Faith International Adoptions v. Pompeo
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-00731
District Judge Ronald B. Leighton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 23, 2018 at 11:18 PM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Adopt Abroad Incorporated, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert M McKenna +1 206 839 4300 rmckenna@orrick.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Nolan Tabor +1 202 763 1758 atabor@orrick.com
No Logo Amazing Grace Adoptions, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert M McKenna +1 206 839 4300 rmckenna@orrick.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Nolan Tabor +1 202 763 1758 atabor@orrick.com
No Logo Faith International Adoptions, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert M McKenna +1 206 839 4300 rmckenna@orrick.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Nolan Tabor +1 202 763 1758 atabor@orrick.com
v.
No Logo Carl C. Risch, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/28/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 06/28/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 06/28/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 06/28/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah K Morehead +1 206 553 2257 sarah.morehead@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anjali Motgi +1 202 305 0879 +1 202 616 8470 anjali.motgi@usdoj.gov
No Logo Council on Accreditation for Children and Family Services Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by CALFO EAKES & OSTROVSKY, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Damon Clay Elder +1 206 294 7414 +1 206 623 8717 damone@calfoeakes.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew R. W. Hughes +1 206 294 7380 +1 206 623 8717 andrewh@calfoeakes.com
Pompeo, Michael Richard Pompeo, Michael Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael R. Pompeo"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/28/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 06/28/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 06/28/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 06/28/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah K Morehead +1 206 553 2257 sarah.morehead@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anjali Motgi +1 202 305 0879 +1 202 616 8470 anjali.motgi@usdoj.gov
No Logo Theodore R. Coley, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Theodore R. Coley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theodore R. Coley

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/28/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 06/28/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 06/28/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 06/28/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah K Morehead +1 206 553 2257 sarah.morehead@usdoj.gov
United States Department of State United States Department of State, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/28/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 06/28/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 06/28/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 06/28/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah K Morehead +1 206 553 2257 sarah.morehead@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anjali Motgi +1 202 305 0879 +1 202 616 8470 anjali.motgi@usdoj.gov
No Logo National Council For Adoption, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Andrew Castanias +1 202 879 3939 +1 202 626 1700 gcastanias@jonesday.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Yarmuth Wilsdon PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Diana S Breaux +1 206 516 3820 dbreaux@yarmuth.com
No Logo The Child Advocacy Program at Harvard Law School, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Andrew Castanias +1 202 879 3939 +1 202 626 1700 gcastanias@jonesday.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Yarmuth Wilsdon PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Diana S Breaux +1 206 516 3820 dbreaux@yarmuth.com
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 702
Nature of Suit 899 - Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
  Entries (62) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING Due to the Court's unavailability, the 10/2/18 Motion Hearing is RESET for 10/26/2018 at 01:30 PM.(DK) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
    REPLY, filed by Defendant United States Department of State, TO RESPONSE to 50 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM on Behalf of Government Defendants (Motgi, Anjali) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None appendix
      APPENDIX re 59 Response to Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Adopt Abroad Incorporated, Amazing Grace Adoptions, Faith International Adoptions (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
        RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Adopt Abroad Incorporated, Amazing Grace Adoptions, Faith International Adoptions, to 50 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM on Behalf of Government Defendants. (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to telephonic stipulation by the parties, Oral Argument on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction [Dkt.# 20] and Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. #50] is rescheduled for Tuesday, October 2, 2018 at 9:30am in Courtroom B. Plaintiffs' opposition brief to the Motion to Dismiss is due on September 14, 2018, and Defendant's Reply brief is due on September 24, 2018. Entered as directed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DK) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING Pursuant to the stipulated request of the parties, the 9/11/18 Motion Hearing is RESET for 10/2/2018 at 09:30 AM.(DK) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Court Filing
              MINUTE ORDER setting oral argument; as directed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Request
                REQUEST for Oral Argument on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Defendant United States Department of State (Motgi, Anjali) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                  REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Adopt Abroad Incorporated, Amazing Grace Adoptions, Faith International Adoptions, TO 46 RESPONSE to 20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (McKenna, Robert) Modified on 8/20/2018 to add document relationship (SP). (Entered: 08/17/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER on STIPULATION re 48 Stipulation filed by Council on Accreditation for Children and Family Services Inc, ORDER DISMISSING PARTY Defendant Council on Accreditation for Children and Family Services, Inc. (ONLY) with prejudice; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                      EXHIBIT Exhibis I, R, X to Olson Declaration by Defendant United States Department of State (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I, # 2 Exhibit R, # 3 Exhibit X)(Motgi, Anjali) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                        RESPONSE, by Defendant United States Department of State, to 20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kjersti Olson, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit S, # 19 Exhibit T, # 20 Exhibit U, # 21 Exhibit V, # 22 Exhibit W, # 23 Exhibit Y)(Motgi, Anjali) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                          MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM on Behalf of Government Defendants, filed by Defendant United States Department of State. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/31/2018, (Motgi, Anjali) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Errata
                            ERRATA re 48 Stipulation with Noting Date by Defendant Council on Accreditation for Children and Family Services Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Stipulation)(Elder, Damon) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None stipulation
                              STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER and Notice of Dismissal of Defendant COA by parties (Elder, Damon) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                DECLARATION of Jayne Schmidt filed by Defendant Council on Accreditation for Children and Family Services Inc re 20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Elder, Damon) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                  RESPONSE, by Defendant Council on Accreditation for Children and Family Services Inc, to 20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Elder, Damon) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    MINUTE ORDER 20 Plaintiffs' MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is RE-NOTED for Friday, August 17, 2018. Defendants' RESPONSE is due Wednesday, August 8, 2018. Plaintiffs' REPLY is due August 17, 2018. Entered as directed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (TC) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      MINUTE ORDER 42 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction; due to a clerical error, the Order Granting Preliminary Injunction was prematurely filed; Order 42 will be retracted and the Motion for Preliminary Injunction will be re-noted for 8/8/18; as directed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        MINUTE ORDER re 42 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction; the Clerk of the Court is instructed to accept the $1, in cash, to satisfy the bond requirement of Rule 65(c); as directed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting 20 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. Modified on 7/24/2018 (DN). Order filed prematurely, Order stricken and Motion reopened and re-noted for 8/8/18. (Entered: 07/23/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER on STIPULATION re 40 Stipulation filed by Council on Accreditation for Children and Family Services Inc. for extension of time to answer and respond to Preliminary Injunction, answer due 8/8/2018; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None stipulation
                                              STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Re Deadline for Def. COA to Respond to Complaint and Pltfs' Mtn. for Prelim. Injunction by parties (Elder, Damon) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Council on Accreditation for Children and Family Services Inc (Elder, Damon) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for extension of time to answerCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting 28 Government Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and Respond to Preliminary Injunction to 8/8/2018; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by The Child Advocacy Program at Harvard Law School (Breaux, Diana) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by National Council For Adoption (Breaux, Diana) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Praecipe-Other
                                                        PRAECIPE to Substitute Corrected Amicus Curiae Brief (Dkt. #32-1) by Amicus Parties National Council For Adoption, The Child Advocacy Program at Harvard Law School (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Corrected Amicus Curiae Brief)(Breaux, Diana) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for leaveCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER granting 32 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            ORDER re 31 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Gregory A Castanias for Amicus Parties National Council For Adoption, and The Child Advocacy Program at Harvard Law School, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Leave
                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief, filed by Amicus Parties National Council For Adoption, The Child Advocacy Program at Harvard Law School. (Attachments: # 1 Amicus Curiae Brief, # 2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/6/2018, (Breaux, Diana) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Gregory A. Castanias FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Amicus Parties National Council For Adoption, The Child Advocacy Program at Harvard Law School (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5376851 (Breaux, Diana) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Diana S Breaux on behalf of Amicus Parties National Council For Adoption, The Child Advocacy Program at Harvard Law School. (Breaux, Diana) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel
                                                                    NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Sarah K Morehead for Defendants Theodore R. Coley, Michael R. Pompeo, Carl C. Risch, United States Department of State. (Morehead, Sarah) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint and to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Defendants Michael R. Pompeo, Carl C. Risch, United States Department of State. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/6/2018, (Motgi, Anjali) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Anjali Motgi on behalf of Defendants Michael R. Pompeo, Carl C. Risch, United States Department of State. (Motgi, Anjali) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Notice of Motion Re-Noted
                                                                          NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: 20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Filed by Plaintiffs Adopt Abroad Incorporated, Amazing Grace Adoptions, Faith International Adoptions. Noting Date 7/13/2018, (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                            DECLARATION of Corey Garrett filed by Plaintiffs Adopt Abroad Incorporated, Amazing Grace Adoptions, Faith International Adoptions re 20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                              DECLARATION of Charles Tutterrow filed by Plaintiffs Adopt Abroad Incorporated, Amazing Grace Adoptions, Faith International Adoptions re 20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                DECLARATION of Donnas B. Kinton filed by Plaintiffs Adopt Abroad Incorporated, Amazing Grace Adoptions, Faith International Adoptions re 20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                  DECLARATION of Carol L. Kinley-Albers filed by Plaintiffs Adopt Abroad Incorporated, Amazing Grace Adoptions, Faith International Adoptions re 20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                    DECLARATION of John J. Meske filed by Plaintiffs Adopt Abroad Incorporated, Amazing Grace Adoptions, Faith International Adoptions re 20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                      MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiffs Adopt Abroad Incorporated, Amazing Grace Adoptions, Faith International Adoptions. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/6/2018, (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER on STIPULATION re 18 Stipulation re response to Complaint filed by Council on Accreditation for Children and Family Services Inc; Council on Accreditation for Children and Family Services Inc answer due 7/23/2018; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None stipulation
                                                                                          STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Re the Deadline for Def COA to Respond to the Complaint by parties (Elder, Damon) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Damon Clay Elder on behalf of Defendant Council on Accreditation for Children and Family Services Inc. (Elder, Damon) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint
                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Council on Accreditation for Children and Family Services, Inc. on 6/1/2018, filed by Plaintiffs Adopt Abroad Incorporated, Amazing Grace Adoptions, Faith International Adoptions. (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sarah K Morehead on behalf of Defendants Theodore R. Coley, Michael R. Pompeo, Carl C. Risch, United States Department of State. (Morehead, Sarah) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER transferring case to the Honorable Ronald B Leighton. All future pleadings shall bear the cause number C18-731 RBL. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)Cc to RBL. (Entered: 06/01/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint
                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on United States Department of State on 5/23/2018, filed by Plaintiffs Adopt Abroad Incorporated, Amazing Grace Adoptions, Faith International Adoptions. (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint
                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Theodore R. Coley, in his official capacity on 5/23/2018, filed by Plaintiffs Adopt Abroad Incorporated, Amazing Grace Adoptions, Faith International Adoptions. (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint
                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Michael R. Pompeo, in his official capacity on 5/23/2018, filed by Plaintiffs Adopt Abroad Incorporated, Amazing Grace Adoptions, Faith International Adoptions. (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint
                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Carl C. Risch, in his official capacity on 5/23/2018, filed by Plaintiffs Adopt Abroad Incorporated, Amazing Grace Adoptions, Faith International Adoptions. (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Praecipe for a Summons
                                                                                                            PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to the US Department of State by Plaintiffs Adopt Abroad Incorporated, Amazing Grace Adoptions, Faith International Adoptions (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Praecipe for a Summons
                                                                                                              PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Carl C. Risch, in his official capacity by Plaintiffs Adopt Abroad Incorporated, Amazing Grace Adoptions, Faith International Adoptions (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Praecipe for a Summons
                                                                                                                PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Michael R. Pompeo, in his official capacity by Plaintiffs Adopt Abroad Incorporated, Amazing Grace Adoptions, Faith International Adoptions (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Praecipe for a Summons
                                                                                                                  PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Theodore R. Coley, in his official capacity by Plaintiffs Adopt Abroad Incorporated, Amazing Grace Adoptions, Faith International Adoptions (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                                                                                                                    Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Council on Accreditation for Children and Family Services Inc (SWT) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                                                                                                                      Summons(es) electronically issued as to defendant(s) Theodore R. Coley, Michael R. Pompeo, Carl C. Risch, United States Department of State (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(DJ). Modified on 5/21/2018 (DJ). (Entered: 05/21/2018)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Praecipe for a Summons
                                                                                                                        PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS for Defendants by Plaintiffs Adopt Abroad Incorporated, Amazing Grace Adoptions, Faith International Adoptions (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Adopt Abroad Incorporated, Amazing Grace Adoptions, Faith International Adoptions (McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5325092) Attorney Robert M McKenna added to party Adopt Abroad Incorporated(pty:pla), Attorney Robert M McKenna added to party Amazing Grace Adoptions(pty:pla), Attorney Robert M McKenna added to party Faith International Adoptions(pty:pla), filed by Faith International Adoptions, Adopt Abroad Incorporated, Amazing Grace Adoptions. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McKenna, Robert) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 23 times.

                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?