greeneespel.com
Office DMN
Filed 3/22/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Hennepin
Terminated 7/18/2001
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, FRC
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/23/2001 Order
JUDGMENT entered 1pg (DFL)
    LREF
    Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM, OPINION, AND ORDER: ( Judge Richard H. Kyle / 7/18/01) granting defendant's motion to dismiss [4-1] and plaintiff's amended complaint is dismissed with prejudice termination notice 7pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
      LREF
      Blank 15 Filed: 6/14/2001, Entered: 7/6/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
      MINUTES:( Judge Richard H. Kyle / R. Riley) taking under advisement Deft's motion to dismiss. [4-1] 1 pg(s) (VEM)
        LREF
        Blank 14 Filed: 6/6/2001, Entered: 6/8/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
        REPLY memorandum by defendant to motion to dismiss pltf's amended complaint [4-1] 11pg(s) (JMR)
          LREF
          Blank 12 Filed: 5/30/2001, Entered: 6/1/2001 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
          MEMORANDUM by plaintiff in opposition to motion to dismiss [4-1] 12pg(s) (SJH)
            LREF
            Blank 11 Filed: 5/9/2001, Entered: 5/11/2001 Affidavit
            AFFIDAVIT of Jeanette M. Bazis regarding motion to dismiss [4-1] 2+pg(s) (DFL)
              LREF
              Blank 10 Filed: 5/9/2001, Entered: 5/11/2001 Memorandum in Support of Motion
              MEMORANDUM by defendant in support of motion to dismiss [4-1] 14pg(s) (DFL)
                LREF
                Blank 9 Filed: 4/26/2001, Entered: 4/30/2001 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                NOTICE by defendant setting hearing for motion to dismiss ( to Judge Richard H. Kyle ) [4-1] at 8:00 a.m. on 6/14/01 3pg(s) (DFL)
                  LREF
                  Blank 8 Filed: 4/20/2001, Entered: 4/23/2001 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                  MEMORANDUM by plaintiff in opposition to motion to dismiss [4-1] 7pg(s) (DFL)
                    LREF
                    Blank 7 Filed: 4/19/2001, Entered: 4/20/2001 Amended Complaint
                    AMENDED COMPLAINT [1-1] by plaintiff 5pg(s) (DFL)
                      LREF
                      Blank 6 Filed: 4/10/2001, Entered: 4/11/2001 Affidavit
                      AFFIDAVIT of Jeanette M. Bazis regarding motion to dismiss [4-1] 2+pg(s) separate (DFL)
                        LREF
                        Blank 5 Filed: 4/10/2001, Entered: 4/11/2001 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                        MEMORANDUM by defendant in support of motion to dismiss [4-1] 19pg(s) (DFL)
                          LREF
                          Blank 4 Filed: 3/30/2001, Entered: 4/11/2001, Terminated: 7/18/2001 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                          MOTION by defendant to dismiss ( to Judge Richard H. Kyle ) , ret. 5/4/01 at 8:00 a.m. 4pg(s) (DFL)
                            LREF
                            Blank 3 Filed: 3/30/2001, Entered: 4/2/2001 MOTION - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                            LETTER RE: SVC OF DISPOSITIVE MOTION PAPERS by defendant to dismiss SVC LTR ( to Judge Richard H. Kyle ) 1pg(s) (DFL)
                              LREF
                              Blank 13 Filed: 3/23/2001, Entered: 6/5/2001 Order
                              PETITION AND ORDER for admission pro hac vice ( Clerk Francis E. Dosal ) on behalf of defendant by Charles Henson 1pg(s) (DFL)
                                LREF
                                Blank 2 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001 Affidavit
                                AFFIDAVIT of Jeanette M. Bazis regarding removal [1-1] 1+pg(s) separate (DFL)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 1 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001 Notice of RemovalCourt Filing
                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court, with copies of summons and complaint; Assigned to Judge Richard H. Kyle per master list and referred to Magistrate Judge John M. Mason, rcpt. no. 239319 13pg(s) (DFL)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 284 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?