Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company v. Future Air
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 2011-1-CV-209012

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 22, 2018 at 10:28 AM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Cole Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Nelson Cole +1 916 376 0486 +1 916 376 0478 scole@colenetlaw.com
v.
No Logo Future Air, Defendant
Case Type Other PI/PD/WD Unlimited (23)
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None Request Dismissal
atty Cole; Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/o Prej; Decision = M; Closed = 11/15/2011
    Blank 4 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
    CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 11/02/2011
      Blank 3 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
      CV Summons Filed; Decision = M; Closed = 09/13/2011
        Blank 2 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
        CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 09/13/2011
          Blank 1 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
          CV Case Cover Sheet; Decision = M; Closed = 09/13/2011

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 0 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?