MynTahl Corporation v. P-Com, Inc., et al

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 2006-1-CV-066166
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 22, 2018 at 6:38 PM EST (6.4 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo P-com, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Waverider Communications Inc., Defendant
Other Parties
No Logo MynTahl Corporation, Plaintiff/Cross Defendant

Represented by Schein & Cai LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Cai +1 408 436 0789 +1 408 436 0758 jcai@sacattorneys.com
No Logo WAVE WIRELESS Corporation, Defendant/Cross Complainant

Represented by Law Offices of Clayton and McEvoy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Laurence John McEvoy +1 408 293 9100 +1 408 293 4172 general@clayton-mcevoy.com
Attributes
Case Type Breach of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06)
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
Timeline
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
Dismissing entire action (No appearance @ CMC) by Judge Levinger.; Legacy Name = CV Order; Decision = M; Closed = 03/16/2009
Request RequestSpace
Blank 12 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: None Notice: Dismissal of Action
CV-Ntc:Dismissal of Action; Decision = M; Closed = 03/12/2009
Request RequestSpace
Blank 11 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: None Notice: Change Address/Firm Name
CV Change of Atty address/Firm; Decision = M; Closed = 09/11/2008
Request RequestSpace
Blank 10 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None Stipulation and Order: Ex Parte
FOR A CONTINUANCE ON THE HEARING ON STATUS OF THE CASE; SET FOR 9-6-07 FOR BANKRUPTCY REVIEW BY HON. KEVIN E. MC KENNEY; Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Stip/Order; Decision = M; Closed = 02/02/2007
Request RequestSpace
Blank 9 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: None Affidavit
of service of summons and complaint; Legacy Name = CV Affidavit; Decision = M; Closed = 10/05/2006
Request RequestSpace
Blank 8 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: None Answer/Response (No Fee)
to x complaint; Legacy Name = CV Answer - NO FEES DUE!; Decision = M; Closed = 09/12/2006
Request RequestSpace
Blank 7 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
G Czarkowski; Legacy Name = CV Answer, Unltd, w/fees; Decision = M; Closed = 08/17/2006
Request RequestSpace
Blank 6 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Cross Complaint
CV Cross-Complaint; Decision = M; Closed = 08/17/2006
Request RequestSpace
Blank 5 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 08/01/2006
Request RequestSpace
Blank 4 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 07/25/2006
Request RequestSpace
Blank 3 Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 06/26/2006
Request RequestSpace
Blank 2 Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
CV Case Cover Sheet; Decision = M; Closed = 06/26/2006
Request RequestSpace
Blank 1 Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
CV Summons Filed; Decision = M; Closed = 06/26/2006
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 0 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?