USAA Casualty Insurance Company v. Flow Master LLC, et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 2006-1-CV-065103

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 22, 2018 at 6:22 PM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo USAA Casualty Insurance Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Cole Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Nelson Cole +1 916 376 0486 +1 916 376 0478 scole@colenetlaw.com
No Logo Flow Master LLC, Defendant/Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space De La Flor, Andrew R +1 714 634 0377
No Logo KB Home South Bay Inc., Defendant/Cross Complainant
No Logo Penske Logistics LLC, Cross Defendant
No Logo Quality Express Hayward, Cross Defendant
Whirlpool Corporation Whirlpool Corporation, Cross Defendant
Case Type Product Liability Unlimited (24)
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 31 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: None Dismissal
by atty Carol Stair as to x-compl. filed by KB Home South Bay Inc. 10/25/06; Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial W/O Prej; Decision = M; Closed = 05/21/2007
    Blank 30 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: None Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS
    CV Ntc:Entry of Dismissal w/POS; Decision = M; Closed = 05/15/2007
      Blank 29 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: None Request Dismissal
      atty J. Thomaw Aldrich; Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/o Prej; Decision = M; Closed = 05/07/2007
        Blank 28 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: None Notice-Settlement
        unconditional (Stephen Cole); Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Settlement; Decision = M; Closed = 03/29/2007
          Blank 27 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: None Notice of Hearing (no fee)
          ARB-Ntc of Mediation Status Conf; Decision = M; Closed = 03/23/2007
            Blank 26 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None Notice of Hearing (no fee)
            ARB-Ntc of Mediation Status Conf; Decision = M; Closed = 02/15/2007
              Blank 25 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: None Dismissal
              bly atty Alan Packer as to x-compl. filed by KB Home SOuth Bay Inc. on 10/25/06 as to Whirlpood Corp only; Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial W/O Prej; Decision = M; Closed = 02/08/2007
                Blank 24 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: None Notice: Change Address/Firm Name
                New address: John D. Bronstein, Venable, LLP, 2049 Century Park East, Ste.2100, Los Angeles, CA 90067. Ph.310-229-9900.; Legacy Name = CV Change of Atty address/Firm; Decision = M; Closed = 01/24/2007
                  Blank 23 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                  John D. Bronstein; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 01/22/2007
                    Blank 22 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                    Alan H. Packer; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 01/17/2007
                      Blank 21 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                      atty: J. Thomas Aldrich; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 01/16/2007
                        Blank 20 Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: None Answer/Response (No Fee)
                        to x-complaint (de la Flor); Legacy Name = CV Answer - NO FEES DUE!; Decision = M; Closed = 01/09/2007
                          Blank 19 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: None General Denial: Unlimited
                          atty bronstein; Legacy Name = CV General Denial, Unltd; Decision = M; Closed = 01/03/2007
                            Blank 18 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: None Notice
                            case management conference; Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 12/08/2006
                              Blank 17 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                              atty de la flor; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 11/06/2006
                                Blank 16 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: None Notice: Change Address/Firm Name
                                CV Change of Atty address/Firm; Decision = M; Closed = 11/06/2006
                                  Blank 15 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                  Atty. Alan H. Packer; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 10/30/2006
                                    Blank 14 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                    Atty: Stephen N. Cole; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 10/26/2006
                                      Blank 13 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: None Notice
                                      cont'd case management conference; Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 10/26/2006
                                        Blank 12 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                        on x-comp; Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed; Decision = M; Closed = 10/25/2006
                                          Blank 11 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                          atty carol stair; Legacy Name = CV Answer, Unltd, w/fees; Decision = M; Closed = 10/25/2006
                                            Blank 10 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: None Cross Complaint
                                            summons issued; Legacy Name = CV Cross-Complaint; Decision = M; Closed = 10/25/2006
                                              Blank 9 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                              S. Cole; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 09/29/2006
                                                Blank 8 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                on summons and complaint and amendment to complaint; Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 09/22/2006
                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: None Complaint: Amendment To (New Party)
                                                  incorrect name of kb home morgage company and having DISCOVERED THE TRUE NAME OF THE DEFT TO BE KB HOME SOUTH BAY INC. SIGNED BY JUDGE HERLIHY; Legacy Name = CV Amendment to Complaint; Decision = M; Closed = 08/29/2006
                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                    atty andrew de la flor; Legacy Name = CV Answer, Unltd, w/fees; Decision = M; Closed = 07/10/2006
                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 7/5/2006, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                      CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 07/05/2006
                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 7/5/2006, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                        CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 07/05/2006
                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                          *ff; Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 06/08/2006
                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                                            *ff; Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet; Decision = M; Closed = 06/08/2006
                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                                              *ff; Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed; Decision = M; Closed = 06/08/2006

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?