Sandisk Corporation v. PNY Technologies, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 2011-1-CV-205928

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 22, 2018 at 9:34 AM ST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

SanDisk Corporation SanDisk Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ekwan E Rhow +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 erhow@birdmarella.com
v.
No Logo Pny Technologies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo LLP, Miller, Kaplan, Arase & Co., Subpoenaed Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Loeb & Loeb LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert A Meyer +1 310 282 2000 rmeyer@loeb.com
Case Type Breach of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06)
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (755) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 755 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Remittitur
Respondent to recover costs - The appellant having failed to file a brief after notice given under rule 8.220(a), California rules of Court, the appeal is dismissed.
    Blank 754 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Appeal: Notice of Abandonment
    (H045738)
      Blank 753 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Judgment Satisfaction
      Full Satisfaction
        Blank 752 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Abandonment: Appeal
        Abandonment of Appeal Filed
          Blank 751 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None Appeal Receipt for Record
          from DCA
            Blank 750 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Appeal: Notice of Completion
              Blank 749 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Appeal Receipt for Record
                Blank 748 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Appeal: Notice to Court Reporter
                  Blank 747 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Waiver from Reporter
                  from G. Perez # 12267
                    Blank 746 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None DESIGNATION
                    8.124 and 8.130
                      Blank 745 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Appeal: Clerk's Notice of Appeal
                        Blank 744 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Appeal: Clerk's Notice of Appeal
                          Blank 743 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appeal - Court of Appeal
                            Blank 742 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appeal - Court of Appeal
                              Blank 741 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Notice
                              of Entry of Judgment
                                Blank 740 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                PNY is ordered to pay $2million outstanding under the stip jgmt, plus interest ORDERED by Judge McGowen *See order for Details*
                                  Blank 739 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                  to sandisk order to enforce settlement (atty: Aronoff)
                                    Blank 738 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Declaration
                                    of Scott J Fishwick in support of response
                                      Blank 737 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                      Objections to PNY Tech, Inc's Counter-Proposed Order re Mtn to Enforce Settlement Agreement (Fanxi Wang)
                                        Blank 736 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Order
                                        Granting appl for admission Pro Hac Vice
                                          Blank 735 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                          in sup of mtn to enforce settlement agreement (Ekwan E. Rhow) hrg 11/16/17 9am D-75
                                            Blank 734 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: None Declaration
                                            of David L. Aronoff
                                              Blank 733 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: None Application-Pro Hac Vice
                                              Notice of Hearing and Verified Application of Thomas Patrick Lane for Admission Pro Hac Vice as Counsel for PNY Technologies, Inc.; 12/07/17; 10 am; D75; Atty Aronoff
                                                Blank 732 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                to mtn to enforce
                                                  Blank 731 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition
                                                  to plt's mtn to enforce settlement agreement (David L. Aronoff) hrg 11/16/17 10am D-75
                                                    Blank 730 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                    to plt's mtn to enforce settlement agreement (David L. Aronoff) hrg 11/16/17 10am D-75
                                                      Blank 729 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                      Continuing mtn to enforce settlement to 11-16-17 @ 10:00 am
                                                        Blank 728 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                        Stipulation and Order Adjourning the Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement From July 13, 2017 to September 21, 2017 at 10:00 AM; The hearing on SanDisk's Motion is scheduled for September 21, 2017 at 10:00 am.; Signed by Judge McGowen
                                                          Blank 727 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Notice: Appearance
                                                          of Scott Fishwick
                                                            Blank 726 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Notice: Appearance
                                                            of David Aronoff
                                                              Blank 725 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
                                                              Notice of Appearance is missing original signature or "by fax"
                                                                Blank 724 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Court Reporter Fee < 1 hour
                                                                atty: Rhow, 07/13/17 @ 10am, dept. 75
                                                                  Blank 723 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                  Fanxi Wang
                                                                    Blank 722 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Motion (Other)
                                                                    atty: Rhow, 07/13/17 @ 10am, dept. 75
                                                                      Blank 721 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Acknowledgement
                                                                      re Acknowledgment of Satisfaction (Atty J. Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Acknowledgement; Decision = M; Closed = 10/06/2014
                                                                        Blank 720 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None Judgment: Notice of Entry (Civil)
                                                                        CV Ntc:Entry of Jgmt w/Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 09/26/2014
                                                                          Blank 719 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
                                                                          RE: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction - missing original signature; Legacy Name = CV Clerk Rejection Ltr; Decision = M; Closed = 09/25/2014
                                                                            Blank 718 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                            It is hereby Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that this Stipulated Judgment is entered pursuant to the terms of the Settlement Agreement as Exhibit A to the Joint Stipulation; *signed by Judge McGowen* (see order for details); Legacy Name = CV Judgment; Decision = M; Closed = 09/19/2014
                                                                              Blank 717 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                              for Entry of Judgment by Plt (Allen Ruby); Legacy Name = CV Stip & Order/$20 fee; Decision = M; Closed = 09/19/2014
                                                                                Blank 716 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None Abandonment: Appeal
                                                                                of appeal by atty allen ruby on 8/28/14 on appeal #H041277.; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Abandonment; Decision = M; Closed = 09/03/2014
                                                                                  Blank 715 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None Abandonment: Appeal
                                                                                  of appeal filed 7/17/14 #H041277.; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Abandonment; Decision = M; Closed = 08/28/2014
                                                                                    Blank 714 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None Abandonment: Appeal
                                                                                    Atty Ruby; Legacy Name = CV Abandonment of Appeal; Decision = M; Closed = 08/28/2014
                                                                                      Blank 713 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None Abandonment: Appeal
                                                                                      Atty Asimow; Legacy Name = CV Abandonment of Appeal; Decision = M; Closed = 08/27/2014
                                                                                        Blank 712 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                        CV Exhibits List; Decision = M; Closed = 08/27/2014
                                                                                          Blank 711 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                          CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 08/15/2014
                                                                                            Blank 710 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                            CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 08/15/2014
                                                                                              Blank 709 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Deposit: Reporter's Transcript
                                                                                              $5575.00; Legacy Name = CV Deposit/Reporter's Transcript; Decision = M; Closed = 08/06/2014
                                                                                                Blank 708 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 08/06/2014
                                                                                                  Blank 707 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None DESIGNATION
                                                                                                  REPORTERS; Legacy Name = CV Designation of Transcript on Appeal; Decision = M; Closed = 08/06/2014
                                                                                                    Blank 706 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                    CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 08/05/2014
                                                                                                      Blank 705 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Notice: Appeal (Unlimited)
                                                                                                      & cross appeal; Legacy Name = CV Ntc of Appeal/Unltd; Decision = M; Closed = 08/05/2014
                                                                                                        Blank 704 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                        Of William Casey in support of Plt's OEX for 8-26-14.; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 07/31/2014
                                                                                                          Blank 703 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day
                                                                                                          CV Court Reporter Fee < 1 Hour; Decision = M; Closed = 07/31/2014
                                                                                                            Blank 702 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None Application: Order of Examination
                                                                                                            OEX: 8-26-14, 9:00 am, d.7 (Allen Ruby); Legacy Name = CV Appl/Ord:Appear/Exam of Debtor; Decision = M; Closed = 07/31/2014
                                                                                                              Blank 701 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Abstract of Judgment issued
                                                                                                              CV Abstract of Judgment Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 07/29/2014
                                                                                                                Blank 700 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None Deposit: Clerk's Transcript
                                                                                                                taken on ntc of appeal; Legacy Name = CV Deposit for Clerk's Transcripts; Decision = M; Closed = 07/17/2014
                                                                                                                  Blank 699 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                                  CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 07/17/2014
                                                                                                                    Blank 698 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None Notice: Appeal (Unlimited)
                                                                                                                    Atty: Asimow; $775.00 check attached for Court of Appeals.; Legacy Name = CV Ntc of Appeal/Unltd; Decision = M; Closed = 07/17/2014
                                                                                                                      Blank 697 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                      granted mtn to correct jgmt to $32,805,075. judge mcgowen; Legacy Name = CV Order; Decision = G; Closed = 06/12/2014
                                                                                                                        Blank 696 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                                                                                                                        CV Proof of Svc by Email; Decision = M; Closed = 06/11/2014
                                                                                                                          Blank 695 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                          To PNY's Mtn to Correct Judgment on 6-12-14, d.7 (Atty Ian Chen); Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 06/11/2014
                                                                                                                            Blank 694 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                            of Robert Hallman; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 06/09/2014
                                                                                                                              Blank 693 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                              of Christian Tregillis; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 06/09/2014
                                                                                                                                Blank 692 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day
                                                                                                                                CV Court Reporter Fee < 1 Hour; Decision = M; Closed = 06/09/2014
                                                                                                                                  Blank 691 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                  re: mtn to correct jgm; Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 06/09/2014
                                                                                                                                    Blank 690 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None Motion (Other)
                                                                                                                                    to correct jgmt w/respect to calculation of prejudgment interest; Atty Hallman 6/12/14 @ 12:30pm D-7; ; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Motion w/fee; Decision = M; Closed = 06/09/2014
                                                                                                                                      Blank 689 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                      No. 7 (Daniel B. Asimow); Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 06/06/2014
                                                                                                                                        Blank 688 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                        of Mtn to Bifurcate for Trial Issue of Compliance with Pre-Litigation Dispute Resolution (Daniel B. Asimow); Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 06/06/2014
                                                                                                                                          Blank 687 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Motion: Sever/Bifurcate
                                                                                                                                          for Trial Issue of Compliance with Pre-Litigation Dispute Resolution (Daniel B. Asimow); Legacy Name = CV Mtn:Bifurcate; Decision = M; Closed = 06/06/2014
                                                                                                                                            Blank 686 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                            to Plt's Mtn in Limine No. 1 (Daniel B. Asimow); Legacy Name = CV Decl in Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 06/06/2014
                                                                                                                                              Blank 685 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                              to Plt's Mtn for Directed Verdict (Daniel B. Asimow); Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 06/06/2014
                                                                                                                                                Blank 684 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                to Plt's Mtn in Limine No. 11 (Daniel B. Asimow); Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 06/06/2014
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 683 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                  to Plt's Mtn in Limine No. 6 (Daniel B. Asimow); Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 06/06/2014
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 682 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                    to Plt's Mtn in Limine No. 5 (Daniel B. Asimow); Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 06/06/2014
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 681 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                      to Plt's Mtn in Limine No. 4 (Daniel B. Asimow); Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 06/06/2014
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 680 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                        to Plt's Mtn in Limine No. 3 (Daniel B. Asimow); Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 06/06/2014
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 679 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                          to Plt's Mtn in Limine No. 1 (Daniel B. Asimow); Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 06/06/2014
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 678 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                            No.6 (Daniel B. Asimow); Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 06/06/2014
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 677 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                              No. 4 (Daniel B. Asimow); Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 06/06/2014
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 676 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                No. 3 (Daniel B. Asimow); Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 06/06/2014
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 675 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                  No. 2 (Daniel B. Asimow); Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 06/06/2014
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 674 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                    No. 1 (Daniel B. Asimow); Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 06/06/2014
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 673 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      It is hereby ordered that the Court Clerk return the aforementioned documents lodged conditionally under seal in February and April 2013 to PNY. (Judge McGowen) *see order for further details; Legacy Name = CV Order; Decision = M; Closed = 06/06/2014
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 672 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None statement
                                                                                                                                                                        of Per Diem Fees 5/8/14; Legacy Name = CV Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 06/04/2014
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 671 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                          to unseal documents lodged under seal. (Atty Robert D. Hallman); Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 06/02/2014
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 670 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day
                                                                                                                                                                            $175.00; Legacy Name = CV Court Reporter Per Diem Fees; Decision = M; Closed = 06/02/2014
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 669 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                                                                                                                                                                              CV Ntc:Entry of Order; Decision = M; Closed = 05/22/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 668 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                CV Ntc:Entry of Order; Decision = M; Closed = 05/22/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 667 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                  CV Ntc:Entry of Order; Decision = M; Closed = 05/22/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 666 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                    CV Ntc:Entry of Order; Decision = M; Closed = 05/22/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 665 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                      CV Ntc:Entry of Order; Decision = M; Closed = 05/22/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 664 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                        CV Ntc:Entry of Order; Decision = M; Closed = 05/22/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 663 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                          CV Ntc:Entry of Order; Decision = M; Closed = 05/22/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 662 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None statement
                                                                                                                                                                                            of Per Diem Fees 3/13/14, 3/19/14, 3/20/14; Legacy Name = CV Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 05/21/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 661 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None statement
                                                                                                                                                                                              of Per Diem Fees 5/8/14; Legacy Name = CV Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 05/21/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 660 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                It is ordered that the Court Clerk return the following documents lodged conditionally under seal on 2/15/13 to SanDisk:; 1) SanDisk Trial Brief; 2) SanDisk's Mtn in Limine No. 1; 3) SanDisk's Mtn in Limine No. 3; 4) SanDisk's Mtn in Limine No. 4; 5) SanDisk's Mtn in Limine No. 5; 6) SanDisk's Mtn in Limine No. 6; 7) SanDisk's Mtn in Limine No. 7; 8) SanDisk's Mtn in Limine No. 11; 9) SanDisk's Mtn in Limine No. 12; 10) SanDisk's Mtn in Limine No. 13; 11) Declaration of Nelson Richards in Support of SanDisk's Mtns in Limine Nos. 1-16; (Judge McGowen); ; Legacy Name = CV Order; Decision = G; Closed = 05/20/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 659 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Order: Submitted MatterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plt's Mtn for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict is GRANTED and that the judgment entered herein on 3/19/14 be vacated, and that judgment be entered in favor of SanDisk Corporation as follows: ; 1) Plt SanDisk Corporation recover from Def PNY Technologies, Inc. the amount of $33,498,113, comprised of the following amounts: past damages = $25,493,103, future damages = $3,053,192, and prejudgment interest computed at the rate fo 10% per annum from the date of filing of the complaint, all bearing interest at the rate of 10% per annum from the date of the entry of this judgment until paid.; 2) Plt SanDisk Corporation is awarded statutory costs and disbursements in the amount of $77,661.00.; It is also ordered that Def PNY Technologies, Inc. takes nothing from Plt SanDisk Corporation. It is also ordered that judgment be entered in favor of Plt SanDisk Corporation re: Def Def PNY Technologies, Inc.'s affirmative defense of patent exhaustion.; (Judge McGowen); Legacy Name = Order on Submitted Matter; Decision = G; Closed = 05/20/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 658 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Order: Submitted MatterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Def's Mtn for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict is DENIED. (Judge McGowen); Legacy Name = Order on Submitted Matter; Decision = D; Closed = 05/20/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 657 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Order: Submitted MatterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plt's Mtn to Strike the Declaration of Joyce Steinfeld is GRANTED. (Judge McGowen); Legacy Name = Order on Submitted Matter; Decision = G; Closed = 05/20/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 656 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day
                                                                                                                                                                                                        $175; Legacy Name = CV Court Reporter Per Diem Fees; Decision = M; Closed = 05/20/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 655 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None Order: Submitted MatterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Def's Mtn for New Trial is DENIED. (Judge McGowen) hrg 5/8/14; Legacy Name = Order on Submitted Matter; Decision = D; Closed = 05/20/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 654 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memo in support of PNY's Mtn to Tax Costs on 5-16-14 (Daniel Asimow); Legacy Name = CV Reply; Decision = M; Closed = 05/09/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 653 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plt's Mtn to File Def's Opp to Plt's Mtn for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict and Mtn to Set Aside Judgment Under Seal is GRANTED. (Judge McGowen); Legacy Name = CV Order; Decision = G; Closed = 05/09/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 652 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None (FILED UNDER SEAL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Def's Opp to Plt's Mtn for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict and Mtn to Set Aside Judgment (Daniel B. Asimow); Legacy Name = CV Filed under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 05/09/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 651 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CV Proof of Svc by Email; Decision = M; Closed = 05/05/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 650 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Of Patrick Hammon in support of Plt's Opp to Def PNY Technologies, Inc's Mtn to Tax Costs on 5-16-14.; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 05/05/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 649 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      To Def PNY Technologies, Inc's Mtn to Tax Costs on 5-16-14 (Allen Ruby); Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 05/05/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 648 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CV Proof of Svc by Email; Decision = M; Closed = 05/01/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 647 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          memorandum in support of motions for judgment notwithstanding the verdict and to set aside the judgment and enter a new judgment; Legacy Name = CV Reply; Decision = M; Closed = 05/01/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 646 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CV Proof of Svc by Email; Decision = M; Closed = 05/01/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 645 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Of Amy Bomse in support of Def PNY Technologies, Inc's Reply in support of Mtns for New Trial and Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict on 5-8-14.; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 05/01/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 644 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                To Plt Sandisk Corp's Mtn to Strike the Declaration of Joyce Steinfeld (Daniel Asimow); Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 05/01/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 643 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memo in support of its Mtn for New Trial on 5-8-14 (Daniel Asimow); Legacy Name = CV Reply; Decision = M; Closed = 05/01/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 642 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memo in support of its Mtn for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict on 5-8-14 (Daniel Asimow); Legacy Name = CV Reply; Decision = M; Closed = 05/01/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 641 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None Abstract of Judgment issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CV Abstract of Judgment Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 04/29/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 640 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None (FILED UNDER SEAL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Decl of Robert D. Hallman in Support of Def's Mtns in Limine, Decl of Robert D. Hallman in Support of SanDisk's Opp to PNY's Mtns in Limine Nos. 1-7, Def PNY's Opp to Plt's Mtn in Limine No. 16, Def's Trial Brief, Decl of Robert D. Hallman in Support of PNY Tech's Opp to Plt's Mtns in Limine, & PNY's Mtn to Permit Introduction of Limited Evidence Relating to Samsung License; ; Legacy Name = CV Filed under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 04/28/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 639 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 04/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 638 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            mtn to strike decl; Legacy Name = CV Objection...; Decision = M; Closed = 04/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 637 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              for new trial; 5-8-14, 930am, d.7; atty ruby; Legacy Name = CV Memo:Ps & As/Opposn to Mtn; Decision = M; Closed = 04/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 636 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 04/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 635 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  for jgmt; 5-8-14, 930am, d.7; atty ruby; Legacy Name = CV Memo:Ps & As/Opposn to Mtn; Decision = M; Closed = 04/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 634 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    lodging of docs under seal; Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 04/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 633 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 04/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 632 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        redacted; 5-8-14, 930am, d.7; atty asimow; Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 04/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 631 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 04/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 630 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            oppo to plts mtn for jgmt; 5-8-14, 930am, d.7; atty asimow; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 04/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 629 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CV Court Reporter Fee < 1 Hour; Decision = M; Closed = 04/22/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 628 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 04/22/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 627 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None Motion (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Mtn to tax costs. 05/16/14 @ 10am D7. Atty Asimow.; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Motion w/fee; Decision = M; Closed = 04/22/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 626 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    of Jury Fees; Legacy Name = CV Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 04/17/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 625 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      of Per Diem Fees; Legacy Name = CV Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 04/17/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 624 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CV Court Reporter Fee < 1 Hour; Decision = M; Closed = 04/14/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 623 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          of robert hallman; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 04/14/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 622 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            of joyce steinfeld; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 04/14/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 621 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ntdc of motion for new trial, declaration, proposed order; Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 04/14/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 620 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None Motion: New Trial (Civil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                05/08/14 at 9:30am dept 7 atty asimow; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Mtn for New Trial; Decision = M; Closed = 04/14/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 619 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED to Court Order dated 3/28/14, of PNY Technologies Inc. opposition to Sandisk Corporations Motions in Limine; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 04/10/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 618 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED to Court Order dated 3/28/14, of Robert D. Hallman of motions in limine; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 04/10/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 617 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      to unseal documents previously lodged conditionally under seal and file documents publicly; Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 04/10/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 616 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED to Court Order dated 3/28/14, to motion in limine no 16; Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 04/10/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 615 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Motion (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          to Exclude Testimony (James P. Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Mtn:Other/no fee; Decision = M; Closed = 04/21/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 614 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            of Plt's Mtn to Exclude Testimony (James P. Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 04/21/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 613 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              to Def's Mtn for Judgment on the Pleadings (James P. Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 04/21/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 612 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Brief: Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                (James P. Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Trial Brief; Decision = M; Closed = 04/21/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 611 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  to Def's Mtn to Bifurcate Trial & Declaration in Support of (James P. Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Decl in Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 04/21/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 610 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    to Def's Mtn to Bifurcate Trial & Declaration in Support of (James P. Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 04/21/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 609 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      to Def's Mtn in Limine No. 6 (James P. Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 04/21/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 608 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        to Def's Mtn in Limine No. 3 (James P. Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 04/21/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 607 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          to Def's Mtn in Limine No. 4 (James P. Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 04/21/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 606 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            to Def's Mtn in Limine No. 2 (James P. Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 04/21/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 605 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No. 14 (James P. Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 04/21/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 604 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No. 13 (James P. Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 04/21/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 603 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No. 12 (James P. Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 04/21/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 602 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No. 11 (James P. Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 04/21/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 601 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No. 1=7 (James P. Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 04/21/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 600 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No. 6 (James P. Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 04/21/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 599 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No. 5 (James P. Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 04/21/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 598 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No. 4 (James P. Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 04/21/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 597 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No. 3 (James P. Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 04/21/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 596 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No. 1 (James P. Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 04/21/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 595 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  of Ian Chen; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 04/07/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 594 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CV Memo:Ps & As/Suppt of Mtn; Decision = M; Closed = 04/07/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 593 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CV Court Reporter Fee < 1 Hour; Decision = M; Closed = 04/07/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 592 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 04/07/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 591 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None Motion (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          for jgmt notwitstanding the verdict and notice of intention to move to set aside the judgment and enter a new judgment; Atty Schaefer; 4/22/14 @ 10:00am D-7; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Motion w/fee; Decision = M; Closed = 04/07/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 590 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CV Ntc:Entry of Order; Decision = M; Closed = 04/07/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 589 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CV Ntc:Entry of Order; Decision = M; Closed = 04/07/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 588 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CV Ntc:Entry of Order; Decision = M; Closed = 04/07/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 587 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CV Ntc:Entry of Order; Decision = M; Closed = 04/07/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 586 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CV Ntc:Entry of Order; Decision = M; Closed = 04/07/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 585 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CV Ntc:Entry of Order; Decision = M; Closed = 04/07/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 584 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Intention to move for new trial; Atty Asimow; Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 04/04/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 583 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Of Robert Hallman; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 04/04/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 582 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CV Memo:Ps & As/Suppt of Mtn; Decision = M; Closed = 04/04/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 581 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 04/04/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 580 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Motion (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mtn for judgment notwithstanding the verdict; Atty Asimow ; 4/18/14,10am,D-7; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Motion w/fee; Decision = M; Closed = 04/04/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 579 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 04/03/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 578 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Memorandum Of Costs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    $85,179.47; Legacy Name = CV Memo of Costs; Decision = M; Closed = 04/03/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 577 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      *Amended* to PNY's Mtns in Limine Nos. 1-7 (Patrick M. Hammon); Legacy Name = CV Decl in Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 04/28/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 576 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plt's Mtn to File Under Seal Portions of Def's Trial Brief is GRANTED. It is hereby ordered that the unredacted version of: 1) Def's Trial Brief shall be filed under seal. No Persons other than the Court and the parties are permitted to inspect the sealed records. (Judge McGowen); Legacy Name = CV Order; Decision = G; Closed = 04/28/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 575 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plt's Mtn to File Under Seal Portions of Pre-Trial Declarations in Support of Mtns in Limine and Opps is GRANTED. It is hereby ordered that the unredacted version of: 1) the Decl of Robert D. Hallman in Support of Def's Mtns in Limine, Exhibit O; and 2) the Decl of Robert D. Hallman in Support of PNY Tech's Opp to Plt's Mtns in Limine, Exhibit 7 and 3) Def PNY's Opp to Plt's Mtn in Limine No. 16 shall be filed under seal. No Persons other than the Court and the parties are permitted to inspect the sealed records. (Judge McGowen); Legacy Name = CV Order; Decision = G; Closed = 04/28/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 574 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            to Unseal Documents Previously Lodged Conditionally Under Seal and File Documents Publicly - re: Plt's Mtn to Exclude Testimony & Declaration in Support of (James P. Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 04/21/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 573 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              to Unseal Documents Previously Lodged Conditionally Under Seal and File Documents Publicly - re: Plt's Mtns in Limine Nos. 1, 3-7, 11-14, & Plt's Trial Brief (James P. Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 04/21/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 572 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None (FILED UNDER SEAL)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Granting Sandisk's Mtn to File Under Seal Portions of Plt's Pre-Trial Declarations in Support of Mtns in Limine and Oppositions (Judge McGowen); Legacy Name = CV Filed under Seal; Decision = G; Closed = 04/21/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 571 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None (FILED UNDER SEAL)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Granting Sandisk's Mtn to File Under Seal Portions of Def's Mtn to Permit Introduction to Permit Introduction of Limited Evidence Relating to Samsung License (Judge McGowen); Legacy Name = CV Filed under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 04/21/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 570 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    to Unseal Documents Previously Lodged Conditionally Under Seal and File Documents Publicly - re: Plt's Opp to Def's Mtn to Bifurcate Trial & Declaration in Support of (James P. Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 04/21/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 569 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      to Unseal Documents Previously Lodged Conditionally Under Seal and File Documents Publicly - re: Plt's Opp to Def's Mtn for Judgment on the Pleadings (James P. Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 04/21/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 568 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        to Return Pre-Trial Filings Lodged Conditionally Under Seal on 9/27/13 to SanDisk is GRANTED. (Judge McGowen) *see for details; Legacy Name = CV Order; Decision = G; Closed = 04/07/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 567 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          to Return Pre-Trial Filings Lodged Conditionally Under Seal on 1/24/14 - It is hereby Ordered that the Court Clerk return: ; 1) the Declaration of James P. Schaefer in Support of SanDisk Corp's Mtns in Limine Nos. 1-16 in unredacted form which were lodged conditionally unders seal on 1/24/14; 2) the Declaration of Patrick M. Hammon in Support of SanDisk's Opps to PNY Technologies, Inc.'s Mtns in Limine Nos. 1-7, in unredacted form which were lodged conditionally under seal on 1/24/14 to Plt SanDisk Corp.; SanDisk is ordered to re-file appropriate public versions, and confidential versions if necessary, of the above documents within 14 days of this order. (Judge McGowen); Legacy Name = CV Order; Decision = G; Closed = 04/07/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 566 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CV Proof of Svc by Email; Decision = M; Closed = 04/07/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 565 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              to Unseal Docs Previously Lodged Conditionally Under Seal & File Documents Publicly - re: Ptls' Opp to Def's Mtns in Limine Nos. 2-4 & 6 (Jamses P. Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 04/01/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 564 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                *Amended* of Plt's Mtns in Limine Nos. 1-16 (Jamses P. Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 04/01/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 563 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ntc of entry of order; Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 03/26/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 562 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CV Ntc:Entry of Order; Decision = M; Closed = 03/26/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 561 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 03/25/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 560 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RE: USB flash drives sold by PNY during the period covered by the parties' license agreement (atty: Ruby) (see file for details) -- GRANTED by Judge McGowen; Legacy Name = CV Stip & Order/$20 fee; Decision = G; Closed = 03/25/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 559 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CV Ntc:Entry of Order; Decision = M; Closed = 03/25/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 558 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None Document: Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            brief on issue of prejudgment interest; Legacy Name = CV Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 557 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CV Proof of Svc by Email; Decision = M; Closed = 03/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 556 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None Judgment: Notice of Entry (Civil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CV Ntc:Entry of Jgmt w/Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 03/21/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 555 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous: Converted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sandisk Corporation vs PNY Technologies, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 554 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Staying Enforcement of Judgment Pursuant to CCP 918 is GRANTED. (Daniel B. Asimow & James P. Schaefer) Signed by Judge McGowen *see order for details; Legacy Name = CV Stip/Order; Decision = G; Closed = 03/20/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 553 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      **amended per order filed 6-12-14. Total jgmt: $32,805,075**; ; ; on Jury Verdict - It is Ordered that Plt SanDisk Corporation recover from Def PNY Technologies, Inc. the amount of $28,546,295 compromised of the following amounts: past damages of $25,493,103 future damages of $3,053,192, bearing interest at the rate of 10% per annum from the date of the entry of this judgment until paid.; Plt SanDisk Corporation and Def PNY Technologies, Inc. stipulate that the Court shall retain jurisdiction to promptly determine the prejudgment interest to be recovered by Plt SanDisk Corporation as part of this judgment, if any, based on letter briefs to be submitted to the Court by 3/24/14. Plt SanDisk Corporation is awarded statutory costs and disbursements in amount to be determined. It is also ordered that Def PNY Technologies, Inc. takes nothing from Plt SanDisk Corporation.; ; Legacy Name = CV Judgment; Decision = G; Closed = 03/20/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 552 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        $1750; Legacy Name = CV Court Reporter Per Diem Fees; Decision = M; Closed = 03/18/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 551 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          $1750; Legacy Name = CV Court Reporter Per Diem Fees; Decision = M; Closed = 03/18/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 550 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None Jury Fees Posted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            $1078; Legacy Name = CV Jury Deposit/Subsequent; Decision = M; Closed = 03/18/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 549 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              $5600; Legacy Name = CV Court Reporter Per Diem Fees; Decision = M; Closed = 03/13/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 548 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                $5600; Legacy Name = CV Court Reporter Per Diem Fees; Decision = M; Closed = 03/13/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 547 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None Jury Fees Posted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  $3504.02; Legacy Name = CV Jury Deposit/Subsequent; Decision = M; Closed = 03/13/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 546 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    order for disposition of exhibits; Legacy Name = CV Order; Decision = M; Closed = 03/12/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 545 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None Jury Instructions (Final)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      (Judge McGowen); Legacy Name = CV Jury Instructions Given; Decision = M; Closed = 03/10/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 544 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None Document: Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Supplemental Proposed Jury Instructions (Daniel B. Asimow); Legacy Name = CV Other; Decision = S; Closed = 10/10/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 543 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          opposition to plaintiff motion for directed verdict; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 03/05/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 542 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            of lodgingof documents under seal; Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 03/05/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 541 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None Document: Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              def response to sandisk cop obejction to instructing the jury to interpret MLC tech; Legacy Name = CV Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 540 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None Document: Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                def proposed special verdict form revised 3/3/14; Legacy Name = CV Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 539 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  motion for directed verdict; Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 03/04/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 538 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None Motion (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    pltf sandisk corp mtn for directed verdict as to def pny's affirmative defenses, atty ruby; Legacy Name = CV Mtn:Other/no fee; Decision = M; Closed = 03/04/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 537 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Personal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CV Proof of Personal Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 03/04/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 536 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        to instructing the jury to interpret "MLC Technology"; Legacy Name = CV Objection...; Decision = M; Closed = 03/04/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 535 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Personal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CV Proof of Personal Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 03/04/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 534 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            to PNY Technologies Inc.'s Motion for Nonsuit; Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 03/04/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 533 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              of Lodging of Documents under Seal (Robert D. Hallman); Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 04/03/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 532 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Def's Opp to Plt's Mtn to Exclude Expert Testimony (Daniel B. Asimow); Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 04/03/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 531 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Personal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CV Proof of Personal Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 04/01/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 530 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Of William J Casey regarding the lodging under seal of Sandisk Corporation's Sandisk Corporation's mtn to exclude testimony from PNY Technologies, Inc.'s proposed expert, Christian Tregillis, concerning Miller Kaplan's "independence."; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 02/28/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 529 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION. Of William J Casey.; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 02/28/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 528 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of William J Casey in support of plt Sandisk Corporation's mtn to exclude testimony from PNY Technologies, Inc.'s proposed expert, Christian Tregillis, concerning Miller Kaplan's "independence." 02/28/14 @ 9am D7. Atty Ruby.; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 02/28/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 527 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 02/28/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 526 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None Motion (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED VERSION. Sandisk Corporation's mtn to exclude testimony from PNY Technologies, Inc.'s proposed expert, Christian Tregillis, concerning Miller Kaplan's "independence." 02/28/14 @ 9am D7. Atty Ruby.; Legacy Name = CV Mtn:Other/no fee; Decision = M; Closed = 02/28/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 525 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sandisk Corporation's mtn to exclude testimony from PNY Technologies, Inc.'s proposed expert, Christian Tregillis, concerning Miller Kaplan's "independence." 02/28/14 @ 9am D7. Atty Ruby.; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 02/28/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 524 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Personal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                jury instructions; Legacy Name = CV Proof of Personal Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 02/28/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 523 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None Document: Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  def proposed jury instructions not yet agreed upon revised 3/3/14; Legacy Name = CV Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 522 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None Document: Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    def proposed jury instructions not yet agreed upon (revised); Legacy Name = CV Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 521 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None Document: Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      stip & proposed order re chipmaker licenses; Legacy Name = CV Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 520 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None Motion (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        def pny mtn for nonsuit; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Motion/no fee; Decision = M; Closed = 03/12/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 519 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None Motion (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          for Nonsuit (Daniel B. Asimow); Legacy Name = CV Mtn:Other/no fee; Decision = M; Closed = 10/10/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 518 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CV Proof of Svc by Email; Decision = M; Closed = 02/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 517 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              To Def's Mtn to permit introduction of limited evidence relating to Samsung License (James Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 02/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 516 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Of Undocumented Action - See attach; Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 02/20/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 515 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Personal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CV Proof of Personal Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 02/20/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 514 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Ntc of Lodging of Docs Under Seal (Robert Hallman); Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 02/20/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 513 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Redacted - Def's Mtn to Permit Introduction of Limited Evidence relating to Samsung License (Daniel Asimow); Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 02/20/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 512 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Def's Mtn to Permit Introduction of Limited Evidence relating to Samsung License (Daniel Asimow); Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 02/20/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 511 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Personal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CV Proof of Personal Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 02/18/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 510 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            of Robert Hallman in support of opposition to motion to exclude evidence of fraud; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 02/18/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 509 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              to Sandisk Corporations motion to exclude evidence of fraud; Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 02/18/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 508 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 02/14/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 507 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CV Court Reporter Fee < 1 Hour; Decision = M; Closed = 02/14/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 506 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 02/14/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 505 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None Motion (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      to exclude evidence; 2-14-14, 9am, d.7; atty ruby; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Motion w/fee; Decision = M; Closed = 02/14/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 504 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 02/06/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 503 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          joint concise non-argumentative statement of the case; Legacy Name = CV Statement of the Case; Decision = M; Closed = 02/06/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 502 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            to def's req for judicial notice (patrick hammon0; Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 02/04/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 501 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              of Robert Hallman in support of request for judicial notice; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 02/03/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 500 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Request-Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CV Req:Judicial Ntc; Decision = M; Closed = 02/03/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 499 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  second supplemental trial exhibit list; Legacy Name = CV Exhibits List; Decision = M; Closed = 02/03/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 498 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CV Proof of Svc by Email; Decision = M; Closed = 02/03/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 497 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      to defendants PNY's motion in Limine NO. 7; Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 01/27/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 496 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        supplemental declaration of Robert D. Hallman in support of opposition to motion in Limine No. 1; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/27/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 495 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          to motion in Limine No. !, redacted; Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 01/27/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 494 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            opposition to motion in limine No. 1; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/27/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 493 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CV Proof of Svc by Email; Decision = M; Closed = 01/27/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 492 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                documents under seal; Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 01/27/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 491 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  to plaintiff Sandisk corporations proposed jury instructions; Legacy Name = CV Objection...; Decision = M; Closed = 01/27/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 490 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None Declaration: Supplemental
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    of Robert D. Hallman in support of Defendant PNY Technologies, Inc. opposition to plaintiff motion in limine no. 1-Redacted version; Legacy Name = CV Supplemental Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 01/27/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 489 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      See Attach...; Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 488 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plt's Trial Brief.; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 487 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Personal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CV Proof of Personal Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 486 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Redacted version - To Def's Mtn for Judgment on the Pleadings (James Schaeger); Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 485 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plt's Opposition to Def's Mtn for Judgment on the Pleadings; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 484 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                To Def's Mtn for Stay of Trial (James Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 483 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Of James Schaefer in support of Mtn for Stay of Trial; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 482 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Redacted version - Declaration of James Schaefer in support of Mtn to Bifurcate; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 481 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of James Schaefer in support of Mtn to Birfurcate; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 480 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Redacted version - Plt's Opposition to Def's Mtn to Birfurcate; Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 479 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mnt to Bifurcate; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 478 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Redacted version - Declaration of Patrick Hammon for Mtn #1-7; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 477 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Mtn 1-7; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 476 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Redacted version - Plt's Opposition to Def's Mtn #6 (Atty James Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 475 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Mtn #6; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 474 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plt's Opposition to Def's Mtn #5 (Atty James Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 473 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Of James Schaefer in support of Plt's Opposition to Mtn #4; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 472 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Redacted version - Plt's Opposition to Def's Mtn #4 (Atty James Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 471 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mtn #4; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 470 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Redacted version - Plt's Opposition to Def's Mtn #3 (Atty James Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 469 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Mtn #3; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 468 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Redacted version - Plt's Opposition to Def's Mtn #2 (Atty James Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 467 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plt's Opposition to Def's Mtn #2; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 466 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    To Def PNY's Mtn #1 (James Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 465 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Of Patrick Hammon in support of Plt's Application to File Under Seal Portions of Sandisk's Opposition to PNY Tech Inc's Mtn Judgment on the Pleadings .; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 464 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        To File Under Seal Portions of Sandisk's Opposition to PNY Tech Inc's Mtn Judgment on the Pleadings (Patrick Hammon); Legacy Name = CV Application... w/fee; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 463 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Of Patrick Hammon in support of Plt's Application to File Under Seal Portions of Sandisk's Opposition to PNY Tech Inc's Mtn to Bifurcate for trial issue; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 462 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            To File Under Seal Portions of Sandisk's Opposition to PNY Tech Inc's Mtn to Bifurcate for trial issue (Patrick Hammon); Legacy Name = CV Application... w/fee; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 461 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Of Patrick Hammon in support of Plt's Application to file Under Seal Portions of Plt's Opposition; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 460 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                To File Under Seal Portions of Sandisk's Trial Brief (Atty Patrick Hammon); Legacy Name = CV Application... w/fee; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 459 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  To File Under Seal Portions of Sandisk's Opposition to PNY Tech Inc's Mtns (Patrick Hammon); Legacy Name = CV Application... w/fee; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 458 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CV Proof of Svc by Email; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 457 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of James Schaefer in support of Plt's Mtn #1-16; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 456 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Of James Schaefer in support of Plt's Mtn #16; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 455 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mtn Limine #16 - Filed by James Schaefer.; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 454 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mtn Limine #15 - Filed by James Schaefer.; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 453 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Redacted version - Mtn Limine #14 - Filed by James Schaefer.; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 452 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mtn Limine #14; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 451 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Mtn Limine #13 - Filed by James Schaefer.; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 450 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Mtn Limine #13; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 449 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Redacted version - Mtn Limine #12 - Filed by James Schaefer.; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 448 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Mtn Limine #12; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 447 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Redacted version - Mtn Limine #11 - Filed by James Schaefer.; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 446 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mtn Limine #11; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 445 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Mtn Limine #10 - Filed by James Schaefer.; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 444 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mtn Limine #9 - Filed by James Schaefer.; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 443 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion #8 (Atty James Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 442 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Redacted version Mtn Limine #7- Filed by James Schaefer.; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 441 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Mtn Limine #7; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 440 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Redacted version Mtn Limine #6- Filed by James Schaefer.; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 439 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mtn Limine #6; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 438 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Redacted version Mtn Limine #4- Filed by James Schaefer.; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 437 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion #5; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 436 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion #4; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 435 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  decl in support; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 434 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    redacted; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 433 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      to mtn in limine 10; Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 432 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        to mtn in limine 16; Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 431 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          to mtn in limine 15; Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 430 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            to mtn in limine 14; Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 429 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              to mtn in limine 13; Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 428 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                to mtn in limine 12; Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 427 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  to mtn in limine 9; Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 426 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    to mtn in limine 8; Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 425 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      to mtn in limine 7; Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 424 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        to mtn in limine 2; Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 423 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          decl in support; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 422 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            redacted,; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 421 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              oppo to mtn in limine 16; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 420 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                redacted, to mtn in limine 16; Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 419 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  oppo to mtn in limine 11; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 418 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    redacted, to mtn in limine 11; Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 417 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      oppo to mtn in limine 6; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 416 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        redacted, to mtn in limine 6; Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 415 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          oppo to mtn in limine 5; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 414 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            redacted, to mtn in limine 5; Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 413 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              oppo to mtn in limine 4; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 412 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                redacted, to mtn in limine 4; Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 411 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  redacted, oppo to mtn in limine 3; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 410 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    redacted, to mtn in limine 3; Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 409 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      decl in support; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 408 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        redacted,; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 407 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          to bifurcate; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 406 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            redacted, to bifurcate; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 405 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              mtn in limine 7; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 404 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                redacted, 7; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 403 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Redacted version Motion #4 (Atty James Schaefer); Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 402 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    mtn in limine 6; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 401 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      redacted, 6; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 400 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        5; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 399 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          mtn in limine 4; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 398 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            redacted, 4; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 397 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              mtn in limine 3; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 396 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                redacted, 3; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 395 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  mtn in limine 2; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 394 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    redacted, 2; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 393 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      mtn in limine 1; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 392 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        redacted, 1; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 391 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 390 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            for stay of trial; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 389 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              jgmt on pleadings; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 388 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CV Exhibits List; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 387 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Limine #3; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 386 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CV Statement of the Case; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 385 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Mtn Limine #2- Filed by James Schaefer.; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 384 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        trial brief; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 383 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Redacted version Mtn Limine #1- Filed by James Schaefer.; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 382 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 381 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Brief: Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CV Trial Brief; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 380 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plt's Mtn in Limine #1 to Exclude Evidence Relating to paten Licensing and Settlment Discussions between the Parties.; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 379 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Brief: Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Redacted version - Filed by Atty Allen.; Legacy Name = CV Trial Brief; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 378 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Of Patrick Hammon in support of Plt's Application To File Under Seal Portions of Sandisk's Trial Brief; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 377 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed by Atty Allen Ruby.; Legacy Name = CV Exhibits List; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 376 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        concise agrument Statement of the case; Legacy Name = CV Statement of the Case; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 375 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None Statement: Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          (Daniel B. Asimow) hrg 1/22/14 9am D-2; Legacy Name = CV Statement:Settlement Conf; Decision = M; Closed = 01/16/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 374 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None Statement: Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            (Patrick Hammon) hrg 1/22/14 9am D-2; Legacy Name = CV Statement:Settlement Conf; Decision = M; Closed = 01/16/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 373 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None Order After Hearing - POSCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              order re: motion to seal papers filed in connection with Sandisk's Application for Right to attach order and order for issuance of Writ of Attachment; Granted by Judge Kirwan; Legacy Name = CV Ord After Hearing; Decision = G; Closed = 12/20/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 372 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plt's pet. for writ of attachment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Kirwan. See file for details; Legacy Name = CV Order; Decision = D; Closed = 12/20/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 371 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  and Overnight Mail Reply & Decl of James Schaefer in Support of Sandisk Corp's Reply Memo in Support of its Appl for Right to Attach (Schaefer) 11-26-13 D8; Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc by Email; Decision = M; Closed = 11/22/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 370 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Decl of James Schaefer in Support of Sandisk Corp's Reply Memo in Support of its Appl for Right to Attach (Schaefer) 11-26-13 D8; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 11/22/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 369 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Appl for Appl Right to Attach (Schaefer) 11-26-13 D8; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 11/22/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 368 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        *Redacted* Sandisk's Reply Memo in Support of Appl for Right to Attach (Schaefer) 11-26-13 D8; Legacy Name = CV Reply; Decision = M; Closed = 11/22/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 367 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sandisk's Reply Memo in Support of Appl for Right to Attach (Schaefer) 11-26-13 D8; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 11/22/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 366 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            *Redacted* Responses to Def PNY's Evidentiary Objections to Sandisk Corp's Appl for Right to Attach (Schaefer) 11-26-13 D8; Legacy Name = CV Response; Decision = M; Closed = 11/22/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 365 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Responses to Def PNY's Evidentiary Objections to Sandisk Corp's Appl for Right to Attach (Schaefer) 11-26-13 D8; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 11/22/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 364 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                *Redacted* Decl of James Schaefer in Support of Sandisk Corp's Reply Memo in Support of its Appl for Right to Attach (Schaefer) 11-26-13 D8; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 11/22/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 363 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Decl of James P. Schaefer in Support of Sandisk Corp's Motion to Seal App, Reply Memo, Responsed to Def's Evidentiary Objections and Exhibits (J. Schaefer) 11-26-13 D8; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 11/22/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 362 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None Application: Right to Attach Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    *Redacted* Atty J. Schaefer 11-26-13 D8; Legacy Name = CV Appl: Right to Attach Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 361 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Mtn to Seal (Atty James Schaefer) 11-26-13 D8; Legacy Name = CV Court Reporter Per Diem Fees; Decision = M; Closed = 11/22/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 360 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None Motion: Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Appl, Reply Memo, Responses to Def PNY's Evidentiary Objections & Exhibits in Support of Its Appl for Right to Attach Order (J. Schaefer) 11-26-13 D8; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Motion to Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 11/22/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 359 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Mark Ciano in Opposition to Plt Sandisk Corporation's Application for Right to Attachment and for Isuance of Writ of Attachment; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 11/20/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 358 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in support of PNY Techologies, Inc's Opposition to Sandkisk Corporation's Application for Right to Attach Order and for Issuance of Writ of Attach; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 11/20/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 357 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              to Application for Right to Attach Order by Def (Daniel B. Asimow) 11/26/13 @9am in D8; Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 11/20/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 356 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None (FILED UNDER SEAL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OF GADI COHEN IN OPPO TO SANDISK'S APPL FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT (ASIMOW); Legacy Name = CV Filed under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 11/19/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 355 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None (FILED UNDER SEAL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO OF OPPO TO PLF SANDISK'S APPL FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT (ASIMOW); Legacy Name = CV Filed under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 11/19/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 354 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None (FILED UNDER SEAL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DEF'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO SANDISK CORP'S APPL FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT... (ASIMOW); Legacy Name = CV Filed under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 11/19/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 353 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CV Proof of Svc/Regular Mail; Decision = M; Closed = 11/19/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 352 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OF MARK CIANO IN OPPO TO PLF'S APPL FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTCHEMENT (ASIMOW); Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 11/19/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 351 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OF GADI COHEN IN OPPO TO TO PLF'S APPL FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTCHEMENT (ASIMOW); Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 11/19/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 350 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OF CHRISTIAN TREGILLIS IN OPPO TO TO PLF'S APPL FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTCHEMENT (ASIMOW); Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 11/19/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 349 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OF COUNSEL RE OPPO TO TO PLF'S APPL FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTCHEMENT (ASIMOW); Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 11/19/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 348 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TO PLF'S APPL FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTCHEMENT (ASIMOW); Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 11/19/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 347 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DEF'S EVIDENTIARY OBJ. TO APPL CATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHEMENT AND THE DECL. OF IAN CHEN AND MEMO IN SUPP THEREOF (D. ASIMOW); Legacy Name = CV Objection...; Decision = M; Closed = 11/19/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 346 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Of Robert Hallman in support of PNY Technologies, Inc's Mtn to Seal.; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 11/19/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 345 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Motion: Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to File Under Seal by Def PNY Technologies, Inc. (Daniel Asimow); Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Motion to Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 11/19/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 344 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CV Proof of Svc by Email; Decision = M; Closed = 11/13/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 343 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          to Plt's Motion to Seal Application, Memo and Exhibits by Def (Robert D. Hallman) 11/26/13 @9am in D8; Legacy Name = CV Response; Decision = M; Closed = 11/13/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 342 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RE: right to attach order and motion for leave to file under seal, 11/26/13 9am D-8, by atty Schaefer.; Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc by Email; Decision = M; Closed = 11/04/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 341 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of undocumented action re: declaration of Ian Chen in support of application for right to attach order filed under seal.; Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 11/04/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 340 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of undocumented action re: memorandum of points and authorities in support of application for right to attach order filed under seal.; Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 11/04/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 339 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of undocumented action re: application for right to attach order filed under seal.; Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 11/04/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 338 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    James P. Schaefer in support of motion to seal, 11/26/13 9am D-8, by atty Schaefer.; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 11/04/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 337 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED Ian Chen in support of Application for right to attach order, 11/26/13 9am D-8, by atty Schaefer.; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 11/04/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 336 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED RE: Application for right to attach order, 11/26/13 9am D-8, by atty Schaefer.; Legacy Name = CV Memo:Ps & As/Suppt of Mtn; Decision = M; Closed = 11/04/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 335 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None Application: Right to Attach Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED Application for right to attach order, 11/26/13 9am D-8, by atty Schaefer.; Legacy Name = CV Appl: Right to Attach Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 334 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Right to attach order and motion to seal, 11/26/13 9am, D-8, by atty Schaefer.; Legacy Name = CV Court Reporter's Fee; Decision = M; Closed = 11/01/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 333 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None Motion: Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RE: right to attach order, 11/26/13 9am, D-8, by atty Schaefer.; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Motion to Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 11/01/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 332 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None Application: Right to Attach Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                11/26/13 9am, D-8, by atty Schaefer.; Legacy Name = CV Appl: Right to Attach Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 331 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Undocumented action re: received documents under seal.; Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 09/27/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 330 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Redacted, RE: Motions in Limine Nos. 1 through 16.; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 09/27/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 329 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      #16; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 09/27/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 328 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Redacted, #15; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 09/27/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 327 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Redacted, #14; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 09/27/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 326 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Redacted, #13; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 09/27/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 325 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Redacted, #12; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 09/27/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 324 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Redacted, #11; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 09/27/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 323 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  #10; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 09/27/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 322 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    #9; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 09/27/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 321 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      #8; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 09/27/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 320 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Redacted, #7; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 09/27/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 319 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Redacted, #6; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 09/27/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 318 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Redacted, #5; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 09/27/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 317 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Redacted, #4; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 09/27/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 316 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Redacted, #3; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 09/27/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 315 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  #2; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 09/27/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 314 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Redacted, #1; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 09/27/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 313 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Jury Instructions (Final)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed.; Legacy Name = CV Jury Instructions Given; Decision = M; Closed = 09/27/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 312 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Verdict
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed.; Legacy Name = CV Jury Verdict; Decision = M; Closed = 09/27/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 311 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CV Exhibits List; Decision = M; Closed = 09/27/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 310 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CV Statement of the Case; Decision = M; Closed = 09/27/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 309 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Brief: Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Redacted, by atty Ruby.; Legacy Name = CV Trial Brief; Decision = M; Closed = 09/27/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 308 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                re: application to file under seal.; Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc by Email; Decision = M; Closed = 09/27/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 307 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  re: application to file under seal, by atty Ruby.; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 09/27/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 306 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    by atty Ruby.; Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Req:File Pldgs Under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 09/27/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 305 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None Statement: Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      9-25-13 9:00 D8 (Patrick Hammon); Legacy Name = CV Statement:Settlement Conf; Decision = M; Closed = 09/23/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 304 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None Statement: Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        9-25-13 9:00 D8 (Daniel B. Asimow); Legacy Name = CV Statement:Settlement Conf; Decision = M; Closed = 09/19/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 303 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          of resp to mtn to cont trial date, on multiple parties, 6-21-13; Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc by Email; Decision = M; Closed = 06/21/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 302 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            of Daniel B. Asimow, of resp to mtn to cont trial date; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 06/21/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 301 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              to mtn to cont trial date, Daniel B. Asimow; Legacy Name = CV Response; Decision = M; Closed = 06/21/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 300 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                of stlmt conf stmt, on multiple parties, 6-20-13; Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc by Email; Decision = M; Closed = 06/20/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 299 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None Statement: Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  pursuant to evid code sections 1152 & 1154, Daniel B. Asimow; Legacy Name = CV Statement:Settlement Conf; Decision = M; Closed = 06/20/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 298 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None Statement: Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Atty Allen Ruby - 6-26-13 9:00 D8; Legacy Name = CV Statement:Settlement Conf; Decision = M; Closed = 06/21/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 297 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      for Mtn to Continue Trial Date for Not More than 90 Days (Allen Ruby) Hrg 6/25/13 9am D-8; Legacy Name = CV Court Reporter's Fee; Decision = M; Closed = 06/19/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 296 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        to Continue Trial Date for Not More than 90 Days (Allen Ruby) Hrg 6/25/13 9am D-8; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 06/19/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 295 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          to Continue Trial Date for Not More than 90 Days (Allen Ruby) Hrg 6/25/13 9am D-8; Legacy Name = CV Memo:Ps & As/Suppt of Mtn; Decision = M; Closed = 06/19/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 294 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None Motion: Continuance (Trial)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Date for Not More than 90 Days (Allen Ruby) Hrg 6/25/13 9am D-8; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Mtn to Continue Trial; Decision = M; Closed = 06/19/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 293 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None Application and Order: Ex ParteCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              for OST on Mtn to Continue Trial is GRANTED. SanDisk's Mtn to Continue Trial is set for 6/25/13 @ 9am D-8. (Allen Ruby) Signed by Judge Kirwan; Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Appl & Order; Decision = G; Closed = 06/19/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 292 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                of Robert Hallman in support of motions in limine- redacted; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 04/16/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 291 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  *Unsealed per 6/3/14 Order* - motion in limine #6; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 04/16/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 290 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    #6- redacted (Daniel Asimow); Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 04/16/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 289 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      *Unsealed per 6/3/14 Order* - motion in limine #4; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 04/16/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 288 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        #4- redacted (Daniel Asimow); Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 04/16/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 287 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          *Unsealed per 6/3/14 Order* - motion in limine #3; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 04/16/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 286 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            #3- redacted (Daniel Asimow); Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 04/16/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 285 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              *Unsealed per 6/3/14 Order* - motion in limine #2; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 04/16/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 284 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                #2- redacted (Daniel Asimow); Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 04/16/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 283 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  *Unsealed per 6/3/14 Order* - motion in limine #1; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 04/16/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 282 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    #1- redacted (Daniel Asimow); Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 04/16/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 281 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      *Unsealed per 6/3/14 Order* - trial brief; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 04/16/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 280 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None Brief: Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        redacted (Daniel Asimow); Legacy Name = CV Trial Brief; Decision = M; Closed = 04/16/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 279 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          lodging of documents under seal (Daniel Asimow); Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 04/16/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 278 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            removing unredaceted docs from public file and replacing them w/ redacted docs, signed by judge Kirwan; Legacy Name = CV Stip/Order; Decision = G; Closed = 04/03/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 277 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None Order: Ex ParteCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              It is Ordered that a TSC be and hereby is scheduled for 3-12-13 @11am in d-8 *signed by Judge Stoelker*; Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Order; Decision = M; Closed = 03/01/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 276 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None Application: Ex Parte (Fee Applies)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                for an order scheduling trial setting conference March 12, 2013 Allen Ruby; Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Appl; Decision = M; Closed = 03/01/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 275 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Stipulation and Order: Ex ParteCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  removing unredacted document from public file and replacing it with redacted document - GRANTED by Judge Stoelker; *see order for details*; Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Stip/Order; Decision = M; Closed = 02/25/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 274 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None Pleading: Amended
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    witnesses list, J. Schaefer; Legacy Name = CV Amended Pleading; Decision = M; Closed = 02/20/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 273 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None Pleading: Amended
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      exh list, James P. Schaefer; Legacy Name = CV Amended Pleading; Decision = M; Closed = 02/20/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 272 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        of law in support of motion for stay of trial; Legacy Name = CV Memorandum; Decision = M; Closed = 03/07/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 271 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          of Daniel B. Asimow; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 03/07/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 270 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            of p's & a's in support of motion for judgment on the pleadings on plt's second cause of action (Daniel Asimow); Legacy Name = CV Memorandum; Decision = M; Closed = 03/07/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 269 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              (Daniel Asimow); Legacy Name = CV Exhibits List; Decision = M; Closed = 03/07/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 268 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                #2 (Daniel Asimow) *Per stip & order on 4-03-13, this unredacted document is removed from public file and replaced with redacted document*; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 03/07/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 267 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  #3 (Daniel Asimow) *Per stip & order on 4-03-13, this unredacted document is removed from public file and replaced with redacted document*; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 03/07/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 266 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    #5 (Daniel Asimow); Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 03/07/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 265 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      #4 (Daniel Asimow) *Per stip & order on 4-03-13, this unredacted document is removed from public file and replaced with redacted document*; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 03/07/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 264 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        #1 (Daniel Asimow) *Per stip & order on 4-03-13, this unredacted document is removed from public file and replaced with redacted document*; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 03/07/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 263 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          # 6 (Daniel Asimow) *Per stip & order on 4-03-13, this unredacted document is removed from public file and replaced with redacted document*; Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 03/07/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 262 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Brief: Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            by atty Daniel Asimow *Per stip & order on 4-03-13, this unredacted document is removed from public file and replaced with redacted document*; Legacy Name = CV Trial Brief; Decision = M; Closed = 03/07/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 261 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              *Unsealed per 6/3/14 Order* - declaration of Robert Hallman in support of motions in limine; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 03/07/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 260 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Nelson Richards in support of Sandisk Corporation's Motion in Limine Nos.1-13; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 02/15/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 259 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Redacted Declaration of Nelson Richards in support of Sandisk Corporation's Motion in Limine Nos.1-13 by Plt (Allen Ruby); Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 02/15/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 258 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plt's Motion in Limine #13 to Exclude all parol Evidence regarding the hmeaning of the parties license agreement; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 02/15/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 257 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Redacted Motion in Limine #13 by Plt (Allen Ruby); Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine; Decision = M; Closed = 02/15/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 256 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Lodged Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plt's Motion in Limine #12 to Exclude details of the dispute leading to the 2009 letter agreement pursuant to Evidence; Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal; Decision = M; Closed = 02/15/2013

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?