Genmar Holdings Inc, et al v. Schultz
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:01-cv-00639-JRT-RLE

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Genmar Holdings, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Briggs & Morgan PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James J Long +1 612 977 8400 +1 612 977 8650 jlong@briggs.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Medtronic, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Janice M Symchych +1 763 505 2020 +1 763 514 4879 jan.m.symchych@medtronic.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin M Magnuson +1 612 349 8242 +1 612 339 4181 kmmagnuson@rkmc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by uhc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mitchell W Granberg +1 763 797 7123 +1 763 797 7142 mitch_granberg@uhc.com
No Logo Genmar Industries, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Briggs & Morgan PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James J Long +1 612 977 8400 +1 612 977 8650 jlong@briggs.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Medtronic, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Janice M Symchych +1 763 505 2020 +1 763 514 4879 jan.m.symchych@medtronic.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin M Magnuson +1 612 349 8242 +1 612 339 4181 kmmagnuson@rkmc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by uhc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mitchell W Granberg +1 763 797 7123 +1 763 797 7142 mitch_granberg@uhc.com
No Logo Lund Boats, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Briggs & Morgan PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James J Long +1 612 977 8400 +1 612 977 8650 jlong@briggs.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Medtronic, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Janice M Symchych +1 763 505 2020 +1 763 514 4879 jan.m.symchych@medtronic.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin M Magnuson +1 612 349 8242 +1 612 339 4181 kmmagnuson@rkmc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by uhc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mitchell W Granberg +1 763 797 7123 +1 763 797 7142 mitch_granberg@uhc.com
v.
No Logo Gary Duane Schultz, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew M Luger +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 aluger@gr-espel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McLaughlin & Stern, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William P Hefner +1 612 623 2362 +1 612 378 3737 whefner@envirolawgroup.com
Office DMN
Filed 4/12/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause Section 18 U.S.C. § 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Hennepin
Terminated 8/29/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 6DIV, BOND, CLOSED
  Entries (70) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 70 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: 3/3/2005 Letter re: withdrawal of motion
Letter re: withdrawal of motion re [55] MOTION for contempt and Sanctions. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Magnuson, Kevin)
    LREF
    Legal Document 69 Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: 3/2/2005, Terminated: 3/2/2005 Motion to Withdraw
    **DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - INCORRECT EVENT CODE. WILL RE-FILE** MOTION to Withdraw [55] MOTION for contempt and Sanctions by Genmar Holdings Inc, Genmar Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Magnuson, Kevin) Modified on 3/3/2005 (JLB).
      LREF
      Legal Document 68 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 Motion HearingCourt Filing
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John R Tunheim: Motion Hearing held on January 27, 2005 re [55] MOTION for contempt and Sanctions filed by Genmar Holdings Inc. Written Order to follow. (Court Reporter Kristine Mousseau) (SEB) Modified TEXT on 2/7/2005 (DFL).
        LREF
        Legal Document 67 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: 11/17/2004 Certificate Of Service.
        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gary Duane Schultz re [65] Letter to Clerk's Office, [66] Affidavit in Opposition to Motion [specifically named Affidavit of Barbara Schultz, including Exhibits A-C] (Hefner, William)
          LREF
          Legal Document 66 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: 11/17/2004 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
          AFFIDAVIT of Barbara Schultz in OPPOSITION TO [55] MOTION for contempt and Sanctions filed by Gary Duane Schultz. (Attachments: # (1)Exhibit Index and Exhibits)(Hefner, William) Modified text on 11/18/2004 (DFL).
            LREF
            Legal Document 65 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: 11/17/2004 Letter to Clerk's Office
            LETTER TO CLERK'S OFFICE from William P. Hefner accompanying Affidavit of Barbara Schultz which constitutes Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Contempt and for Sanctions. (Hefner, William)
              LREF
              Legal Document 64 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/4/2004 Letter re: withdrawal of motionCourt Filing
              Letter re: withdrawal of document re [60] MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney from WILLIAM P. HEFNER TO JUDGE ERICKSON WITHDRAWING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL [Doc. #60]. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service of William P. Hefner's Letter to Judge Erickson Withdrawing Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel [Re: Doc. #60])(Hefner, William)
                LREF
                Legal Document 63 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: 7/20/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gary Duane Schultz re [60] MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, [61] Notice of Hearing on Motion, [62] Memorandum in Support of Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (Hefner, William)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 62 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: 7/20/2004 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                  MEMORANDUM in Support re [60] MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Gary Duane Schultz. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - B)(Hefner, William)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 61 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: 7/20/2004 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                    NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [60] MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney: Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2004 02:30 PM in Duluth - Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Raymond L Erickson. (Hefner, William)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 60 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: 7/20/2004, Terminated: 8/5/2004 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                      MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Gary Duane Schultz. (Hefner, William)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 59 Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Genmar Holdings Inc (Magnuson, Kevin)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 58 Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                          AFFIDAVIT of Kevin M. Magnuson in SUPPORT OF [55] MOTION for contempt and Sanctions filed by Genmar Holdings Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, B, C, D, E, F, G, H)(Magnuson, Kevin)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 57 Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                            MEMORANDUM in Support re [55] MOTION for contempt and Sanctions filed by Genmar Holdings Inc. (Magnuson, Kevin)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 56 Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                              AFFIDAVIT of James J. Long in SUPPORT OF [55] MOTION for contempt and Sanctions filed by Genmar Holdings Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, B# (2) Exhibit C, D, E, F)(Magnuson, Kevin)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 55 Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004, Terminated: 3/3/2005 Motion for Contempt
                              MOTION for contempt and Sanctions by Genmar Holdings Inc. (Magnuson, Kevin)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 54 Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Genmar Holdings Inc (Magnuson, Kevin)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 53 Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004 Partial Satisfaction of Judgment
                                  PARTIAL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re [33] Order, as to Motion to Enforce Settlement by Genmar Holdings Inc, Genmar Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, B)(Magnuson, Kevin)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 52 Filed: 9/18/2003, Entered: 9/25/2003 Response
                                  LETTER RESPONSE by plaintiffs to affidavit [51-1] 7pg(s) (GJS)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 50 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Order
                                    JUDGMENT entered. 1pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 49 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER ( Judge John R. Tunheim / 8/28/03) granting motion to enforce settlement [45-1]; defendant is to deliver an executed warranty deed to plaintiffs' counsel within five business days of entry of this order and is to pay the attorneys fees and costs of bringing this motion. termination notice 2+pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 51 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Affidavit
                                        AFFIDAVIT of Barbara A. Schultz requesting an extension of time of 45 days to resolve the CIT lien. 4pg(s) (DFL)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 48 Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER ( Judge John R. Tunheim / 8/5/03) that the parties have not successfully settled this case; therefore, defendant has until 8/25/03 to file papers in response to plaintiff's motion to enforce the settlement; if a response is not received by 8/25/03, the court will enter an order enforcing the settlement agreement. 1pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 47 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 Affidavit
                                            AFFIDAVIT of James J. Long regarding motion to enforce settlement [45-1] 73pg(s) (GJS)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 46 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                              MEMORANDUM in support of motion to enforce settlement [45-1] 6pg(s) (GJS)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 45 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003, Terminated: 8/29/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                MOTION by plaintiffs to enforce settlement (to Judge John R. Tunheim ) 3pg(s) (GJS)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 4/1/2002, Entered: 4/4/2002 Transcript (Conventional)Court Filing
                                                  TRANSCRIPT OF settlement hearing held 1/25/02 before Judge John R. Tunheim ( Grufman, Karen J.) (SEPARATE) (DFL)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 43 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: 3/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Judge John R. Tunheim ) vacating order for attachment and directing transfer of investment accounts 4+pg(s)(cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 42 Filed: 3/19/2002, Entered: 3/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Judge John R. Tunheim ) directing transfer of apartment investment 2pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 41 Filed: 3/19/2002, Entered: 3/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Judge John R. Tunheim ) vacating order for attachment and directing transfer of real property 4pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 40 Filed: 2/7/2002, Entered: 2/13/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Judge John R. Tunheim ) vacating order for attachment and directing transfer of coins 3pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 39 Filed: 2/7/2002, Entered: 2/13/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Judge John R. Tunheim ) vacating order for attachment and directing transfer of funds in trust account 3pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 38 Filed: 2/7/2002, Entered: 2/13/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Judge John R. Tunheim ) vacating order for attachment and directing transfer of cash 3pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 37 Filed: 2/7/2002, Entered: 2/13/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Judge John R. Tunheim ) vacating order for attachment and directing transfer of investment accounts 4+pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 36 Filed: 2/7/2002, Entered: 2/13/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Judge John R. Tunheim ) vacating [10-1] order of attachment and directing transfer of real property 4pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 35 Filed: 2/7/2002, Entered: 2/13/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Judge John R. Tunheim ) vacating order for attachment and directing transfer of bank accounts 5pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 2/7/2002, Entered: 2/13/2002 Order
                                                                      JUDGMENT entered 1pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 33 Filed: 2/7/2002, Entered: 2/13/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND ORDER ( Judge John R. Tunheim / 2/7/02) that judgment be entered against the defendant in the amount of $13,501,249.15; this court shall retain jurisdiction over this matter until such time as the judgment is satisfied and shall from time to time consider such matters as are necessary to enforce the settlement agreement and confession of judgment 2+pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 1/30/2002, Entered: 2/11/2002 Letter
                                                                          LETTER to court from defendant's atty Steven Peloquin dated 1/25/02 re: To withdraw as counsel of record irreconcilable conflict of interest. 1pg (JMH)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 1/25/2002, Entered: 1/28/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                            MINUTES: ( Judge John R. Tunheim / Grufman, Karen J.) explanatory settlement hearing held 1pg(s) (DFL) Modified on 02/12/2002
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 30 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: 1/24/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER ( Judge John R. Tunheim / 1/22/02) that this court will maintain continued jurisdiction throughout the term of the settlement agreement; defendant need not respond to the complaint 1pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 29 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Judge John R. Tunheim ) that Schultz has to and including 1/11/02 to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint 2pg(s)(cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 28 Filed: 12/18/2001, Entered: 12/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Judge John R. Tunheim ) that defendant has to and including 1/4/02 to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint 2pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 27 Filed: 11/23/2001, Entered: 11/28/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Judge John R. Tunheim ) that defendant Schultz has to and including 11/30/01 to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint 2pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 26 Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: 11/13/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT (Judge John R. Tunheim / 11/13/01) Deft Gary Duane Schultz shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before 11/16/01 2pg(s)(cc: all counsel) (SEA)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 10/22/2001, Entered: 10/24/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Judge John R. Tunheim ) that defendant has to and including 11/5/01 to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint 2pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 24 Filed: 10/4/2001, Entered: 10/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Judge John R. Tunheim ) that defendant has to and including 10/5/01 to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint 2pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 23 Filed: 9/12/2001, Entered: 9/14/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Judge John R. Tunheim ) that defendant has to and including 9/28/01 to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint 2pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 22 Filed: 8/21/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Judge John R. Tunheim ) that defendant has to and including 9/7/01 to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint 2pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: 8/3/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT ( Judge John R. Tunheim ) that Deft G. Schultz shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before 8/16/1. (2pg(s)(cc: all counsel) (DDB)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                  Legal Document 20 Filed: 7/25/2001, Entered: 7/29/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Judge John R. Tunheim )that defendant has to and including 7/27/01 to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint 2pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 19 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Judge John R. Tunheim ) that defendant has to and including 7/20/01 to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint 2pg(s)(cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/2/2001, Entered: 7/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Judge John R. Tunheim ) that defendand has to and including 7/16/01 to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint 2pg(s)(cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Judge John R. Tunheim ) that defendant has to and including 6/30/01 to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint 2pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/1/2001, Entered: 5/2/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Judge John R. Tunheim ) that defendant has to and including 5/21/01 to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint 2pg(s)(cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 4/26/2001, Entered: 4/30/2001 Letter
                                                                                                            LETTER from Peloquin & Minge law office with signature page of Kirsten Schultz to her affidavit attached 2pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 4/24/2001, Entered: 4/26/2001 MOTION - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                              STIPULATED APPLICATION by pltfs & deft for a supplemental attachment order(to Judge James M. Rosenbaum ) (2pg(s) (DDB) Modified on 04/26/2001
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/23/2001, Entered: 4/24/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER FOR ATTACHMENT ( Judge James M. Rosenbaum / 4/23/01) 3pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 4/23/2001, Entered: 4/24/2001 MOTION - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  STIPULATED APPLICATION for supplemental attachment ( to Judge James M. Rosenbaum ) 2pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 4/19/2001, Entered: 4/20/2001 Bond
                                                                                                                    ATTACHMENT BOND in amount of $ 50,000 Continential Casualty Co. Bond No. 929200915 filed by plaintiffs 4pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER FOR ATTACHMENT ( Judge James M. Rosenbaum / 4/17/01) granting application for preliminary attachment order [2-1]; defendant Schultz may not transfer, sell, or otherwise dispose of personal and real property; upon receipt of a copy of this order, any institution into which funds belonging to plaintiffs have been transferred into accounts at the institution are hereby driected to freeze all funds in said accounts until further notice; plaintiffs are directed to serve copies of the order on the institutions; plaintiffs will designate a qualfied CPA who shall have authority to monitor accounts; plaintiffs are granted leave to take deposition of defendant Gary Schultz; plaintiffs will post an attachment bond in the amount of $50,000, or deposit cash, a letter of credit, a cashiers check, or a certified check for the same amount upon filing of this order; defendant may post a bond in the amount of $12 million in lieu of attachment of his property; this order shall continue until final judgment is entered 3pg(s) - 20 pgs with exhibits (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 4/16/2001, Entered: 4/17/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        MINUTES:( Judge James M. Rosenbaum / Tim Willette) Application for preliminary attachment (Doc #2) - The parties have agreed & will forward to the Court a proposed order on 4/16/1. (1pg(s) (DDB)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 4/16/2001, Entered: 4/16/2001 Affidavit
                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Kirstin Schultz regarding application for preliminary attachment order [2-1] 4+pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 4/16/2001, Entered: 4/16/2001 Affidavit
                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Barbara Schultz regarding application motion for preliminary attachment order [2-1] 8pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 4/16/2001, Entered: 4/16/2001 Response
                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by defendant to application for preliminary attachment order [2-1] 3pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 4/13/2001, Entered: 4/17/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                MINUTES OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: ( Judge John R. Tunheim / Willett, Timothy) taking under advisement on the application for preliminary attachment order [2-1]; plaintiffs to post $50,000 bond; proposed order to be submitted to the court by 3:00 on 4/16/01 1pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 4/12/2001, Entered: 4/13/2001 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Roger R. Cloutier regarding application for preliminary attachment order [2-1], regarding application for expedited discovery [2-2] 4+pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 4/12/2001, Entered: 4/13/2001 AffidavitCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Robert J. Goedderz regarding application for preliminary attachment order [2-1], regarding application for expedited discovery ( to Judge James M. Rosenbaum ) [2-2] 3pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 4/12/2001, Entered: 4/13/2001, Terminated: 4/17/2001 MOTION - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION by plaintiffs for preliminary attachment order and for expedited discovery ( to Judge James M. Rosenbaum ) and memorandum in support 7pg(s) (DFL) Modified on 04/13/2001
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 4/12/2001, Entered: 4/13/2001 ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT - Summons issued. Assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 6th Division Master list and referred to Magistrate Judge Raymond L. Erickson,rcpt. no. 239612 (6:01 UL 49) 26pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 124 times.

                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?