Jackson Women's Health Organization v. Currier
Federal Civil Lawsuit Mississippi Southern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-00171-CWR-FKB
District Judge Carlton W. Reeves, presiding

Tags
Last Updated April 30, 2021 at 1:34 AM DT (5.9 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jackson Women's Health Organization, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sibyl C. Byrd +1 601 918 5476 attorney.sibyl.byrd@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Reproductive Health

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Parker - PHV +1 917 637 3670 +1 917 637 3666 cparker@reprorights.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Hillary Schneller - PHV +1 917 637 3777 +1 917 637 3666 hschneller@reprorights.org
TERMINATED: 09/27/2012, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jenna Gerry - PHV +1 917 637 3727 +1 917 637 3666 jgerry@reprorights.org
TERMINATED: 05/22/2014, (Inactive), PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/22/2014, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lara Rabiee - PHV +1 917 637 3697 +1 917 637 3666 lrabiee@reprorights.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Leah Wiederhorn - PHV +1 917 637 3628 +1 917 637 3666 lwiederhorn@reprorights.org
TERMINATED: 02/26/2014, PRO HAC VICE, TERMINATED: 02/26/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Nicole Pallak Movahed +1 917 637 6300 +1 917 637 3666 mmovahed@reprorights.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Julie Rikelman +1 917 637 6000 +1 917 637 3666 jrikelman@reprorights.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Reproductive Law & Policy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christine Parker - PHV +1 917 637 3670 +1 917 637 3666 cparker@reprorights.org
Space Leah Wiederhorn - PHV +1 917 637 3628 +1 917 637 3666 lwiederhorn@reprorights.org
Space Julie Rikelman +1 917 637 6000 +1 917 637 3666 jrikelman@reprorights.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Mississippi Center for Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Beth L. Orlansky +1 601 352 2269 +1 601 352 4769 borlansky@mscenterforjustice.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Beth L. Orlansky +1 601 352 2269 +1 601 352 4769 borlansky@mscenterforjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Aaron Sean Delaney +1 212 373 3000 +1 212 757 3900 adelaney@paulweiss.com
Space Aaron Sean Delaney +1 212 373 3000 +1 212 757 3900 adelaney@paulweiss.com
Space Roberto Gonzalez +1 202 223 7316 rgonzalez@paulweiss.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Roberto Gonzalez +1 202 223 7316 rgonzalez@paulweiss.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Caitlin Elizabeth Grusauskas +1 212 373 3000 +1 212 492 0573 cgrusauskas@paulweiss.com
Space Caitlin Elizabeth Grusauskas +1 212 373 3000 +1 212 492 0573 cgrusauskas@paulweiss.com
Space Claudia Leslie Hammerman +1 212 373 3321 +1 212 373 2795 chammerman@paulweiss.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Claudia Leslie Hammerman +1 212 373 3321 +1 212 373 2795 chammerman@paulweiss.com
Space Crystal M. Johnson - PHV +1 212 373 3364 +1 212 492 0364 cjohnson@paulweiss.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Crystal M. Johnson - PHV +1 212 373 3364 +1 212 492 0364 cjohnson@paulweiss.com
Space Alexia Dorothea Korberg +1 212 373 3782 +1 212 492 0782 akorberg@paulweiss.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Alexia Dorothea Korberg +1 212 373 3782 +1 212 492 0782 akorberg@paulweiss.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/22/2014, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/22/2014, PRO HAC VICE Paula Nicole Viola - PHV +1 212 373 3000 pviola@paulweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by ROBERT B. MCDUFF, ATTORNEY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacob W. Howard +1 601 969 0802 +1 602 969 0804 jake@mcdufflaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert B. McDuff +1 601 969 0802 +1 601 969 0804 rbm@mcdufflaw.com
Space Robert B. McDuff +1 601 969 0802 +1 601 969 0804 rbm@mcdufflaw.com
No Logo M.D., M.P.H., Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Reproductive Health

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Parker - PHV +1 917 637 3670 +1 917 637 3666 cparker@reprorights.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Hillary Schneller - PHV +1 917 637 3777 +1 917 637 3666 hschneller@reprorights.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Leah Wiederhorn - PHV +1 917 637 3628 +1 917 637 3666 lwiederhorn@reprorights.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Julie Rikelman +1 917 637 6000 +1 917 637 3666 jrikelman@reprorights.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Mississippi Center for Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Beth L. Orlansky +1 601 352 2269 +1 601 352 4769 borlansky@mscenterforjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Sean Delaney +1 212 373 3000 +1 212 757 3900 adelaney@paulweiss.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Roberto Gonzalez +1 202 223 7316 rgonzalez@paulweiss.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Caitlin Elizabeth Grusauskas +1 212 373 3000 +1 212 492 0573 cgrusauskas@paulweiss.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Claudia Leslie Hammerman +1 212 373 3321 +1 212 373 2795 chammerman@paulweiss.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Crystal M. Johnson - PHV +1 212 373 3364 +1 212 492 0364 cjohnson@paulweiss.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Alexia Dorothea Korberg +1 212 373 3782 +1 212 492 0782 akorberg@paulweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by ROBERT B. MCDUFF, ATTORNEY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert B. McDuff +1 601 969 0802 +1 601 969 0804 rbm@mcdufflaw.com
No Logo Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Reproductive Law & Policy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christine Parker - PHV +1 917 637 3670 +1 917 637 3666 cparker@reprorights.org
Space Hillary Schneller - PHV +1 917 637 3777 +1 917 637 3666 hschneller@reprorights.org
Space Leah Wiederhorn - PHV +1 917 637 3628 +1 917 637 3666 lwiederhorn@reprorights.org
Space Julie Rikelman +1 917 637 6000 +1 917 637 3666 jrikelman@reprorights.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Mississippi Center for Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Beth L. Orlansky +1 601 352 2269 +1 601 352 4769 borlansky@mscenterforjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aaron Sean Delaney +1 212 373 3000 +1 212 757 3900 adelaney@paulweiss.com
Space Roberto Gonzalez +1 202 223 7316 rgonzalez@paulweiss.com
Space Caitlin Elizabeth Grusauskas +1 212 373 3000 +1 212 492 0573 cgrusauskas@paulweiss.com
Space Claudia Leslie Hammerman +1 212 373 3321 +1 212 373 2795 chammerman@paulweiss.com
Space Crystal M. Johnson - PHV +1 212 373 3364 +1 212 492 0364 cjohnson@paulweiss.com
Space Alexia Dorothea Korberg +1 212 373 3782 +1 212 492 0782 akorberg@paulweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by ROBERT B. MCDUFF, ATTORNEY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert B. McDuff +1 601 969 0802 +1 601 969 0804 rbm@mcdufflaw.com
v.
No Logo Gerald A. Mumford, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Gerald A. Mumford +1 601 398 2347 +1 888 801 9389 gmumfordlaw@gmail.com
Space Pieter Teeuwissen +1 601 420 1188 +1 601 366 2292 adwoodard@bellsouth.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Pieter Teeuwissen +1 601 420 1188 +1 601 366 2292 adwoodard@bellsouth.net
No Logo Kenneth Cleveland, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Mississippi Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul E. Barnes - Government +1 601 359 4072 +1 601 359 2003 pbarn@ago.state.ms.us
Space Wilson D. Minor +1 601 359 6279 +1 601 359 2003 wmino@ago.state.ms.us
No Logo M.D., Kenneth Cleveland, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Mississippi Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Paul E. Barnes - Government +1 601 359 4072 +1 601 359 2003 pbarn@ago.state.ms.us
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wilson D. Minor +1 601 359 6279 +1 601 359 2003 wmino@ago.state.ms.us
No Logo M.D., M.P.H., Mary Currier, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Mississippi Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Paul E. Barnes - Government +1 601 359 4072 +1 601 359 2003 pbarn@ago.state.ms.us
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wilson D. Minor +1 601 359 6279 +1 601 359 2003 wmino@ago.state.ms.us
No Logo Mississippi State Board of Medical Licensure, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Mississippi Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Paul E. Barnes - Government +1 601 359 4072 +1 601 359 2003 pbarn@ago.state.ms.us
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wilson D. Minor +1 601 359 6279 +1 601 359 2003 wmino@ago.state.ms.us
Space Wilson D. Minor +1 601 359 6279 +1 601 359 2003 wmino@ago.state.ms.us
No Logo Robert Shuler Smith, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by YOUNG WELLS WILLIAMS, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert E. Sanders +1 601 948 6100 +1 601 355 6136 rsanders@youngwells.com
No Logo Thomas E. Dobbs, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Mississippi Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul E. Barnes - Government +1 601 359 4072 +1 601 359 2003 pbarn@ago.state.ms.us
Space Wilson D. Minor +1 601 359 6279 +1 601 359 2003 wmino@ago.state.ms.us
No Logo Wendy Wilson-White, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of City Attorney, Jackson MS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LaShundra B. Jackson-Winters +1 601 960 1799 +1 601 960 1756 lwinters@city.jackson.ms.us
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit Civil Rights: Other
Office Northern (Jackson)
Filed 3/19/2018
Jury Demand None
Demand
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Hinds
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case 18-60868[United States Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit]
Defendant Custody Status
Flags APPEAL,FKB,TRIAL_SET
  Entries (279) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Exclude
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Partial Summary Judgment
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: None File Excess Pages
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: None Partial Summary Judgment
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: None Exclude
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: None Notice of Receipt of Deposition
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None Notice of Service of Response to Request for Admissions
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None Notice of Service of Response to Request for Admissions
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None Notice of Service of Disclosure
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None Notice of Receipt of Deposition
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 3/13/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 3/11/2021, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 3/10/2021, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Compel
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 3/3/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 3/3/2021, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 3/2/2021, Entered: None Notice of Receipt of Deposition
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 3/2/2021, Entered: None Notice of Receipt of Deposition
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 3/1/2021, Entered: None Notice of Receipt of Deposition
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 3/1/2021, Entered: None Notice of Receipt of Deposition
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 3/1/2021, Entered: None Notice of Receipt of Deposition
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 3/1/2021, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 2/26/2021, Entered: None Notice of Receipt of Deposition
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: None Quash
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 2/17/2021, Entered: None Notice of Receipt of Deposition
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: None Notice of Service of Request for Admissions
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: None Notice of Service of Interrogatories
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 2/15/2021, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 2/11/2021, Entered: None Notice of Receipt of Deposition
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 2/11/2021, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 2/11/2021, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 2/9/2021, Entered: None Notice of Receipt of Deposition
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 2/3/2021, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 2/3/2021, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 2/3/2021, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 2/3/2021, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 1/27/2021, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 1/27/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 1/13/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 11/23/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 11/23/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: None Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: None Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 10/16/2020, Entered: None Notice of Service of Designation of Experts
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 9/25/2020, Entered: None Notice of Service of Request for Production
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 8/26/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 7/24/2020, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 5/18/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 5/15/2020, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: None Notice of Service of Designation of Experts
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 4/11/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None Copy of Opinion - USCA
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: None Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: None Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: None Notice of Service of Designation of Experts
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 118 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: 5/24/2019 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [99] Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Amended Complaint; granting [101] Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 5/24/2019. (CL) (Main Document 118 replaced on 5/24/2019) (LAT).
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: 5/23/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on May 21, 2019 before Judge Carlton W. Reeves. Court Reporter/Transcriber Candice Crane, Telephone Number : 601-608-4187. NOTICE RE : REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no Notice is filed, the transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on the court website at www.mssd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/13/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/24/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/21/2019. (CC)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: None Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 116 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: 5/21/2019 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves: Motion Hearing held on 5/21/2019 re [101] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization, [99] MOTION for Leave to File a Supplemental Amended Complaint filed by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization. The Court reserved ruling on both motions. APPEARANCES: Aaron s. Delney, Hillary Schneller, Robert B. McDuff (via telephone), and Caitlin Grusauskas (Plaintiff's counsel); Paul E. Barnes, Wilson D. Minor, Robert E. Sanders, Pieter Teeuwissen, and LaShunra B, Jackson-Winters (Defense counsel). Court Reporter/Transcriber Candice Crane, Telephone Number : 601-608-4187. (TRS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: None Copy of Opinion - USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                    DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #[116]: Document number assigned in error. There is no document attached. (LAT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: 5/20/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER addressing certain issues related to the media. The Court has received various inquiries from the media regarding access to oral argument on 5/21/2019. In an effort to accommodate those requests, and to ensure an orderly proceeding that is open to the public, the Court adopts the media plan as stated in the Order. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 5/20/2019. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit-Declaration. (CL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: 4/29/2019 Notice of Service of Interrogatories
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Delaney - PHV, Aaron)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: None USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: 4/29/2019 Notice of Service of Request for Production
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Delaney - PHV, Aaron)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: None Notice of Service of Designation of Experts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: 4/25/2019 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [99] MOTION for Leave to File a Supplemental Amended Complaint, [108] Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Delaney - PHV, Aaron)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: 4/25/2019 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [101] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , [107] Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Attachments: # (1) Supplemental Declaration of Sacheen Carr-Ellis, M.D., M.P.H.)(Delaney - PHV, Aaron)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: 4/16/2019 Joinder in Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joinder in Document by Robert Shuler Smith to [108] Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Thomas E. Dobbs, Kenneth Cleveland (Sanders, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: None Appeal In Forma Pauperis
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: 4/16/2019 Joinder in Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joinder in Document by Robert Shuler Smith to [107] Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Thomas E. Dobbs, Kenneth Cleveland (Sanders, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set Hearing as to [101] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , [99] MOTION for Leave to File a Supplemental Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5B (Jackson) Reeves before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves. (TRS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: None Notice of Service of Request for Production
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: 4/15/2019 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [99] MOTION for Leave to File a Supplemental Amended Complaint filed by Kenneth Cleveland, Thomas E. Dobbs (Minor-State Gov, Wilson)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: None Notice of Service of Interrogatories
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 107 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: 4/15/2019 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [101] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Kenneth Cleveland, Thomas E. Dobbs (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Signed Copy of S.B. 2116, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Written testimony of Dr. Kathi A. Aultman to the Ohio House Health Committee)(Barnes-State Gov, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: 4/9/2019 order on motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [105] Motion for Extension of Time to File any response or opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Amended Complaint [Doc. 99] and Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction [Doc. 101] is extended to Monday, April 15, 2019, and the deadline for Plaintiffs to file any rebuttals or replies in connection with those motions is extended to Thursday, April 25, 2019. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 4/9/19 (TRS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: 4/9/2019, Terminated: 4/9/2019 motion for extension of time to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responses to Motions to Amend and for Preliminary Injunction by Kenneth Cleveland, Thomas E. Dobbs (Barnes-State Gov, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: 4/9/2019 Order on Motion for protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AGREED ORDER granting [103] Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 4/9/19 (RBM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: 3/28/2019, Terminated: 4/9/2019 Motion for protective order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Entry of Stipulated Protective Order) by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Delaney - PHV, Aaron)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: 3/28/2019 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re [101] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Delaney - PHV, Aaron)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: 3/28/2019, Terminated: 5/24/2019 Motion for preliminary injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A: S.B. 2116, # (2) Exhibit B: Declaration of Sacheen Carr Ellis, M.D., M.P.H.)(Delaney - PHV, Aaron)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: 3/28/2019 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re [99] MOTION for Leave to File a Supplemental Amended Complaint filed by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Delaney - PHV, Aaron)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: 3/28/2019, Terminated: 5/24/2019 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File a Supplemental Amended Complaint by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A: Proposed Supplemental Amended Complaint, # (2) Exhibit B: Redline Comparison of Amended Complaint and Proposed Supplemental Amended Complaint)(Delaney - PHV, Aaron)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: 1/11/2019 Notice of Service of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures for Part 2 of Case Disclosure by Kenneth Cleveland, Thomas E. Dobbs (Minor-State Gov, Wilson)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: 1/11/2019 Notice of Service of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Service of Plaintiffs' Second Supplemental Initial Disclosure by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Delaney - PHV, Aaron)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL ACCEPTED : The Court of Appeals has accepted the Electronic Record on Appeal and it is available for attorney access and download at http://http://www.ca5.uscourts.gov/docs/default-source/forms/instructions-for-electronic-record-download-feature-of-cm.pdf using credentials provided to you by the Clerk of that Court. COUNSEL MUST HAVE AN APPEARANCE FORM ON FILE. If you have not filed it and/or have just filed it, please allow 3-5 days for processing. Requirements: Java 1.7, Adobe Acrobat Reader 11, turn off pop up blockers or add CM/ECF filing system to approved pop up settings. (LAT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: 12/18/2018 Appeal Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER RECEIVED FROM FIFTH CIRCUIT re [93] Notice of Appeal addressed to Mr. Paul Eldridge Barnes. (LAT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: 12/18/2018 Transcript Request - AppealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Kenneth Cleveland, Thomas E. Dobbs for proceedings held on 3-20-2018 before Judge HON. CARLTON W. REEVES, Court Reporter/Transcriber Cherie Bond, Telephone Number : 601-608-4186. (Barnes-State Gov, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Appeal Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Appeal Remark re [93] Notice of Appeal : TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. (LAT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Appeal Record Sent to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Electronic appeal record re [93] Notice of Appeal has been certified and transmitted for appeal purposes and waiting for acceptance from the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. Once the record has been accepted, a separate docket entry will be made notifying parties that they may then access the record via the Fifth Circuit website. (LAT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  USCA Case Number 18-60868 for [93] Notice of Appeal filed by Kenneth Cleveland, Mary Currier. (LAT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Transcript -AppealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of TRO hearing for dates of March 20, 2018 before Judge Carlton W. Reeves, re [93] Notice of Appeal Court Reporter/Transcriber Cherie Bond, Telephone Number : 601-608-4186. NOTICE RE : REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no Notice is filed, the transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on the court website at www.mssd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/7/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/17/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/18/2019. (CB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Notice of appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [89] Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by Kenneth Cleveland, Mary Currier. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0538-3877848. Appeal Record due by 1/2/2019 (Barnes-State Gov, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT (Notice of Substitution of Official Capacity Defendant) by Kenneth Cleveland, Mary Currier (Barnes-State Gov, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ONLY ORDER instructing the Clerk of the Court to substitute Thomas E. Dobbs, M.D., M.P.H., for Mary Currier, M.D., M.P.H., on the docket in accordance with [92] Defendants' Status Report. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 12/17/2018. (CL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: 12/11/2018 Case Management OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Disclosure due by 1/11/2019; Jury Trial set for a two-week term of court commencing 12/7/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5B (Jackson) Reeves before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves; Pretrial Conference set for 11/6/2020, time to be determined, in Courtroom 5B (Jackson) Reeves before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves; Discovery due by 5/29/2020; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 12/31/2018; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 12/31/2018; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 10/31/2019; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 12/2/2019; Rebuttal due 1/10/2020; Motions due by 6/29/2020; ADR Report due by 10/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 12/11/2018. (JEJ)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Appeal Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  order on motion for extension of time to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ONLY ORDER granting [90] Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Application for Attorneys' Fees and Costs in Part I of this Case. After all appeals are exhausted in Part I of this case, Plaintiffs shall have 30 days to file any application for attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 12/3/2018. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE ON THIS MOTION. (CL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: 11/30/2018, Terminated: 12/3/2018 motion for extension of time to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Application for Attorneys' Fees and Costs in Part I of This Case by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Schneller - PHV, Hillary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: 11/20/2018 Order on motion for summary judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [81] Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 11/20/2018. (CL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018 Rule 16(a)Initial OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 11/29/2018 02:45 PM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: 10/18/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER extending Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 10/18/2018. (CL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [81] MOTION for Summary Judgment (Phase I), [85] Memorandum in Opposition, filed by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Schneller - PHV, Hillary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: 9/7/2018 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re [81] MOTION for Summary Judgment (Phase I) filed by Kenneth Cleveland, Mary Currier (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - HB 1510, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Maureen Condic, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Excerpts from Depo of Dr. Carr-Ellis, # (4) Exhibit 4 - 2014 Miss. Laws ch. 506 (H.B. 1400), # (5) Exhibit 5 - (Redacted) Plaintiffs' responses to first set of interrogatories, # (6) Exhibit 6 - Bartlett article)(Barnes-State Gov, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: 8/31/2018 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [80] Motion to Modify Scheduling Order (Phase I). Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 08/31/2018. (CL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018 Rule 16(a)Initial OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2018 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: 8/24/2018 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re [81] MOTION for Summary Judgment (Phase I) filed by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Schneller - PHV, Hillary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: 8/24/2018, Terminated: 11/20/2018 Motion for summary judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment (Phase I) by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Sacheen Carr-Ellis, M.D., M.P.H., in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (Phase I), # (2) Affidavit Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Martina Badell, M.D., in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (Phase I), # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Dr. Mary Currier's Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admission to Defendants)(Schneller - PHV, Hillary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: 8/24/2018, Terminated: 8/31/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order (Phase I) by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Schneller - PHV, Hillary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: 8/17/2018 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. Sacheen Carr-Ellis by Kenneth Cleveland, Mary Currier (Minor-State Gov, Wilson)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting [78] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Caitlin Grusauskas be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of the plaintiffs in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 8/16/2018. (JEJ)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: 8/15/2018, Terminated: 8/16/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Caitlin Grusauskas to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-3784389) by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit certificate of good standing)(McDuff, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: 8/15/2018 order on motion in limineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting in part and denying in part [65] Motion in Limine. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 8/15/2018. (AC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: 8/7/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [74] Response in Opposition,, [65] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Irrelevant Opinion and Testimony of Defendants' Expert Maureen L. Condic, Ph.D. filed by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Schneller - PHV, Hillary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: 8/3/2018 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re [65] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Irrelevant Opinion and Testimony of Defendants' Expert Maureen L. Condic, Ph.D. filed by Kenneth Cleveland, Mary Currier (Barnes-State Gov, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: 8/3/2018 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response in Opposition re [65] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Irrelevant Opinion and Testimony of Defendants' Expert Maureen L. Condic, Ph.D. by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - State Defendants' Designation of Experts for Phase I & Decl. of Maureen L. Condic, Ph.D.)(Schneller - PHV, Hillary) filed by Kenneth Cleveland, Mary Currier (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Defendants' Designation of Experts with all attachments)(Barnes-State Gov, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: 7/31/2018 Notice of Service of Request for Production
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Service of Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' First Set of Request for Production by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Schneller - PHV, Hillary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: 7/31/2018 Notice of Service of Interrogatories
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Service of Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Schneller - PHV, Hillary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # [69]: This document notices service of multiple forms of discovery. Each event should be separately docketed. The same PDF document may be used for all entries. Attorney is advised to docket additional events as needed. These events are found in the electronic docketing system under Discovery Documents. (cwl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 Notice of Service of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Service of Rebuttal Expert Disclosure by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Schneller - PHV, Hillary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 Notice of Service of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Expert Disclosure by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Schneller - PHV, Hillary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Service of Plaintiffs' Responses to Document Requests and Response to Interrogatories by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Schneller - PHV, Hillary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order on Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting [67] Motion to Expedite. Response to [65] due August 3; reply due August 7. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 7/27/2018. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE ON THIS MOTION. (AC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re [67] MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion to Preclude Irrelevant Opinion and Testimony of Defendants' Expert Maureen L. Condic, Ph.D. filed by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Schneller - PHV, Hillary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018, Terminated: 7/27/2018 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion to Preclude Irrelevant Opinion and Testimony of Defendants' Expert Maureen L. Condic, Ph.D. by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Schneller - PHV, Hillary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re [65] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Irrelevant Opinion and Testimony of Defendants' Expert Maureen L. Condic, Ph.D. filed by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Schneller - PHV, Hillary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018, Terminated: 8/15/2018 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine to Preclude Irrelevant Opinion and Testimony of Defendants' Expert Maureen L. Condic, Ph.D. by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - State Defendants' Designation of Experts for Phase I & Decl. of Maureen L. Condic, Ph.D.)(Schneller - PHV, Hillary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018 Notice of Service of Response to Production
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Service of State Defendants' Phase 1 Privilege Log with Response to Request for Production by Kenneth Cleveland, Mary Currier (Minor-State Gov, Wilson)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018 Notice of Service of Response to Admisssions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Service of Dr. Kenneth Cleveland's Phase 1 Response to Request for Admissions by Kenneth Cleveland (Minor-State Gov, Wilson)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018 Notice of Service of Response to Production
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Service of Dr. Kenneth Cleveland's Phase 1 Response to Request for Production by Kenneth Cleveland (Minor-State Gov, Wilson)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018 Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Service of Dr. Kenneth Cleveland's Phase 1 Response to Interrogatories by Kenneth Cleveland (Minor-State Gov, Wilson)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018 Notice of Service of Response to Admisssions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Service of Dr. Mary Currier's Phase 1 Response to Request for Admissions by Mary Currier (Minor-State Gov, Wilson)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018 Notice of Service of Response to Production
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Service of Dr. Mary Currier's Phase 1 Response to Request for Production by Mary Currier (Minor-State Gov, Wilson)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018 Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Service of Dr. Mary Currier's Phase 1 Response to Interrogatories by Mary Currier (Minor-State Gov, Wilson)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: 7/13/2018 Notice of Service of Designation of Experts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Service of State Defendants' Phase 1 Designation of Experts by Kenneth Cleveland, Mary Currier (Minor-State Gov, Wilson)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 6/29/2018 Notice of Service of Request for Production
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Service of First Set of Phase I Request for Production by Kenneth Cleveland, Mary Currier (Minor-State Gov, Wilson)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 6/29/2018 Notice of Service of Interrogatories
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Service of First Set of Phase I Interrogatories by Kenneth Cleveland, Mary Currier (Minor-State Gov, Wilson)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: 6/20/2018 Notice of Service of Request for Admissions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Service of Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production of Documents, and Request for Admissions by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Wiederhorn - PHV, Leah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018 Notice of Service of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Service of Plaintiffs' First Supplemental Initial Disclosure by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Schneller - PHV, Hillary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018 Notice of Service of Designation of Experts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Service of Plaintiffs' Designation of Experts by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Schneller - PHV, Hillary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: 6/7/2018 Notice of Service of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Service of Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosure by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Schneller - PHV, Hillary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: 6/7/2018 Notice of Service of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Service of State Defendants' Initial Disclosures Regarding Part I of Case Disclosure by Kenneth Cleveland, Mary Currier (Minor-State Gov, Wilson)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: 5/31/2018 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to [23] Amended Complaint by Robert Shuler Smith.(Sanders, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: 5/31/2018 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to [23] Amended Complaint by Wendy Wilson-White.(Jackson-Winters-City Gov, LaShundra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: 5/29/2018 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to [23] Amended Complaint by Gerald A. Mumford.(Teeuwissen, Pieter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: 5/18/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization. Gerald A. Mumford served on 5/15/2018, answer due 6/5/2018. (McDuff, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: 5/18/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization. Wendy Wilson-White served on 5/11/2018, answer due 6/1/2018. (McDuff, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: 5/17/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER regarding Phase I of this litigation. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 5/17/2018. (cr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: 5/17/2018 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to [23] Amended Complaint by Gerald A. Mumford.(Mumford, Gerald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 Order on Motion for reconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [26] Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 5/15/2018. (cr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [16] Motion to Limit Discovery and Adopt Discovery Schedule. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 5/15/2018. (cr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization. Robert Shuler Smith served on 5/11/2018, answer due 6/1/2018. (McDuff, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DOCKET ANNOTATION as to [39]: Attorney is advised to include the correctjudge assignment of (CWR-FKB) on future filed pleadings. (LAT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: 5/7/2018 Rebuttal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Rebuttal re [26] MOTION for Reconsideration re [25] Order filed by Kenneth Cleveland, Mary Currier (Barnes-State Gov, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: 5/4/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [16] MOTION to Adopt Plaintiffs' Proposed Schedule and Limit Discovery to Exclude Legally Immaterial Issues , [33] Response in Opposition, filed by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Schneller - PHV, Hillary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DOCKET ANNOTATION as to [38]: Attorney is advised to include the correct judge assignment of CWR-FKB on future filed pleadings. (LAT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: 5/3/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued as to Gerald A. Mumford, Robert Shuler Smith, Wendy Wilson-White. (LAT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [26] MOTION for Reconsideration re [25] Order filed by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Delaney - PHV, Aaron)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re [26] MOTION for Reconsideration re [25] Order filed by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Delaney - PHV, Aaron)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: 4/27/2018 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re [16] MOTION to Adopt Plaintiffs' Proposed Schedule and Limit Discovery to Exclude Legally Immaterial Issues filed by Kenneth Cleveland, Mary Currier (Barnes-State Gov, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: 4/27/2018 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Response in Opposition re [16] MOTION to Adopt Plaintiffs' Proposed Schedule and Limit Discovery to Exclude Legally Immaterial Issues by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (McDuff, Robert) filed by Kenneth Cleveland, Mary Currier (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit H.B. 1510)(Barnes-State Gov, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: 4/27/2018 Amended Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED ANSWER to [23] Amended Complaint by Kenneth Cleveland, Mary Currier (Barnes-State Gov, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/23/2018 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to [23] Amended Complaint by Kenneth Cleveland, Mary Currier.(Barnes-State Gov, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/23/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization re [29] Corporate Disclosure Statement (Schneller - PHV, Hillary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #[29]:This document is not accompanied by acertificate of service. A certificate of service must be attached to a document [Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing, Sec. 4.A.1, Sec. 4.B, and Fed.R.Civ.P. Rule 5(d)(1)]. Attorney is directed to file a certificate as CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE and link it to the proper document. (LAT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization identifying Corporate Parent All Women's Healthcare of Jackson, Inc. for Jackson Women's Health Organization. (Schneller - PHV, Hillary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Dismissal of Defendant Mississippi State Board of Medical Licensure by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Schneller - PHV, Hillary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #[26] and #[27]: Attorney is advised to include the judge assignment of (CWR-FKB) on future filed pleadings. (LAT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: 4/16/2018 Memorandum In Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re [26] MOTION for Reconsideration re [25] Order filed by Kenneth Cleveland, Mary Currier (Barnes-State Gov, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: 4/16/2018, Terminated: 5/15/2018 Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Reconsideration re [25] Order by Kenneth Cleveland, Mary Currier (Barnes-State Gov, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting [24] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting [17] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting [18] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting [19] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting [20] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting [21] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Aaron S. Delaney, Alexia D. Korberg, Crystal Johnson, Roberto J. Gonzalez, Leah Wiederhorn and Claudia L. Hammerman be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of the plaintiffs in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 4/16/2018 (JEJ)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: 4/11/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER extending TRO and separating claims in this case. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 4/11/2018. (cr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves: Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/11/2018. Participants: Hillary Schneller, Robert B. McDuff, Paul E. Barnes and Wilson D. Minor. Preliminary Injunction hearing set for 9/24/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 5B (Jackson) before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves. (JS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018, Terminated: 4/16/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Claudia L. Hammerman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-3679443) by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(McDuff, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jackson Women's Health Organization, Sacheen Carr-Ellis.(Schneller - PHV, Hillary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: 4/6/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Beth L. Orlansky on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Orlansky, Beth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: 4/5/2018, Terminated: 4/16/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leah Wiederhorn to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-3677030) by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(McDuff, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: 4/4/2018, Terminated: 4/16/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Roberto J. Gonzalez to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-3676732) by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(McDuff, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: 4/4/2018, Terminated: 4/16/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Crystal Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-3676680) by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(McDuff, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: 4/4/2018, Terminated: 4/16/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Alexia D. Korberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-3676664) by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing)(McDuff, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: 4/4/2018, Terminated: 4/16/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Aaron S. Delaney to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-3676647) by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(McDuff, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting [10] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting [11] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting [12] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Julie Rikelman, Hillary Schneller and Christine Parker be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of the plaintiff in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 3/29/2018. (JEJ)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: 3/26/2018, Terminated: 5/15/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Adopt Plaintiffs' Proposed Schedule and Limit Discovery to Exclude Legally Immaterial Issues by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (McDuff, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  scheduling conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves: Scheduling Conference held on 3/21/2018. Participants: Robert B. McDuff, Hillary Schnellar, Christine Parker, Paul E. Barnes and Wilson D. Minor; with Leah Wiederhorn joining in the call with Plaintiff's counsel. Scheduling Conference continued until 3/27/2018 at 12:30 PM (CST) before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves. (JS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: 3/20/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jackson Women's Health Organization, Sacheen Carr-Ellis. Kenneth Cleveland served on 3/19/2018, answer due 4/9/2018. (McDuff, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: 3/20/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jackson Women's Health Organization, Sacheen Carr-Ellis. Mississippi State Board of Medical Licensure served on 3/19/2018, answer due 4/9/2018. (McDuff, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: 3/20/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jackson Women's Health Organization, Sacheen Carr-Ellis. Mary Currier served on 3/19/2018, answer due 4/9/2018. (McDuff, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: 3/20/2018, Terminated: 3/29/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Christine Parker to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-3665126) by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing)(McDuff, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: 3/20/2018, Terminated: 3/29/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Hillary Schneller to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-3665104) by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit - A Certificate of Good Standing)(McDuff, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: 3/20/2018, Terminated: 3/29/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Julie Rikelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-3665084) by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(McDuff, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: 3/20/2018 Order on Motion for TROCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [5] Motion for TRO. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 3/20/2018. (AC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: 3/20/2018 ExhibitCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DEFENDANTS' Exhibit List for Motion hearing held on 3/20/2018 before Judge Reeves. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit D-1 House Bill 1510, # (2) Errata D-2 Article)(JS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: 3/20/2018 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re [5] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (McDuff, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves: Motion Hearing held on 3/20/2018 re [5] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Sacheen Carr-Ellis and Jackson Women's Health Organization. Appearances: Paul E. Barnes and Wilson D. Minor; Robert B. McDuff participated via telephone with Hillary Schneller and Christine Parker. Court heard arguments from both parties and took the matter under advisement to rule later. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cherie Bond, Telephone Number : 601-608-4186. (JS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # [6] Incorrect event chosen. Attorney is directed to refile using the correct event Memorandum in Support which is located under the category Responses and Replies. Motion [6] termed. (cwl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018, Terminated: 3/20/2018 Motion for TRO
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY. MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Memorandum in Support by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (McDuff, Robert) Modified on 3/20/2018 (cwl).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018, Terminated: 3/20/2018 Motion for TRO
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Sacheen Carr-Ellis, Jackson Women's Health Organization (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Dr. Carr-Ellis)(McDuff, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Paul E. Barnes-State Gov on behalf of All Defendants (Barnes-State Gov, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Wilson D. Minor-State Gov on behalf of All Defendants (Minor-State Gov, Wilson)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons Issued as to Kenneth Cleveland, Mary Currier, Mississippi State Board of Medical Licensure. (LAT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against Kenneth Cleveland, Mary Currier, Mississippi State Board of Medical Licensure ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34643049387), filed by Jackson Women's Health Organization, Sacheen Carr-Ellis. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit House Bill No. 1510 (As Sent to Governor), # (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Hearings as to [5] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2018 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6B (Jackson Federal Courthouse) before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves. (AC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Appeal Record Sent to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Appeal Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TEXT ONLY ORDER instructing the Clerk of the Court to substitute Thomas E. Dobbs, M.D., M.P.H., for Mary Currier, M.D., M.P.H., on the docket in accordance with 92 Defendants' Status Report. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 12/17/2018. (CL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Telephonic Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 11/29/2018 in Jackson, MS. Appearing: Thomas Dobbs, Aaron Delaney, Robert McDuff, Caitlin Grusauskas, Paul Barnes, Wilson Minor, Robert Sanders, Pieter Teeuwissen and LaShundra Jackson-Winters. (JEJ)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 90 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Application for Attorneys' Fees and Costs in Part I of this Case. After all appeals are exhausted in Part I of this case, Plaintiffs shall have 30 days to file any application for attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 12/3/2018. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE ON THIS MOTION. (CL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT-ONLY ORDER cancelling the telephonic case management conference set for October 26, 2018. This conference will be reset at a later date. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 10/22/2018. (JEJ)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 8/16/2018 in Jackson, MS. Appearing: Caitlin Grusauskas, Aaron Delaney, Hillary Schneller, Rob McDuff, Paul Barnes, Wilson Minor, Bob Sanders, Pieter Teeuwissen and LaShundra Jackson-Winters. (JEJ)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 78 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Caitlin Grusauskas be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of the plaintiffs in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 8/16/2018. (JEJ)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 69 : This document notices service of multiple forms of discovery. Each event should be separately docketed. The same PDF document may be used for all entries. Attorney is advised to docket additional events as needed. These events are found in the electronic docketing system under Discovery Documents. (cwl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 67 Motion to Expedite. Response to 65 due August 3; reply due August 7. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 7/27/2018. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE ON THIS MOTION. (AC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/16/2018 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. Counsel for the plaintiffs shall set up the conference and contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DOCKET ANNOTATION as to 39 : Attorney is advised to include the correctjudge assignment of (CWR-FKB) on future filed pleadings. (LAT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DOCKET ANNOTATION as to 38 : Attorney is advised to include the correct judge assignment of CWR-FKB on future filed pleadings. (LAT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 29 :This document is not accompanied by acertificate of service. A certificate of service must be attached to a document [Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing, Sec. 4.A.1, Sec. 4.B, and Fed.R.Civ.P. Rule 5(d)(1)]. Attorney is directed to file a certificate as CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE and link it to the proper document. (LAT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 26 and # 27 : Attorney is advised to include the judge assignment of (CWR-FKB) on future filed pleadings. (LAT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Aaron S. Delaney, Alexia D. Korberg, Crystal Johnson, Roberto J. Gonzalez, Leah Wiederhorn and Claudia L. Hammerman be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of the plaintiffs in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 4/16/2018 (JEJ)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/11/2018 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves. Only one counsel for each party is required to participate. Call-In information has been emailed to counsel of record. (JS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves: Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/11/2018. Participants: Hillary Schneller, Robert B. McDuff, Paul E. Barnes and Wilson D. Minor. Preliminary Injunction hearing set for 9/24/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 5B (Jackson) before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves. (JS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Julie Rikelman, Hillary Schneller and Christine Parker be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of the plaintiff in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 3/29/2018. (JEJ)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT-ONLY ORDER extending the temporary restraining order at Docket No. 9 by 14 days to Friday, April 13, 2018, pursuant to a showing of good cause as required under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 3/28/2018. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. (cr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 3/27/2018. Participants: Robert B. McDuff, Paul E. Barnes and Wilson D. Minor with Hillary Schneller also participating. (JS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves: Scheduling Conference held on 3/21/2018. Participants: Robert B. McDuff, Hillary Schnellar, Christine Parker, Paul E. Barnes and Wilson D. Minor; with Leah Wiederhorn joining in the call with Plaintiff's counsel. Scheduling Conference continued until 3/27/2018 at 12:30 PM (CST) before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves. (JS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 6 Incorrect event chosen. Attorney is directed to refile using the correct event Memorandum in Support which is located under the category Responses and Replies. Motion 6 termed. (cwl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves: Motion Hearing held on 3/20/2018 re 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Sacheen Carr-Ellis and Jackson Women's Health Organization. Appearances: Paul E. Barnes and Wilson D. Minor; Robert B. McDuff participated via telephone with Hillary Schneller and Christine Parker. Court heard arguments from both parties and took the matter under advisement to rule later. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cherie Bond, Telephone Number : 601-608-4186. (JS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/21/2018 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves. (AC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/21/2018 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves. (AC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Hearings as to 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2018 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6B (Jackson Federal Courthouse) before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves. (AC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 37 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?